Lyndon Property Insurance Company v. Weinman et al
Plaintiff: Lyndon Property Insurance Company
Defendant: Jeffrey A. Weinman, Credit Union of Texas, Landmark Credit Union, Meadows Credit Union, 1st University Credit Union, Allegacy Federal Credit Union, Alta Vista Credit Union, Amarillo Community Federal Credit Union, Carolina Collegiate Federal Credit Union, Charlotte Metro Credit Union, Comala Credit Union, Community Credit Union, Complex Community Federal Credit Union, Corporate America Family Credit Union, Credit Union 1 of IL, Deseret First Federal Credit Union, Financial 21 Community Credit Union, First Service Federal Credit Union, FivePoint Credit Union, Hawthorne Credit Union, Midland Community Federal Credit Union, Midwest Regional Credit Union, Minnequa Works Credit Union, Mutual Savings Credit Union, Neighborhood Credit Union, New Horizons CCU, Norlarco Credit Union, Numark Credit Union, Patriots Federal Credit Union, San Diego Metropolitan Credit Union, Security Service Federal Credit Union, Sunshine Savings Bank, Tech Credit Union, Texas Dow Employees Credit Union, Texas Partners Federal Credit Union, Utah Central Credit Union, Valley Credit Union, Velocity Credit Union and Wescom Central Credit Union
Case Number: 1:2008cv01972
Filed: September 12, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER for Dismissal. Ordered that the applicable terms of the Stipulated Protective Order shall remain in full force and effect, including, without limitation, Lyndon and CUT shall preform their obligations by section 18 thereof by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 04/26/10. (jjh, )
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Minute Entry - Courtroom Minutes for Scheduling Conference held on 9/29/2009 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Its Complaint, filed September 14, 2009 93 , is granted and the First Amended Complaint is accepted and filed today. Defendant's response to the First Amended Complaint is due by October 19, 2009. Counsel shall submit in paper directly to chambers a revised proposed scheduling order by October 19, 2009. (Reporter FTR - K. Terasaki) (rpmcd)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER to Comply With D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2 re: 83 Protective Order. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/29/2009. (rpmcd)
July 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER for Dismissal. ORDERED that Plaintiff Lyndon Property Insurance Companys claims against Tech Credit Union and Defendant Tech Credit Unions counterclaims against Plaintiff Lyndon Property Insurance Company are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own attorneys fees and costs by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 07/22/09. (jjh, )
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Dischsrging 67 Order to Show Cause re: 72 . Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/2/2009. (rpmcd)
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 7/29/2009 11:00 AM in Conference Room before Judge Richard P. Matsch by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 05/27/09. (jjh, )
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER for Clarification of Stipulation of Dismissal Dated April 6, 2009. Plaintiff shall notify the court in writing on or before May 29, 2009, whether Defendant Complex Community Federal Credit Union is included in the 55 stipulation of dismissal dated April 6, 2009. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/22/2009. (rpmcd) Modified on 5/27/2009 to correct spelling error (jjh, ).
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 59 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party Velocity Credit Union terminated with prejudice. Each party shall bear their own attorneys' fees and costs by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 04/14/09.(jjh, )
April 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Dismissing Certain Defendant Credit Unions. Alta Vista Credit Union; Amarillo Community Federal Credit Union; Carolina Collegiate Federal Credit Union; Charlotte Metro Credit Union; Comala Credit Union; Corporate America Family Credit Union; C redit Union 1 of IL; Deseret First Federal Credit Union; Financial 21 Community Credit Union; First Service Federal Credit Union; FivePoint Credit Union; Hawthorne Credit Union; Landmark Credit Union; Meadows Credit Union; Midland Community Federal C redit Union; Midwest Regional Credit Union; Minnequa Works Credit Union; Mutual Savings Credit Union; Neighborhood Credit Union; New Horizons CCU; Norlarco Credit Union; Numark Credit Union; Patriots Federal Credit Union; San Diego Metropolitan Credi t Union; Security Service Federal Credit Union; Texas Dow Employees Credit Union; Texas Partners Federal Credit Union; Utah Central Credit Union; Valley Credit Union; Wescom Central Credit Union; 1st University Credit Union and Allegacy Federal Credit Union terminated. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorney's fees by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 04/08/09. (jjh, )
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard P. Matsch: Motion Hearing held on 2/20/2009. Denying 39 Motion to Continue; denying 6 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Gregory F. Harley entry of appearance entered for plaintiff . 1st University Credit Union answer due 3/12/2009; Allegacy Federal Credit Union answer due 3/12/2009; Alta Vista Credit Union answer due 3/12/2009; Amarillo Community Federal Credit Union answer due 3/12/2009; Carolina Collegiate Federal Credit Un ion answer due 3/12/2009; Charlotte Metro Credit Union answer due 3/12/2009; Comala Credit Union answer due 3/12/2009; Complex Community Federal Credit Union answer due 3/12/2009; Corporate America Family Credit Union answer due 3/12/2009; Credit Uni on 1 of IL answer due 3/12/2009; Deseret First Federal Credit Union answer due 3/12/2009; Financial 21 Community Credit Union answer due 3/12/2009; First Service Federal Credit Union answer due 3/12/2009; FivePoint Credit Union answer due 3/12/2009; Hawthorne Credit Union answer due 3/12/2009; Midland Community Federal Credit Union answer due 3/12/2009; Midwest Regional Credit Union answer due 3/12/2009; Minnequa Works Credit Union answer due 3/12/2009; Mutual Savings Credit Union answer due 3/1 2/2009; Neighborhood Credit Union answer due 3/12/2009; New Horizons CCU answer due 3/12/2009; Norlarco Credit Union answer due 3/12/2009; Numark Credit Union answer due 3/12/2009; Patriots Federal Credit Union answer due 3/12/2009; San Diego Metropo litan Credit Union answer due 3/12/2009; Security Service Federal Credit Union answer due 3/12/2009; Sunshine Savings Bank answer due 3/12/2009; Tech Credit Union answer due 3/12/2009; Texas Dow Employees Credit Union answer due 3/12/2009; Texas Part ners Federal Credit Union answer due 3/12/2009; Utah Central Credit Union answer due 3/12/2009; Valley Credit Union answer due 3/12/2009; Velocity Credit Union answer due 3/12/2009; Wescom Central Credit Union answer due 3/12/2009; Credit Union of Texas answer due 3/12/2009; Landmark Credit Union answer due 3/12/2009; Meadows Credit Union answer due 3/12/2009. (Court Reporter FTR - Kathy Terasaki.) (gms, )
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Approving TECH Credit Union's Amended Joinder 30 32 in Unopposed Second 29 Motion by Defendants Credit Union of Texas and Velocity Credit Union to Extend The Deadline for Filing a Reply in Support of 6 Motion to Dismiss. TECH's request for an extension of time to January 16, 2009 within which to file a reply or joinder in any reply filed by any other party is granted. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/13/2009. (rpmcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lyndon Property Insurance Company v. Weinman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyndon Property Insurance Company
Represented By: John C. Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A. Weinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Union of Texas
Represented By: W. Randolph Barnhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landmark Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meadows Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1st University Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allegacy Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alta Vista Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amarillo Community Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolina Collegiate Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Metro Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comala Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Complex Community Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporate America Family Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Union 1 of IL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deseret First Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial 21 Community Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Service Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FivePoint Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawthorne Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Community Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Regional Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnequa Works Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mutual Savings Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neighborhood Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Horizons CCU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norlarco Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Numark Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriots Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego Metropolitan Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security Service Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunshine Savings Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tech Credit Union
Represented By: Curt Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Dow Employees Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Partners Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utah Central Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velocity Credit Union
Represented By: W. Randolph Barnhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wescom Central Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?