Contour Pak, Inc. v. Expedice, Inc.
Plaintiff: |
Contour Pak, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Expedice, Inc. |
Counter Claimant: |
Expedice, Inc. |
Counter Defendant: |
Contour Pak, Inc. |
Case Number: |
1:2008cv01091 |
Filed: |
May 22, 2008 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Edward W. Nottingham |
Presiding Judge: |
Kathleen M. Tafoya |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract Product Liability |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 16, 2010 |
Filing
168
ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's authority under D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2, this case shall be administratively closed. The case may be reopened by any party upon a showing of good cause. The parties shall file a status report within 30 days of any ac tion that serves to lift the automatic stay in force as a result of the Bankruptcy proceeding in the District of Nebraska. All pending motions in this case are denied without prejudice. All settings and deadlines in this case are vacated, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/16/10.(ebs, )
|
February 19, 2010 |
Filing
151
ORDER re: 101 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike Dr. Mary Finn and William Kenedy as Expert Witnesses. Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/19/10. (ebs, )
|
October 22, 2009 |
Filing
137
ORDER: This case shall be administratively closed. The case may be reopened by any party upon a showing of good cause. The parties shall file a status report within 30 days of any action that serves to lift the automatic stay in force as a result of the Bankruptcy proceeding in the District of Nebraska. All pending motions are denied without prejudice. All settings and deadlines are vacated, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/22/09. (ebs, )
|
August 14, 2009 |
Filing
130
ORDER denying 101 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike Dr. Mary Finn and William Kenedy as Expert Witnesses. The remainder of the motion to strike remains pending before Judge Brimmer, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/14/09. (ebs, ) Modified on 8/14/2009 to add text to include the portion of the motion re: Dr. Mary Finn (ebs, ).
|
May 26, 2009 |
Filing
98
ORDER Five-Day Jury Trial set for 9/14/2009 08:00 AM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Trial Preparation Conference set for 8/28/2009 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/26/09. (ebs, )
|
April 19, 2009 |
Filing
87
ORDER granting 78 Motion to Dismiss Claims against Defendant M-C Industries, Inc., d/b/a Polo Custom Products. All claims asserted against Defendant M-C Industries, Inc., d/b/a Polo Custom Products are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys fees and costs. The caption of this case shall be amended as reflected in the caption in this Order, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/19/09.(ebs, )
|
March 23, 2009 |
Filing
85
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: Motion Hearing held on 3/23/2009. Plaintiffs MOTION for Protective Order, [Document #76, filed February 24, 2009] is GRANTED. The deposition of Ms. Alice Myan will be taken in California at a location convenient to the parties. Each party to bear its own costs and fees. (FTR - Debra Brown) (kmtcd)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?