March 8, 2010 |
Filing
127
Memorandum Opinion and ORDER granting 118 Defendant Johnson's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 119 Defendant Manley's Motion for Summary Judgment. Summary judgment to enter in favor of defendants and against plaintiff on the only remaining claims in the Second Amended Complaint. Civil Action is terminated, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 3/8/10.(gmssl, )
|
September 30, 2009 |
Filing
121
ORDER: Mr. Baxters responses to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment # 118 and # 119 shall be filed on or before October 29, 2009. At this stage of the litigation, Mr. Baxter shall limit his response to Defendants' argument that he fa iled to properly exhaust his administrative remedies for his claim against Defendants Johnson and Manley. Should the court later reach the additional arguments presented in Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment, the court will allow Mr. Baxte r to file an additional response at that time. In light of the court's limitation of the arguments in the Motions for SummaryJudgment to the issue of proper exhaustion of administrative remedies, Mr. Baxter's request for a medical examination is unnecessary at this time; therefore, Mr. Baxter's "Motion to Grant Order" (filed September 29, 2009) (doc. # 120 ) is DENIED by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 9/30/2009.(cbscd)
|
August 17, 2009 |
Filing
113
ORDER to Cure Deficiency re 109 Notice of Appeal by David Baxter a/k/a Richie Hill, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 08/17/09. Appellant has 30 days to either pay the filing fee or file a proper 1915 motion with district court.(bjrsl, )
|
July 22, 2009 |
Filing
107
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part 36 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Prisoner Complaint. Defendants Hughes, Samples, and Lockridge are dismissed from this civil action for lack of personal jurisdiction. Defendants Hughes, Samples, L ockridge, and Humphries are dismissed from this civil action because the claims against them are barred by the statute of limitations. Mr. Baxters request for injunctive relief is dismissed. This action shall proceed as to Mr. Baxters claims that Defendants Manley and Johnson broke or bruised his ribs in 2007, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 07/22/09.(wjc, )
|
June 17, 2009 |
Filing
103
ORDER granting 102 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Depose Plaintiff by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 06/17/09.(wjc, )
|
April 20, 2009 |
Filing
92
ORDER accepting the 81 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Mr. Baxter's 40 Motion for Injunction is denied, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 04/20/09.(wjc, )
|
March 11, 2009 |
Filing
81
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that 40 Plaintiff's MOTION for Injunction be denied, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 03/11/09. (wjc, )
|
January 9, 2009 |
Filing
58
ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 1/29/2009 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 01/09/09. (wjc, )
|
January 6, 2009 |
Filing
51
Second ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Make Monthly Filing Fee Payment or to Show Cause and Withdrawal of Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge ( 6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis). Plaintiff shall make the required m onthly payments or show cause why he has no assets and no means by which to make the monthly payments for the months of May 2008 through February 2009 on or before 02/16/09. By the 15th day of each month Plaintiff shall either make the required month ly payment or file a certified copy of his inmate trust fund account statement. The Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge filed on 10/02/08 is withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 01/06/09. (wjc, ) Modified on 1/8/2009 to include order withdrawing Recommendation (wjc, ).
|