Bains Ultra Inc. v. 7677 East Berry Avenue Associates, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: |
Bains Ultra Inc. |
Defendant: |
7677 East Berry Avenue Associates, L.P. and Direct Source Global, LLC |
Case Number: |
1:2008cv02021 |
Filed: |
September 18, 2008 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Trademark Office |
County: |
XX Outside US |
Presiding Judge: |
Marcia S. Krieger |
Presiding Judge: |
Kristen L. Mix |
Nature of Suit: |
Plaintiff |
Cause of Action: |
Federal Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 26, 2009 |
Filing
105
AMENDED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Joint 102 Motion for Dismissal Pursuant to Fed. R.Civ.P. 41 (a)(2) is GRANTED. All claims asserted are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear his, her or its own costs and attorneys fees incurred in connection with this action. The Clerk shall reopen this case as the Courts previous 104 Order was issued in error, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 06/26/09. (wjc, )
|
May 13, 2009 |
Filing
99
MINUTE ORDER granting 96 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Stay. All deadlines set to expire in this case prior to 06/12/09 are stayed. On or before 06/12/09, if no dismissal papers are filed, the parties shall be required to file a joint status report setting forth the reason for the delay and proposed extensions of the deadlines stayed by this Minute Order, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 05/13/09.(wjc, )
|
May 10, 2009 |
Filing
95
Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 05/10/09. (wjc, )
|
April 7, 2009 |
Filing
81
ORDER Dismissing Claims: The 80 Joint Motion for Dismissal Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(2) is granted. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Direct Source Global, LLC, are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All future captions shall so reflect, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 04/07/09.(wjc, )
|
March 27, 2009 |
Filing
71
MINUTE ORDER granting 67 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Permit Participation in Settlement Conference by Telephone. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall be responsible for ascertaining the telephone number where Plaintiffs' client representative can be reached throughout the duration of the conference, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 03/27/09.(wjc, )
|
February 10, 2009 |
Filing
61
ORDER granting 47 Plaintiff's Opposed Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum in Support of Motion. The Second Amended Complaint is accepted for filing as of the date of this Order. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Second Amended Complaint on or before 02/27/09. The caption shall be amended to add Plaintiff Gestion Ultra International, Inc., by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 02/10/09.(wjc, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?