March 1, 2011 |
Filing
141
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Defendants' 126 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Summary judgment shall enter on the 93 Second Amended Verified Complaint in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff, with each party to pay his, her, or its own attorney fees and costs. Defendants' 133 Motion in Limine is DENIED as moot, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 03/01/2011.(wjc, )
|
March 11, 2010 |
Filing
118
ORDER Re: 98 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Verified Complaint. That Defendants Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED with respect to Plaintiffs claims against Defendants in their official capacities, and her claims for c ompensatory damages. Those claims are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Pursuant to this ORDER, Defendants Motion is GRANTED as to Plaintiffs First, Second and Fourth Claims for Relief and Defendants Shoemaker, Thiede and Altholz are hereby dismissed without prejudice from this action. That in all other respects Defendants Motion to Dismissed is DENIED. An in-person Status Conference set for 4/14/2010 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 03/11/2010.(wjc, )
|
December 15, 2009 |
Filing
116
COURTROOM MINUTES - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 12/15/2009. ORDERED: The Bench Trial set for February 22, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. is VACATED; Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Verified Complaint, doc # 98 is taken under advisement. A Status Conference will be set after the court issues an Order on doc #98 by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. (Court Reporter FTR - Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
|
March 27, 2009 |
Filing
97
ORDER Clarifying Referral to Magistrate Judge Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1), Fed.R.Civ.P. 73, and D.C. Colo. LCivR 72.2. It is hereby clarified that this consolidated civil action is referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer to handle all dispositive matters including trial and entry of a final judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1), Fed.R.Civ.P. 73, and D.C. Colo. LCivR 72.2, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 03/27/09. (wjc, )
|
March 25, 2009 |
Filing
96
MINUTE ORDER granting 94 Joint Motion to Vacate Settlement Conference. The settlement conference set for 03/30/09 is vacated. The settlement conference will be reset only upon joint motion of the parties, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 03/25/09.(wjc, )
|
March 17, 2009 |
Filing
92
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 3/17/2009. Granting 89 Plaintiff's Motion to Perfect Pleadings and File Second Amended Complaint. The Second Amended Complaint is de emed filed as of today's date. Denying as moot 24 Defendants Shoemaker and Ahlin's Motion to Dismiss in case no 08-cv-00738-CBS. Denying as moot 61 Defendant Bokros' Motion to Dismiss in case no 08-cv-00738-CBS. Case Number 08-cv-01436-CBS-KLM Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is denied as moot. Scheduling Conference set for 4/29/2009 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer. (Court Reporter FTR - Linda Kahoe.) (wjc, )
|
February 4, 2009 |
Filing
84
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer: Status Conference held on 2/4/2009. Plaintiff's 81 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify Complaint is withdrawn without prejudice. Plaintiff's Substitution of Counsel is granted. Plaintiff shall file a Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint on or before 02/13/09. (Court Reporter FTR - Ginny Kramer.) (wjc, )
|
January 8, 2009 |
Filing
74
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer: Case Number 08-cv-00738-CBS-KLM denying 62 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend; Case Number 08-cv-00738-CBS-KLM withdrawing and deeming moot 63 Plaintiff's Mot ion for Withdrawal of Counsel; Case Number 08-cv-00738-CBS-KLM withdrawing and deeming moot 64 Plaintiff's first Motion to Amend Complaint; Case Number 08-cv-01436-CBS Plaintiff's Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel is withdrawn and deemed m oot; Case Number 08-cv-01436-CBS Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Answer and Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Counsel are denied; Case Number 08-cv-01436-CBS Defendant Bokros' Motion for Leave to File Answer Out of Time is granted; Case Nu mber 08-cv-01436-CBS Defendant Bokros' Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default is granted; Case Number 08-cv-01436-CBS Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of time to File Plaintiff's Response is Denied; and Case Number 08-cv-01436-CBS Mr. Barnes' oral motion for extension of time to file a response to Defendants' Motion is granted. Status Conference held on 1/8/2009. (Court Reporter FTR - Cathy Coomes.) (wjc, )
|