January 28, 2011 |
Filing
322
ORDER. The Plaintiff filed an Unopposed Motion to Dismiss 321 filed 1/27/2011. This matter shall be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, each party to pay their own fees and costs. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 1/28/2011. (sah, )
|
December 14, 2010 |
Filing
318
ORDER. The Motion of the United States of America 282 to Dismiss and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is GRANTED and the action is DISMISSED as to the United States of America. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/14/2010.(sah, )
|
October 21, 2010 |
Filing
313
MINUTE ORDER. Defendant United States Motion for Protective Order Staying Discovery 287 is granted. Discovery in this matter is stayed until further order by the Court. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/21/2010.(sah, )
|
October 4, 2010 |
Filing
309
MINUTE ORDER granting 307 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Sur Reply. Plaintiff shall file his Sur Reply on or before 10/6/2010. The Court limits Plaintiff's Sur Reply to five (5) pages. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/4/2010. (mehcd)
|
September 20, 2010 |
Filing
304
MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 302 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Sur Reply..., by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/20/2010. (mehcd)
|
August 4, 2010 |
Filing
291
ORDER in RE: Plaintiff Jerry Lee Bustos Unopposed Motion for a More Reasoned Judgment Order Pursuant to Request of the Appellate Court 290 filed 08/02/2010. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 08/04/2010.(sah, )
|
July 14, 2010 |
Filing
278
ORDER. The Court directs entry of final judgment as to AETN only, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b). By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 07/14/2010.(sah, )
|
May 20, 2010 |
Filing
270
ORDER. AETNs Motion for Summary Judgment 189 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Fourteenth and Seventeenth Claims for Relief are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and Defendant AETN is DISMISSED as a Defendant in this action. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 05/20/2010.(sah, )
|
January 25, 2010 |
Filing
233
MINUTE ORDER LIFTING STAY AS TO DEFENDANT A&E TELEVISION NETWORKS ONLY, AND CONTINUING THE STAY AS TO DEFENDANT UNITED STATES ONLY. Set Hearing: Status Conference set for 5/3/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty . Defendant A&E Television Networks may reply in support of its pending Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. #189) and Motion for Protective Order Prohibiting Discovery against AETN Pending Resolution of AETN's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. #194) by 2/19/2010. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/25/2010. (mehcd)
|
November 3, 2009 |
Filing
223
MINUTE ORDER granting 221 the Unopposed Motion of Defendant AETN to Amend Minute Order of 10/28/2009; denying 221 Motion to Vacate Settlement Conference. The party representatives or counsel outside of the Denver Metro area may appear for the Settlement Conference by phone. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/3/2009. (mehcd)
|
September 18, 2009 |
Filing
203
SECOND PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/18/2009. (mehcd)
|
August 24, 2009 |
Filing
183
MINUTE ORDER granting 181 the Unopposed Motion of AETN to Take the Deposition of a Person Confined in Prison, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/24/2009. (mehcd)
|
August 21, 2009 |
Filing
180
ORDER. The recommendation 164 is adopted in part and disapproved in part. Defendant AETNs Motion to Dismiss Claims 15 and 16 Pursuant to FED.R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) 117 is GRANTED. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 08/21/2009.(sah, )
|
August 19, 2009 |
Filing
179
ORDER. I approve and adopt the Magistrate Judges recommendation in part and disapprove it in part The Federal Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Fourth Amended Complaint Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2), and 12(b)(6) 115 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 08/19/2009.(sah, )
|
August 12, 2009 |
Filing
174
MINUTE ORDER granting 171 the Joint Motion to Vacate and Reschedule the Final Pretrial Conference. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/19/2009 is VACATED. A Status Conference is hereby set for 9/18/2009 09:15 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/12/2009. (mehcd) Modified on 8/14/2009 to correct the file date (gms, ). Modified on 9/4/2009 to add text regarding the Status Conference(sah2, ).
|
June 26, 2009 |
Filing
164
RECOMMENDATION that 117 Defendant AETNs Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 06/26/2009. (sah, )
|
June 22, 2009 |
Filing
163
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: 115 Federal Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss Claims 15 and 16 Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1)(6), 12(b)(2), and 12(b)(6) be GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART re: 114 Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Jerry Lee Bustos, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/22/09. (erv, ) (Modified on 6/22/2009 corrected link to 115 and NOT 117)(erv2, ).
|
June 5, 2009 |
Filing
161
MINUTE ORDER granting 159 The Joint Motion to Vacate Settlement Conference. The Settlement Conference set in this matter for 07/07/2009, at 10 a.m. is hereby vacated. The parties shall conference together and call Chambers on or before 06/10/2009, to reschedule by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 06/05/2009.(sah, )
|
May 12, 2009 |
Filing
158
ORDER denying 149 Defendant AETNs Motion for Sequenced Discovery and for Protective Order, under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(c) & (d), Prohibiting the Plaintiff from Serving Written Discovery or Deposing AETN Defendants Until AETN may Conduct Discovery into the Substantial Truth of AETNs Publication Concerning the Plaintiff by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 05/12/2009.(sah, )
|
February 18, 2009 |
Filing
145
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 116 the Federal Defendants Motion to Stay Discovery. Discovery is stayed as to the federal defendants except for Plaintiffs files as previously identified and the narrowly constructed written discovery di rected toward identifying the three John Doe defendants. The parties shall file a status report within three business days of receiving a ruling on the federal defendants Motion to Dismiss, indicating what changes in the Scheduling Order are needed by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 02/18/2009.(sah, )
|
February 5, 2009 |
Filing
141
MINUTE ORDER granting 138 The Joint Motion to Vacate Settlement Conference. The Settlement Conference set in this matter for Thursday, 02/19/2009, at 8 a.m.is hereby vacated. The parties shall conference together and call Chambers at or before 02/1 2/2009, to reschedule. Defendant AETNs Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time in which to File Reply Brief 139 filed 02/04/2009 is granted. Defendant AETN shall submit its Reply on or before 02/04/2009 by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 02/05/2009.(sah, )
|
January 8, 2009 |
Filing
126
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 01/08/2009. (sah, )
|