Daly v. Wiley et al
Plaintiff: |
James Scott Daly |
Defendant: |
R. Wiley, Bauer and S. Nafziger |
Case Number: |
1:2008cv00411 |
Filed: |
February 28, 2008 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Prison Condition Office |
County: |
Fremont |
Presiding Judge: |
Wiley Y. Daniel |
Presiding Judge: |
Boyd N. Boland |
Nature of Suit: |
None |
Cause of Action: |
U.S. Government Defendant |
Jury Demanded By: |
42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 30, 2011 |
Filing
95
ORDER. The 84 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge is accepted. Plaintiff's 60 Motion for Summary Judgment be denied. Defendants Bauer and Wiley's 55 Motion for Summary Judgment be granted and that judgment enter in favor of the defendants on the remaining claim (Claim Three), by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/30/11.(mnf, )
|
March 10, 2010 |
Filing
83
ORDER accepting 30 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. Granting in part and denying in part 23 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's first (inadequate staffing) and second (unreasonable delay in medical care) claims for relief are dismissed. However, plaintiff's third claim for relief (unreasonable delay in dental care) is permitted to proceed at this point, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/10/10.(ebs, )
|
October 22, 2009 |
Filing
82
ORDER: denying 80 the plaintiffs Motion to Supplement Plaintiffs Final Pretrial Order Exhibit List, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/22/09.(bnbcd, )
|
August 19, 2009 |
Filing
79
ORDER denying without prejudice 74 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine and 77 Plaintiff's Request That Court, on its Own Motion, Call Witnesses to Attend Trial, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/19/09.(ebs, )
|
June 19, 2009 |
Filing
66
MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 64 Motion to Modify, Limit and/or Narrow the Scope of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/19/09.(ebs, )
|
June 11, 2009 |
Filing
63
ORDER denying 49 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Granting 53 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Two Requests for Production, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/11/09.(ebs, )
|
February 24, 2009 |
Filing
46
ORDER 44 Defendants' Motion for Leave to Depose Plaintiff James Scott Daly. The motion is granted to the extent the defendants seek leave to depose the plaintiff on 3/19/09, or as soon thereafter as possible. It is further ordered that the p laintiff shall make himself available to the defendants for up to seven hours on any weekday between 3/19/09 and 3/25/09 for the purpose of having his deposition taken. The motion is denied in all other respects, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/24/09.(ebs, )
|
January 5, 2009 |
Filing
30
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by R. Wiley, Bauer, S. Nafziger, be Granted in Part and Denied in part. GRANTED insofar as it seeks dismissal of the claims against the defendants in their official capacities for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; GRANTED insofar as it seeks dismissal of Claims One and Two; GRANTED insofar as it seeks dismissal of Claim Three as to defendant Nafziger; and DENIED to the extent it seeks dismissal of Claim Three as to defendants Wiley and Bauer.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/5/09. (erv, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?