October 18, 2012 |
Filing
209
AMENDED 188 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: 207 Order. By Clerk on 10/18/12. (mnfsl, )
|
September 11, 2012 |
Filing
204
ORDER granting 202 Motion for Order signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 9/11/12.(cbssec)
|
September 6, 2012 |
Filing
200
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 9/6/2012. The court GRANTS 190 Motion to Compel. The court shall require Mr. Allen to fully produce all documents and all information sought afte r in the discovery request at issue no later thanSeptember 11, 2012 by 5:00 p.m. Or alternatively, the parties shall submit a proposed joint motion for a superseding order indicating that the parties agree and are asking the court, in lieu of its order requiring production, to execute a superseding order directing production forthwith under the stipulated terms no later than September 10, 2012 12:00 p.m. FTR: Robin Mason. (cbscd, )
|
May 3, 2012 |
Filing
186
ORDER granting Motion for Entry of Judgment 174 ; granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply 182 ; denying as moot Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply 185 . Judgment shall enter in favor of defendants David R . Fiore, Western Peak, LLC and JC Ventures and against George M. Allen for attorneys fees in the amount of $41,826.50. judgment shall enter in favor of defendants Cynthia M. Peters and Prosperity Bookkeeping, Inc. and against George M. Allen for attorneys fees in the amount of $26,183.00.By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/3/12.(pabcd)
|
March 30, 2011 |
Filing
169
ORDER granting Western Peak, LLC, David Fiore, RLF Enterprises, LLC and JCVentures' Motion for Attorneys' Fees 145 and granting Cynthia M. Peters and Prosperity Bookkeeping, Inc.'s 148 Motion for Attorneys' Fees. Defendants to file affidavits on or before 5/2/11, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/30/11.(lsw, )
|
March 22, 2010 |
Filing
143
ORDER: All counterclaims are dismissed without prejudice, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/22/10. (ebs, )
|
March 15, 2010 |
Filing
142
ORDER granting 74 Motion to Dismiss. Granting 82 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Plaintiffs' second claim for relief is dismissed with prejudice. Because the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction, plaintiffs' state law claims are dismissed without prejudice. Judgment shall enter in favor of defendants and against plaintiffs, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/15/10.(ebs, )
|
March 9, 2010 |
Filing
141
COURTROOM MINUTES - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: A Telephonic Motion Hearing was held on 3/9/2010. Unopposed Motion to Modify Scheduling Order # 137 is GRANTED. Discovery due by 9/3/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 10/1/2010. Western Peak Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Supplement Pleadings # 139 is GRANTED. Supplemental pleadings must be filed by 3/23/2010. Western Peak's Motion to Compel Responses to Discovery # 133 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff shall serve discovery responses no later than 5:00 p.m. on 3/19/2010. Counsel shall set dates for depositions by the end of this week. (Court Reporter FTR - Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
|
July 28, 2009 |
Filing
108
ORDER STAYING CASE re: 106 Parties' Stipulated Motion to Stay Proceedings Pursuant to Contingent Settlement Agreement. This action shall be stayed for a period of forty-five days from the date of this Order. The stay shall be automatically lifted at the expiration of this period unless the parties jointly move for an extension. Parties shall submit a status report forty-five days from the date of this Order, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/28/09.(ebs, )
|
April 9, 2009 |
Filing
90
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 4/9/09. (ebs, )
|
March 17, 2009 |
Filing
78
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer: Scheduling Conference held on 3/17/2009, withdrawing 35 Defendatns' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Lack of Standing; withdrawing 38 Cynthia M. Peters a nd Prosperity Bookeeping, Inc's Second Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b); granting 71 Unopposed Motion for Further Two Day Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Second Amended Complaint. David R. Fiore answer due 3/18/200 9; Western Peak, LLC answer due 3/18/2009; Discovery due by 9/30/2009. Dispositive Motions due by 10/30/2009. Settlement Conference set for 5/28/2009 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer, Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2010 09:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer (Court Reporter FTR - Linda Kahoe.) (gmssl, ) Modified on 3/23/2009 to correct spelling error(gms, ).
|
February 20, 2009 |
Filing
65
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 2/20/2009. Granting 55 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Proposed Second Amended Complaint is accepted for filing. Scheduling Conference set for 3/17/2009 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer. Defendant's oral Motion to Attend the Scheduling Conference by Telephone is granted. (Court Reporter FTR - Kathleen Finney.) (ebs, )
|
January 6, 2009 |
Filing
52
ORDER Denying as moot 13 defendants Western Peak, LLC and JC Ventures Motion to Dismiss; Denying as moot 18 Cynthia M. Peters and Prosperity Bookeeping, Inc. Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/6/09.(erv, )
|