Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC v. Boland et al
Plaintiff: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Defendant: David J. Boland, David Corsentino, John Morgan, All In One Enterprises, LLC, Matt Morgan, Advanced Investments, LLC, Jason Pankoski and Michael Valdez
Case Number: 1:2008cv00566
Filed: March 20, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Walker D. Miller
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER FOR ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE. This case is administratively closed in accordance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2. If the parties do not file a stipulation for dismissal with prejudice or a motion to reopen this case for good cause on or before 9/30/2011, this case shall be automatically dismissed without prejudice, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 3/28/11. (mnf, )
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER granting 289 Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiff's Claims Against Defendants John Morgan, All In One Enterprises, LLC, Matt Morgan, Advanced Investments LLC, Danny Degrande, and Degrande Properties, LLC. All claims and cross-claims against these defendants are dismissed without prejudice, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 3/10/11.(mnf, )
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER granting 240 Motion for Contempt against Defendant Jason Pankoski. Pankoski shall pay to WyCo and Legerski $7,852.00 in attorneys' fees and costs incurred in litigating the Motion to 140 Quash. If Pankoski does not pay the $7,852 by 4/1/2011, Pankoski shall also pay to WyCo and Legerski their reasonable attorneys' fees incurred in having to enforce the 177 , 183 Orders on the Motion to Quash, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 3/3/11.(mnf, )
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 275 MINUTE ORDER. In Court Hearing on the civil contempt issue is rescheduled to 2/7/2011 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge Walker D. Miller, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 1/5/11. (mnf, )
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 259 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL pursuant to the Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. The complaint is dismissed with prejudice against Wyco Equities, Inc and FloydLegerski, as well as counterclaim defendant IB Property Holdings, LLC, each party to pay his or its own costs and attorneys fees, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 12/1/10. (ebs, )
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER accepting 248 Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Mr. Pankoski shall appear before me to Show Cause why he should not be adjudged in contempt of court on 11/18/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge Walker D. Miller, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 10/18/10.(ebs, )
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER denying 208 Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Third Through Sixth Claims for Relief, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 7/21/10.(lyg, )
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 221 MINUTE ORDER granting 216 Defendants' Motion to Amend Minute Order Dated March 19, 2009. Granting 218 Defendants' Amended Motion to Withdraw. Attorney David Donder Pavek is relieved of any further representation of Defendants John Morgan, Matt Morgan, All in One Enterprises, LLC, and Advanced Investments, LLC in this matter, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/7/10.(ebs, )
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 205 MINUTE ORDER granting 203 Unopposed Motion of Defendants Floyd Legerski and Wyco Equities, Inc. to File Answer to Second Amended Complaint Out-Of-Time. The Court accepts for filing the Answer to Second Amended Complaint [Docket No. 203-2] as of the date of this Order, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/19/09.(ebs, )
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 201 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with a Court Order 199 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Defendants Wyco Equities, Inc. and Floyd Legerski, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/12/09.(ebs, )
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Courtroom Minutes/Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix: Motion Hearing held on 10/6/2009 granting in part and denying in part 186 Motion to Quash or Modify Deposition Date of Subpoena Requiring Debra Archer to Appear and Produce Documentation. (Court Reporter FTR - C. Coomes) (mehcd)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 54 Seller Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs Third and Fourth Claims for Relief based on misrepresentation are dismissed. Plaintiffs Third and Fourth Claims for Relief based on concealment, as well as Plaintiffs First, Second, Fifth and Sixth Claims for Relief remain pending, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 9/30/09.(gmssl, )
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER re: 179 Affidavit of Attorney Fees and Costs Regarding Motion to Quash filed by Floyd Legerski, Wyco Equities, Inc. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before October 13, 2009, Defendant Pankoski shall reimburse Defendants Wyco Equities, Inc. and Floyd Legerski in the amount of $7,852.00 for the attorneys fees and costs incurred in litigating the Motion to Quash. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/11/09. (erv, )
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER Denying 140 MOTION to Quash filed by Jason Pankoski. Wyco Defendants' request for reasonable attorney's fees and costs is granted and they are to file affidavits on or before 8/25/09. Defendant Pankoski may file objections by 9/4/09. Defendant Pankoski to answer or otherwise respond to Wyco Defendants' Crossclaims and Counterclaims on or before 9/17/09, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/14/09. (gms, )
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 175 Minute Entry for Motion Hearing held on 8/11/2009 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. ORDERED: 140 Motion to Quash is DENIED; the court will award the defendants Wyco Equities, Inc. and Floyd Legerski costs and attorneys' fees incurred in connection with the hearing, attorneys for defendants Wyco Equities, Inc. and Floyd Legerski shall submit an affidavit as to their costs and attorneys' fees on or before 8/25/09; any objection by defendant Jason Pankoski to the affidavit shall be submitted within 10 days thereafter, on or before 9/4/09. (Court Reporter: FTR - Nel Steffens) (rebcd)
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MINUTE ORDER denying 168 Defendant Jason Pankoski's Motion to Permit Him to Testify by Telephonic Means at Hearing Set for August 11, 2009 by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/6/2009.(klmcd)
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER Morgan Defendants to reimburse Defendants Wyco Equities, Inc. and Floyd Legerski in the amount of $993.00 for the attorneys fees incurred in litigating the Motion to Compel (re: 143 Affidavit and 139 Order on Motion to Compel), by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/13/09. (gmssl, )
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting 122 Motion to Compel. Defendant Wyco and Legerski's request for reasonable attorney's fees and other appropriate relief is granted. By 6/5/09 they shall file affidavits re: attorney fees, Morgan defendant objections due 6/12/09. Morgan defendants to respond to the interrogatories and request for production of documents by 6/5/09, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/20/09.(gmssl, )
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Minute ORDER granting 135 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 10/30/2009. Dispositive Motions due by 11/30/2009, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/12/09.(gms, )
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/30/09. (gmssl, ) Modified on 4/2/2009 to correct the file date(gms, ).
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MINUTE ORDER re: 34 Defendants Wyco Equities and Floyd Legerski's Motion to Dismiss. This motion is mooted by the filing of Doc. No. 55, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 3/18/09.(ebs, )
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting 92 Motion for Leave to File Crossclaims and Counterclaims, Including Adding Additional Parties as Defendants. Defendants Wyco Equities, Inc. and Floyd Legerskis Crossclaims and Counterclaims are accepted for filing as of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/21/09.(gms, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC v. Boland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Cowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Boland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Corsentino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All In One Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Pankoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?