Rodriguez v. General Counsel Bureau of Prison's
Plaintiff: Osiel Rodriguez
Defendant: General Counsel Bureau of Prison's
Case Number: 1:2008cv01374
Filed: June 30, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Freedom of Information Act Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTE ORDER granting 68 Plaintiff's Letter Motion Regarding Disbursement of Settlement Proceeds. The Clerk of Court is directed to refund the payment(s) plaintiff has made toward the filing fee in this action to Jose R. Hernandez, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/07/2009.(wjc, )
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting 66 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss, and this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/12/2009.(wjc, )
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER denying 48 Plaintiff's MOTION Requesting Leave to Administer Deposition Via Written Questions Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. Rule 31(a), by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 08/13/09. (wjc, )
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER of Reference to United States Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe to convene such settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case. Any pending motions now referred will now be handled by the presiding judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 07/30/09. (wjc, )
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER granting 37 Defendants Motion for Order to Relieve the Parties from the Requirement to File a Proposed Scheduling Order. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set on 05/20/2009, at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Watanabe will be converted to Status Conference Hearing by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 05/08/2009.(sah, )
May 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER granting 30 plaintiffs motion for status by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 05/04/2009.(sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. General Counsel Bureau of Prison's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osiel Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Counsel Bureau of Prison's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?