Alexander et al v. Archuleta County, Colorado et al
Plaintiff: |
Wayne Alexander and Eugene Reilly |
Defendant: |
Archuleta County, Colorado, Peter (I) L. Gonzalez, Peter L. Gonzalez, John (I) J. Weiss and John J. Weiss |
Case Number: |
1:2008cv00912 |
Filed: |
May 1, 2008 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Civil Rights: Other Office |
County: |
Archuleta |
Presiding Judge: |
Lewis T. Babcock |
Nature of Suit: |
Plaintiff |
Cause of Action: |
Federal Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 22, 2010 |
Filing
84
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE, each party to pay his or its own costs and attorney fees. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/22/2010. (erv, )
|
January 27, 2010 |
Filing
77
ORDER granting 66 Defendant's Motion for Discovery Sanctions. The affidavits of Oertel and Lee submitted by Plaintiffs in their Response to the Motion for Summary Judgment are STRICKEN. Plaintiffs are prohibited from introducing the testimony of Oertel and Lee at the trial in this matter. Defendants request for reasonable attorneys fees and expenses from Plaintiff Alexander is GRANTED. On or before February 26, 2010, Defendants shall file an affidavit of expenses and attorneys fees incurr ed in litigating the Motion for Discovery Sanctions and for taking the depositions or Oertel and Lee and the supplemental deposition of Alexander. Plaintiff Alexanders objection, if any, to the affidavit submitted by Defendants shall be filed by March 5, 2010. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/27/2010.(klmcd)
|
October 2, 2009 |
Filing
63
ORDER. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge KristenL. Mix 57 filed 08/11/2009, is AFFIRMED and ADOPTED, and Defendants Motion to Strike Affidavits or, in the Alternative, Unopposed Motion to Suspend Briefing on Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part.The Motion to Strike Affidavits is DENIED. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/2/2009.(sah, )
|
September 9, 2009 |
Filing
61
ORDER Five Day Jury Trial set for 2/22/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 602 before Judge Christine M. Arguello. Trial Preparation Conference set for 2/1/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 602 before Judge Christine M. Arguello. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/9/09. (erv, )
|
August 11, 2009 |
Filing
57
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 42 MOTION to Strike Affidavits, or in the Alternative, Unopposed Motion to Suspend Briefing on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Peter L. Gonzalez, Peter (I) L. Gonzalez, John J. Weiss, John (I) J. Weiss, Archuleta County, Colorado, be GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. I recommend that the Motion to Strike be DENIED. be GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. I recommend that the Motion to Strike be DENIED. I FURTHER RECOMMEND that discovery be reopened for a reasonable time. I FURTHER RECOMMEND that Defendants be granted a reasonable extension of time thereafter to file a supplemental reply in support of the motion for summary judgment. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/11/09. (erv, )
|
August 4, 2009 |
Filing
55
MINUTE ORDER granting 53 Defendants Motion to Vacate and Reset Final Pretrial Conference and to Reset Deadline for Submission of the Final Pretrial Order. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/1/2009. Final Pretrial Conference Reset for 9/8/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/4/2009.(klmcd) (Modified on 8/5/2009 added text as to who's motion was granted)(erv, ).
|
May 15, 2009 |
Filing
39
ORDER Denying as moot 22 Defendants Motion to Compel; Denying as moot 24 Defendants Second Motion to Compel; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants request for sanctions under Fed. R. Civ. P. 37 is DENIED. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/15/09.(erv, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?