Luft Farms LLC et al v. Western Sugar Cooperative, The
Plaintiff: Luft Farms LLC, Connie Reuter and Allen Reuter
Defendant: Western Sugar Cooperative, The
Case Number: 1:2008cv02014
Filed: September 17, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Agriculture Acts Office
County: Logan
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Referring Judge: Craig B Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Agricultural Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 2301
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2011 Filing 169 MANDATE of USCA as to #157 Notice of Appeal filed by Connie Reuter, Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter: In accordance with 10th Cir. R. 33.1. and upon consideration of the stipulation of the parties to voluntarily dismiss the appeal, this appeal is dismissed. Costs to be born as agreed to by the parties. (USCA Case No. 11-1104) (Attachments: #1 USCA Order)(bjrsl, )
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER Defendants Motion for Withdrawal With Prejudice of Bill of Costs #166 and Defendants Motion for Withdrawal With Prejudice of Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs #167 are both granted GRANTED. ORDERED that Defendants Bill of Costs #153 and Defendants Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs #147 are both deemed withdrawn with prejudice, each party to bear their own attorneys fees and costs by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 04/12/11.(jjh, )
April 11, 2011 Filing 167 MOTION to Withdraw Document re #147 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Flink, Marc)
April 11, 2011 Filing 166 MOTION to Withdraw Document re #153 Proposed Bill of Costs by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Flink, Marc)
April 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MINUTE ORDER granting #164 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs by 04/18/11 by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 04/07/11.(jjh, )
April 7, 2011 Filing 164 Fourth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #147 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Plaintiffs Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Vanderpool, Pamela)
March 31, 2011 Filing 163 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM re #157 Notice of Appeal by Plaintiffs Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter (Tierney, Martha)
March 31, 2011 Filing 162 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 11/21/08 before Judge Daniel. Pages: 1-60.
< NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov.

< Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/5/2011. (Lindblom, Therese)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting #160 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiffs shall have until April 7, 2011 to respond to Defendant's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 03/28/2011.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (wydlc3)
March 24, 2011 Filing 160 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #147 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Plaintiffs Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Vanderpool, Pamela)
March 17, 2011 Filing 159 USCA Case Number 11-1104 for #157 Notice of Appeal filed by Connie Reuter, Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter. (bjrsl, )
March 17, 2011 Filing 158 LETTER Transmitting Notice of Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the #157 Notice of Appeal filed by Connie Reuter, Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (Retained counsel; Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Preliminary Record including Notice of Appeal, #3 Receipt)(bjrsl, )
March 16, 2011 Filing 157 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #142 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,, #150 Clerk's Judgment, by Plaintiffs Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter (Tierney, Martha)
March 15, 2011 Filing 156 NOTICE re #153 Proposed Bill of Costs Notice of Rescheduled Appearance Before Clerk to Tax Costs by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The (Kitaev, Erica)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MINUTE ORDER granting #154 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiffs' response to #147 Defendant's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs is due on or before Monday, March 28, 2011. Entered by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/14/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (wydcd, rrk)
March 14, 2011 Filing 154 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #147 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Plaintiffs Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Vanderpool, Pamela)
February 28, 2011 Filing 153 WITHDRAWN Proposed Bill of Costs by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cost Chart, #2 Exhibit Cost Invoice)(Kitaev, Erica) Modified on 4/12/2011 this document is withdrawn pursuant to the Order signed on 04/12/11 (jjh, ).
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting #151 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion for Attorneys' Fees And Costs. Plaintiffs' response to Defendant's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs is due on or before March 17, 2011. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 02/25/2011.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (wydlc3)
February 23, 2011 Filing 151 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #147 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Plaintiffs Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Vanderpool, Pamela)
February 14, 2011 Filing 150 AMENDED JUDGMENT. ORDERED that judgment is hereby entered in favor of Defendant, The Western Sugar Cooperative, and against Plaintiffs, Luft Farms, LLC, Allen Reuter, and Connie Reuter, on Defendants Motion to Dismiss. ORDERED that Defendant shall have its costs by the filing of a Bill of Costs with the Clerk of this Court within 14 days of entry of the amended judgment by Deputy Clerk on 02/14/11. (jjh, )
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Minute ORDER granting #145 Motion to Amend Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 59(e) to Provide for an Award of Costs Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1920. The Judgment entered January 11, 2011 [ECF No. 143] shall be amended to provide that Defendant The Western Sugar Cooperative shall be awarded its costs pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1920 by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 02/11/11.(jjh, )
February 4, 2011 Filing 148 BRIEF in Support of #147 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Marc D. Flink , #2 Exhibit A Declaration of Marc D. Flink , #3 Exhibit A pages 13 thru 24 to Declaration of Marc D Flink , #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Marc D Flink .pdf, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Marc D Flink , #6 Exhibit D to Declaration of Marc D Flink , #7 Exhibit 2 to Brief , #8 Exhibit 3 to Brief )(Flink, Marc) (Modified on 2/8/2011 edited duplicate text)(erv, ).
February 4, 2011 Filing 147 WITHDRAWN MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Flink, Marc) Modified on 4/12/2011 this document is withdrawn pursuant to the Order signed on 04/12/11 (jjh, ).
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MINUTE ORDER granting #144 Defendants Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs, Including Costs Not Recoverable Under 28 U.S.C. 1920, to and incl 2/4/2011 by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 1/25/2011.(erv, )
January 21, 2011 Filing 145 MOTION to Amend #143 Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.Pro. 59(e) to Provide for an Award of Costs Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1920 by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) (Flink, Marc) (Modified on 1/24/2011 added link to judgment)(erv, ).
January 21, 2011 Filing 144 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs, Including Costs Not Recoverable Under 28 U.S.C. 1920 by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Flink, Marc)
January 11, 2011 Filing 143 JUDGMENT by Clerk. Judgment is hereby entered in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiffs on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' first Claim for violation of the AFPA is dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiffs' remaining state law claims are dismissed without prejudice re: #142 Order, by Clerk on 1/11/11. (mnf, )
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting #123 Defendants Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint; Plaintiffs first Claim for violation of the AFPA is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; Plaintiffs remaining state law claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. granting #125 Defendants Motion to Strike Class Allegations and Dismiss Class Claims in Second Amended Complaint. The class claims set forth in Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint are hereby dismissed WITHOUT PREJUDICE. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 1/7/2011.(erv, )
November 15, 2010 Filing 141 Minute Entry for Motion Hearing proceedings held 11/15/2010 before Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. Taking under advisement #123 Motion to Dismiss. Taking under advisement #125 Motion to Dismiss. (Court Reporter: Therese Lindblom) (wydcd, rrk)
November 11, 2010 Filing 140 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Martha Moore Tierney on behalf of Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter (Tierney, Martha)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MINUTE ORDER Setting Hearing on all pending Motions. Hearing set for 11/15/2010 03:00 PM in Courtroom A1002 before Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/30/2010. (erv, ) (Modified on 10/5/2010 edited text to that of the Minute Order)(erv, ).
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MINUTE ORDER granting #135 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. #136 Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, filed December 7, 2009, is accepted by the Court for filing. Entered by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/8/09. (wydcd, rrk)
December 7, 2009 Filing 137 REPLY to Response to #125 MOTION to Dismiss Class Claims and Strike Class Allegations filed by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Flink, Marc)
December 7, 2009 Filing 136 REPLY to Response to #123 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Flink, Marc)
December 7, 2009 Filing 135 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Flink, Marc)
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MINUTE ORDER granting #132 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiffs Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint is deemed filed. Entered by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/20/09. (wydcd, rrk)
November 19, 2009 Filing 133 RESPONSE to #123 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Vanderpool, Pamela)
November 19, 2009 Filing 132 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Vanderpool, Pamela)
November 19, 2009 Filing 131 RESPONSE to #125 MOTION to Dismiss Class Claims and Strike Class Allegations in Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Vanderpool, Pamela)
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MINUTE ORDER granting #129 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion toDismiss the Second Amended Complaint shall be filed not later than November 19,2009. Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion to Strike Class Allegations and Dismiss "Class Claims" in Second Amended Complaint shall be filed not later than November 19, 2009. Entered by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/10/09.(wydcd, rrk)
November 10, 2009 Filing 129 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #125 MOTION to Dismiss Class Claims and Strike Class Allegations, #123 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hubbell, James)
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MINUTE ORDER granting #122 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages and Defendant's Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Second AmendedComplaint [doc. # 122], filed October 22, 2009, is accepted for filing although it exceeds the fifteen-page limit on briefs. Entered by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/22/09.(wydcd, rrk)
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot #61 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot #75 Motion to Strike entered by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/22/09.(wydcd, rrk)
October 22, 2009 Filing 126 BRIEF in Support of #125 MOTION to Dismiss Class Claims and Strike Class Allegations filed by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Flink, Marc)
October 22, 2009 Filing 125 MOTION to Dismiss Class Claims and Strike Class Allegations by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Flink, Marc)
October 22, 2009 Filing 124 BRIEF in Support of #123 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Flink, Marc)
October 22, 2009 Filing 123 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Flink, Marc)
October 22, 2009 Filing 122 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Minute Order)(Flink, Marc)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MINUTE ORDER - The court having reviewed the settlement statements submitted by the parties, concludes that based upon the positions expressed, a settlement conference would not be productive at this time. A settlement conference may be set upon the request of the parties, after they have conferred and determined that such a conference would be of assistance in resolving the case, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 9/30/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(cbssec)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MINUTE ORDER granting #118 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Judd R. Choate is relieved of any further representation of plaintiffs, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 9/29/09.(gmssl, )
September 25, 2009 Filing 119 MEMORANDUM regarding #118 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Judd R. Choate filed by Connie Reuter, Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter.Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (wydcd, rrk)
September 25, 2009 Filing 118 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Judd R. Choate by Plaintiffs Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Choate, Judd)
September 16, 2009 Filing 117 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT Corrected, against Western Sugar Cooperative, The, filed by Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Hubbell, James)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 116 COURTROOM MINUTES - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 9/15/2009. ORDERED: Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend the Amended Complaint (doc # 106 , filed 8/13/2009) is GRANTED. Plaintiff is allowed to substitute a corrected copy of the proposed Second Amended Complaint doc #[105-6] that is deemed filed as of SEPTEMBER 15, 2009. Defendant's response under Rule 12 to the Second Amended Complaint shall be filed on or before OCTOBER 22, 2009. ORDERED:Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Seal Reply and Expert Report, doc #112 , filed 9/14/2009 is GRANTED. The requirements of Rule 7.2 are satisfied. To the extent that Plaintiff challenges the confidentiality of these documents or data, the Plaintiff may not base the challenge of confidentiality on information it had, or was aware of, as of September 15, 2009. ORDERED: The parties shall submit confidential updated statements on or before September 25, 2009. If the court determines that a settlement conference will be productive, the parties will be notified to set a date for a settlement conference by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. (Court Reporter FTR - Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
September 14, 2009 Filing 115 REPLY to Response to 106 MOTION to Amend #60 Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter. (Public Entry for SEALED Document #113 , filed 9/14/09) TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (erv, )
September 14, 2009 Filing 114 MEMORANDUM regarding #112 MOTION for Leave to MOTION to Seal Reply and Expert Report filed by Connie Reuter, Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter.Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/14/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (wydcd, rrk)
September 14, 2009 Filing 113 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter. (Attachments: #1 Deposition Excerpts 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Hubbell, James)
September 14, 2009 Filing 112 MOTION for Leave to, MOTION to Seal Reply and Expert Report by Plaintiffs Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hubbell, James)
September 10, 2009 Filing 111 RESPONSE to 106 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #60 Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Flink, Marc)
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MINUTE ORDER setting hearing on 106 MOTION to Amend #60 Amended Complaint. ORDERED that a Motion Hearing will be held on 9/15/2009 at 10:45 a.m., in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to the instant motion no later than 9/10/09, by Magistrate Judge Shaffer on 8/27/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(cbssec)
August 21, 2009 Filing 109 NOTICE re #108 Order on Motion to Seal,,, and direction re position on motion to amend by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The (Flink, Marc)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MINUTE ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to File Materials Under Seal Pursuant to Stipulated Protective Order (doc. #102 ) is DENIED, without prejudice, for failure to comply with all provisions of D.C.COLOL.CIVR.7.2. Plaintiffs have until August 24, 2009, to file a revised motion that addresses all of the requirements, for sealing documents, as set forth in D.C.COLOL.CIVR. 7.2B 1-4. The Clerk of Court shall keep the Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (doc. #105 ) under seal pending further order by the court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall notify the court no later than close of business on Friday, August 21, 2009, as to their position on the motion to amend and whether or not they will file a response brief in accordance with D.C.COLOL.CIVR.7.1C. by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 8/17/2009.(cbscd)
August 14, 2009 Filing 107 MEMORANDUM regarding 106 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #60 Amended Complaint filed by Connie Reuter, Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter.Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 8/14/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (wydcd, rrk)
August 13, 2009 Filing 106 MOTION for Leave to Amend the #60 Amended Complaint with exhibits by Plaintiffs Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter. (Public Entry for SEALED Documents #105 , filed 8/13/09) Text Only Entry - No Document Attached (erv2, )
August 13, 2009 Filing 105 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Deposition Excerpts 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Document Second Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit 1 to Second Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit 2 to Second Amended Complaint, #8 Exhibit 3 to Second Amended Complaint, #9 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Hubbell, James)
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MEMORANDUM regarding #102 Third Party MOTION to Seal Motion to File Materials Under Seal Pursuant to Stipulated Protective Order filed by Connie Reuter, Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter.Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 8/13/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (wydcd, rrk)
August 13, 2009 Filing 103 Docket Annotation re: #102 Third Party MOTION to Seal Motion to File Materials Under Seal Pursuant to Stipulated Protective Order. This has been corrected to read UNOPPOSED and NOT Third-Party Motion. Text only entry - no document attached (erv2, )
August 13, 2009 Filing 102 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Seal Motion to File Materials Under Seal Pursuant to Stipulated Protective Order by Plaintiffs Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Hubbell, James) (Modified on 8/13/2009 to change to Unopposed )(erv2, ).
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MINUTE ORDER granting #99 Motion to Vacate Date to Designate Experts. ORDERED that the expert designation date of 8/1/09 is VACATED. FURTHER ORDERED that within 72 hours of receipt of a decision by District Judge Daniel on the pending dispositive motion, counsel shall contact Magistrate Judge Shaffers chambers (303.844.2117) to set up a telephonic status conference, as necessary. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/28/09.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (cbssec )
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MEMORANDUM regarding #99 Joint MOTION to Vacate 96 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Designate ExpertsJoint MOTION to Vacate 96 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Designate Experts filed by Western Sugar Cooperative, The.Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 7/23/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (wydcd, rrk)
July 23, 2009 Filing 99 Joint MOTION to Vacate 96 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Designate Experts by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Granting Joint Motion to Vacate Date to Designate Experts)(Flink, Marc)
June 15, 2009 Filing 98 REPLY to Response to #75 MOTION to Strike #60 Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Flink, Marc)
June 5, 2009 Filing 97 REPLY to Response to #61 MOTION to Dismiss The Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Flink, Marc)
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MINUTE ORDER granting #92 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties have up to and including 8/1/09 to designate their experts. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 6/3/09.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (cbssec)
June 2, 2009 Filing 93 MEMORANDUM regarding #92 Joint MOTION For Extension of Time of 60 Days to Designate Experts filed by Connie Reuter, Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter.Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 6/2/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (wydcd, rrk)
June 2, 2009 Filing 92 Joint MOTION For Extension of Time of 60 Days to Designate Experts by Plaintiffs Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hubbell, James)
June 1, 2009 Filing 91 REPLY to Response to #64 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending The Determination of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Flink, Marc)
June 1, 2009 Filing 90 Docket Annotation re: #88 Brief in Support of Motion, This is to be refiled as a Reply to a Response to a Motion and linked to document #64 . Text only entry - no document attached (erv, )
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 95 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 5/29/2009. (cbscd)
May 29, 2009 Filing 94 COURTROOM MINUTES - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Motion Hearing held on 5/29/2009. ORDERED - Defendant's Motion Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.26(C)(1) to Stay Discovery #64 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART without prejudice to the Plaintiffs' right to seek leave to pursue discovery in the future as appropriate. The Motion is GRANTED subject to Defendant responding to requests for production #4 and #12. The court will also allow discovery of information previously disclosed in related state court lawsuits. Discovery is stayed in all other aspects. The production of documents otherwise disclosable under Rule 16(a)(1), and the documents consistent with the limited discovery as stated above, is due no later than June 12, 2009. ORDERED - The Stipulated Protective Order is accepted by the court. The parties are reminded that they will be required to comply fully with all provisions of D.C.ColoL.CivR.7.2, and particularly those provisions dealing with filing documents under seal. (Court Reporter FTR - Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
May 28, 2009 Filing 89 RESPONSE to #75 MOTION to Strike #60 Amended Complaint Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion to Strike Class Allegations and Dismiss "Class Claims" in the Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Choate, Judd)
May 27, 2009 Filing 88 BRIEF in Support of #64 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending The Determination of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint #61 filed by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Flink, Marc) (Modified on 5/28/2009 corrected link #61 )(erv, ).
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MINUTE ORDER granting #85 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint #86 , filed May 18, 2009, is accepted for filing even though it exceeds the fifteen-page limit on briefs. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 5/19/09.(erv, )
May 18, 2009 Filing 86 RESPONSE to Motion re #61 MOTION to Dismiss The Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter. (Choate, Judd)
May 18, 2009 Filing 85 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to File Response to Defendant's #61 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint in Excess of 15 Pages by Plaintiffs Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Choate, Judd) (Modified on 5/19/2009 added Link to Motion to Dismiss)(erv, ).
May 14, 2009 Filing 84 RESPONSE to Motion re #64 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending The Determination of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hubbell, James)
May 13, 2009 Filing 83 Docket Annotation re: #82 Minute Order, #81 Order on Motion to Stay, #80 Minute Order, Motion #64 was termed in error and has been reopened and is pending before Magistrate Judge Shaffer. Text only entry - no document attached (erv, )
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MINUTE ORDER re: #75 MOTION to Strike #60 Amended Complaint filed by Western Sugar Cooperative, The; Plaintiffs shall file a Response on orbefore May 28, 2009. by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 5/8/09. (erv, )
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MINUTE ORDER re #64 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for a Seven-Day Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Stay Discovery. Plaintiffs may file their response to Defendants Motion Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c)(1) to Stay Discovery #64 on or before Thursday, May 14, 2009. by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 5/8/09.(erv, ) (Modified on 5/13/2009 Motion reopened, termed in error)(erv, ).
May 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MINUTE ORDER re: #64 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Ten-Day Extension to Respond to the Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint #61 not later than 5/18/09. Any ruling on the remainder of the present Motion is deferred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 5/7/09. (erv, ) (Modified on 5/13/2009 Motion reopened termed in error)(erv, ).
May 7, 2009 Filing 79 MEMORANDUM regarding #78 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #64 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Connie Reuter, Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 5/7/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(erv, )
May 6, 2009 Filing 78 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #64 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending The Determination of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, #61 MOTION to Dismiss The Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hubbell, James)
May 6, 2009 Filing 77 MEMORANDUM regarding #75 MOTION to Strike #60 Amended Complaint filed by Western Sugar Cooperative, The.Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 5/6/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (wydcd, rrk)
May 5, 2009 Filing 76 BRIEF in Support re #75 MOTION to Strike #60 Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Flink, Marc)
May 5, 2009 Filing 75 MOTION to Strike #60 Amended Complaint by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Flink, Marc)
May 5, 2009 Filing 74 RESPONSE to the Courts 4/21/09 #66 Order on Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Flink, Marc) (Modified on 5/7/2009 edited title to that of the pleading)(erv, ).
May 4, 2009 Filing 73 Utility Setting Hearings: Using Magistrate Judge Motion Hearing Setting. Date and time remain the same. Motion Hearing set for 5/29/2009 02:30 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (erv, )
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MINUTE ORDER granting #68 Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Parties to Respond to Written Discovery to 6/12/09, or such other time as may be deemed appropriate by the Court following the May 29, 2009 hearing on the Motion to Stay. by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 4/29/09.(erv, )
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTE ORDER granting #63 Defendants Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/28/09.(erv, )
April 28, 2009 Filing 70 RESPONSE to #63 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Re Brief In Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter. (Hubbell, James) (Modified on 4/29/2009 edited duplicate text by filer) (erv, ).
April 27, 2009 Filing 69 MEMORANDUM regarding #68 Joint MOTION For Extension of Time For Parties to Respond to Written Discovery filed by Western Sugar Cooperative, The.Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/27/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (wydcd, rrk)
April 27, 2009 Filing 68 Joint MOTION For Extension of Time For Parties to Respond to Written Discovery by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion For Extension of Time For Parties to Respond to Written Discovery)(Flink, Marc)
April 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MINUTE ORDER setting hearing on #64 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending The Determination of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. ORDERED that a Motion Hearing will be held on 5/29/2009 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are directed to D.C.ColoL.CivR. 7.1 C for the deadline(s) relating to the filing of the response and reply brief(s). By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 4/22/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(cbssec, )
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MINUTE ORDER Denying as moot Without Prejudice #19 Defendants Motion to Dismiss; Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendants Motion to Exceed Page Limit for Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint, not later than 4/28/09, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/21/09.(erv, )
April 20, 2009 Filing 65 MEMORANDUM regarding #64 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending The Determination of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Western Sugar Cooperative, The.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/20/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(erv, )
April 17, 2009 Filing 64 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending The Determination of Defendant's #60 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' 1st Set of Discovery to Defendant, #2 Exhibit Defendant's 1st Discovery Requests To Defendant Luft Farms, #3 Exhibit Defendant's 1st Discovery Requests To Plaintiff Reuters)(Flink, Marc) (Modified on 4/21/2009 added link to Motion to Dismiss)(erv, ).
April 17, 2009 Filing 63 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages #61 Re Brief In Support of #60 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) (Flink, Marc) (Modified on 4/21/2009 added links)(erv, ).
April 17, 2009 Filing 62 BRIEF in Support re #61 MOTION to Dismiss #60 The Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Flink, Marc) (Modified on 4/21/2009 added link to complaint) (erv, ).
April 17, 2009 Filing 61 MOTION to Dismiss #60 The Amended Complaint by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Flink, Marc) (Modified on 4/21/2009 added link to complaint)(erv, ).
April 2, 2009 Filing 60 AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hubbell, James)
March 30, 2009 Filing 59 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Scheduling/Status Conference held on 3/30/2009. (Court Reporter FTR Linda Kahoe.) (erv, )
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #55 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint. The court will keep the schduling/status conference set for 03/30/09 and will address the need for further adjustments to pretrial deadlines at that conference by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 03/23/09.(jjh, )
March 19, 2009 Filing 57 RESPONSE to Motion re #55 MOTION For Extension of Time for 14 Day Extension to Amend Complaint filed by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Flink, Marc)
March 19, 2009 Filing 56 MEMORANDUM regarding #55 MOTION For Extension of Time for 14 Day Extension to Amend Complaint filed by Connie Reuter, Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter.Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/19/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (wydcd, rrk)
March 19, 2009 Filing 55 MOTION For Extension of Time for 14 Day Extension to Amend Complaint by Plaintiffs Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order Re: Motion of Plaintiffs for 14 Day Extension of Time to Amend Complaint)(Hubbell, James)
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying #10 Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/20/09.(erv, )
February 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE ORDER: Courtroom Minutes/Minute Order dated 02/02/09 is amended only as to the Parties Written Discovery shall be served no later than 03/31/09. There will be no depositions taken by either party without prior leave of Court, prior to 03/31/09, by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 02/05/09. (wjc, )
February 2, 2009 Filing 52 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer: Order denying #50 Motion for Protective Order. Scheduling Conference held on 2/2/2009. Order setting Scheduling/Status Conference for 3/30/2009 09:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer. (Court Reporter FTR-Debra Brown.) (jjh, )
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM regarding #50 MOTION for Protective Order Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(C)(1) filed by Western Sugar Cooperative, The.Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 1/30/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (wydcd, rrk)
January 30, 2009 Filing 50 MOTION for Protective Order Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(C)(1) by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Flink, Marc)
January 30, 2009 Filing 49 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION to Strike and Brief in Support Thereof filed by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Flink, Marc)
January 30, 2009 Filing 48 RESPONSE to Motion re #19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Flink, Marc)
January 28, 2009 Filing 47 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter. (Hubbell, James)
January 12, 2009 Filing 46 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION to Strike and Brief in Support Thereof Answer to Motion to Dismiss Class Allegations filed by Plaintiffs Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter. (Hubbell, James)
January 12, 2009 Filing 45 RESPONSE to Motion re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Opposition of Plaintiffs to Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter. (Hubbell, James)
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER granting #43 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Pending Motions. Plaintiffs' responses to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #19 , filed November 10, 2008 and Motion to Strike Class Allegations and Dismiss Class Claims #20 , filed November 10, 2008 shall be filed not later than Monday, January 12, 2009., by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/16/08.(erv, )
December 16, 2008 Filing 43 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 MOTION to Strike and Brief in Support Thereof, #19 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order RE: Unopposed Motion of Plaintiffs for Further Extension of Time to Respond to Pending Motions)(Hubbell, James)
December 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER granting #41 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Pending Motions. Plaintiffs' responses to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #19 and Motion to Strike Class Allegations and Dismiss Class Claims #20 shall be filed not later than Monday, December 22, 2008., by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/01/08.(erv, )
December 1, 2008 Filing 41 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 MOTION to Strike and Brief in Support Thereof, #19 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hubbell, James)
November 25, 2008 Filing 40 Supplemental DECLARATION of J. Kent Wimmer regarding Brief in Opposition to Motion, #21 by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (gms, )
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Minute ORDER granting Defendant's Unopposed #37 Motion to File the Supplemental Declaration of J. Kent Wimmer in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Court accepts for filing the supplemental declaration submitted with the motion, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/25/08.(gms, )
November 25, 2008 Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION to Supplement #21 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, Supplemental Declaration of J. Ken Wimmer by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Flink, Marc)
November 24, 2008 Filing 36 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of Darren Luft regarding Reply to Response to Motion, #25 . (erv, )
November 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER granting #34 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to File Declaration Correcting and Supplementing Testimony. The Court will accept for filing and consideration the Declaration of Darren Luft submitted with the motion as Exhibit U. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/24/08.(erv, )
November 24, 2008 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION to Supplement #25 Reply to Response to Motion, #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to File Declaration Correcting and Supplementing Testimony by Plaintiffs Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U - Supplemental Declaration of Darren Luft, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hubbell, James)
November 21, 2008 Filing 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel: taking under advisement #10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Motion Hearing held on 11/21/2008. (Court Reporter Therese Lindblom.) (wydcd, rrk)
November 19, 2008 Filing 33 REBUTTAL DECLARATION of J Kent Wimmer and Charles Steiner regarding Brief in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction #21 by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Attachments: #1 Steiner Declaration Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 1 Steiner, #3 Exhibit 2 Steiner, #4 Exhibit 3 Steiner, #5 Exhibit 4 part 1 Steiner, #6 Exhibit 4 part 2 Steiner, #7 Exhibit 5 Steiner, #8 Exhibit 6 Steiner)(erv, )
November 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER granting #29 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to File Rebuttal Declarations of J. Kent Wimmer and Charles Steiner in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/19/08.(erv, )
November 19, 2008 Filing 31 Utility Resetting Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 2/2/2009 09:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer. Text only entry - no document attached. (erv, )
November 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Continue Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. The scheduling conference set for November 25, 2008 is VACATED and RESET to February 2, 2009 at 9:15 a.m. (Mountain Time). Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 11/19/08.(erv, )
November 19, 2008 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION to Supplement #21 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, Rebuttal Declarations by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Wimmer Declaration), #2 Exhibit 2 (Steiner Declaration), #3 Exhibit 1 to Steiner Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to Steiner Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to Steiner Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4 - Part 1 to Steiner Declaration, #7 Exhibit 4 - Part 2 to Steiner Declaration, #8 Exhibit 5 to Steiner Declaration, #9 Exhibit 6 to Steiner Declaration, #10 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Flink, Marc)
November 18, 2008 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM regarding #27 Joint MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Scheduling Conference and Associated Deadlines filed by Connie Reuter, Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer. Referred by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/18/08. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached) (wydcd, rrk)
November 18, 2008 Filing 27 Joint MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Scheduling Conference and Associated Deadlines by Plaintiffs Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hubbell, James)
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER granting #24 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply to Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction in Excess of 10 pages. Plaintiffs may file a brief of 28 pages. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/17/08.(erv, )
November 14, 2008 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Deposition Excerpts C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Hubbell, James)
November 14, 2008 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Unopposed Motion to File Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction in Excess of 10 Pages by Plaintiffs Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) proposed order)(Hubbell, James)
November 14, 2008 Filing 23 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Erica Gann Kitaev on behalf of Western Sugar Cooperative, The (Kitaev, Erica)
November 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER granting #18 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages In Support of Motion to Dismiss and Brief in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/10/08.(erv, )
November 10, 2008 Filing 21 BRIEF in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21)(Flink, Marc)
November 10, 2008 Filing 20 WITHDRAWN MOTION to Strike and Brief in Support Thereof by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document)(Flink, Marc) (Modified on 5/6/2009 WITHDRAWN )(erv2, ).
November 10, 2008 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document Brief in Support, #2 Appendix, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12)(Flink, Marc)
November 10, 2008 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Flink, Marc)
October 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Western Sugar Cooperative, The answer due 11/10/2008. by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 10/29/08.(erv, )
October 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER re: #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Connie Reuter, Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter ; Defendant The Western Sugar Cooperative shall file its response to the motion no later than Monday, November 10, 2008 at noon, and Plaintiffs shall file their reply no later than Friday, November 14, 2008; Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2008 01:30 PM in Courtroom A1002 before Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/28/08. (erv, )
October 28, 2008 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM regarding #14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Further Ext. of Time re "Class Action Complaint" filed by Western Sugar Cooperative, The. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer. Referred by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/28/08. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached) (wydcd, rrk)
October 28, 2008 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Further Ext. of Time re #1 Class Action Complaint by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Flink, Marc)
October 28, 2008 Filing 13 Docket Annotation re: #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, the Motion has been terminated and the text has been changed to reflect that this is a Brief in Support of the #10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Text only entry - no document attached (erv, )
October 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to File Excess of 15 Pages. Plaintiffs may file a brief of 23 pages. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/28/08.(erv, )
October 27, 2008 Filing 11 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Deposition Excerpts D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Deposition Excerpts F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Deposition Excerpts L, #13 Exhibit M)(Hubbell, James) (Modified on 10/28/2008 To reflect that this is a Brief in Support and NOT a Motion)(erv, ).
October 27, 2008 Filing 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter. (Hubbell, James)
October 27, 2008 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Plaintiffs Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order RE: Motion to File Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary injunction in Excess of 15 Pages)(Hubbell, James)
October 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 11/25/2008 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 10/8/08. (erv, )
October 8, 2008 Filing 7 Utility resetting deadlines: Per the 6 Minute Order, the deadline for Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' #1 class action Complaint is extended to 10/29/2008. Text only entry - no document attached. (cbssec)
October 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's #4 Motion for Extension of Time. Entered by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 10/8/08. (Text only entry - no document attached) (cbssec)
October 7, 2008 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM regarding #4 Unopposed MOTION For Extension of Time to Answer "Class Action Complaint" filed by Western Sugar Cooperative, The. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer. Referred by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/7/08. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached) (wydcd, rrk)
October 7, 2008 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION For Extension of Time to Answer "Class Action Complaint" by Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Flink, Marc)
September 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer. Signed by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/29/08. (wydcd, rrk)
September 23, 2008 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Registered Agent The Corporation Service Company upon The Western Sugar Cooperative on 9/19/2008, filed by Plaintiffs Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter (Hubbell, James)
September 17, 2008 Filing 1 Class Action COMPLAINT against Western Sugar Cooperative, The ( Filing fee $ 350, Receipt Number COX013003) Summons issued, filed by Luft Farms LLC, Allen Reuter, Connie Reuter. (Attachments: #1 Exh A, #2 Exh B, #3 Exh C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Receipt)(llk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luft Farms LLC et al v. Western Sugar Cooperative, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luft Farms LLC
Represented By: James W. Hubbell
Represented By: Martha Moore Tierney
Represented By: Judd R. Choate
Represented By: Pamela H. Vanderpool
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Reuter
Represented By: James W. Hubbell
Represented By: Martha Moore Tierney
Represented By: Judd R. Choate
Represented By: Pamela H. Vanderpool
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Reuter
Represented By: James W. Hubbell
Represented By: Martha Moore Tierney
Represented By: Judd R. Choate
Represented By: Pamela H. Vanderpool
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Sugar Cooperative, The
Represented By: Marc David Flink
Represented By: Erica Gann Kitaev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?