Citizens for San Luis Valley - Water Protection Coalition v. U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service et al
Plaintiff: Citizens for San Luis Valley - Water Protection Coalition
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, Regional Solicitor, Rocky Mountain Region and U.S. Department of Interior
Case Number: 1:2008cv01439
Filed: July 10, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Freedom of Information Act Office
County: Saguache
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Presiding Judge: Edward W. Nottingham
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 44 Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice, with each parties to pay his or its own attorneys fees and costs. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/5/09.(erv, )
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER granting 41 The Joint Motion to Vacate Settlement Conference. The Settlement Conference set for 05/27/2009, is hereby vacated. The parties shall file dismissal papers on or before 06/15/2009 by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 05/26/2009.(sah, )
May 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 36 Motion to Vacate Contempt Hearing Conditionally Set for May 8, 2009. The contempt hearing conditionally set for Friday, May 8, 2009, at 8:30 a.m. is hereby vacated. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/6/09.(erv, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Citizens for San Luis Valley - Water Protection Coalition v. U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citizens for San Luis Valley - Water Protection Coalition
Represented By: Travis Earl Stills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Solicitor, Rocky Mountain Region
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?