Cross v. Qwest Disability Plan, The et al
Plaintiff: Robin F. Cross
Defendant: Qwest Disability Plan, The and Qwest Communications International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv00516
Filed: March 13, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Kit Carson
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re: 153 Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), this matter, and all claims asserted therein, is dismissed with prejudice, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/27/11. (mnf, )
December 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting in part 119 Plaintiff's Verified Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs. The Defendants shall pay the sum of $46,806.00 in legal fees attributable to professional services provided by Dennis Walker and $1,224.00 in legal fees attributable to professional services of Seth Cedars and $413.76 attributable as costs associated with the litigation -- for a total payment of $48,443.76 -- to the Plaintiff on or before 1/14/2011, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/30/10.(mnf, )
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Minute Entry for Motion Hearing held on 11/9/2010 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Taking under advisement 119 Motion for Attorney Fees, and taking under advisement 119 Motion for Costs. (Court Reporter: Nick Richards) (kmtcd)
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Minute ORDER granting 97 Motion to Vacate Status Conference and Progress Report. Status Conference set for 09/28/2009 is VACATED. Joint Status Report due by 10/15/2009 by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/24/09.(kmtcd) Modified on 9/28/2009 to correct the file date (ebs, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cross v. Qwest Disability Plan, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin F. Cross
Represented By: Dennis P. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qwest Disability Plan, The
Represented By: Elizabeth I. Kiovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qwest Communications International, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth I. Kiovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?