Salazar et al v. Butterball, LLC
Plaintiff: |
Clara E. Salazar and Juanita Ybarra |
Defendant: |
Butterball, LLC |
Case Number: |
1:2008cv02071 |
Filed: |
September 25, 2008 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Labor: Fair Standards Office |
County: |
Weld |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard P. Matsch |
Nature of Suit: |
Plaintiff |
Cause of Action: |
Federal Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 22, 2011 |
Filing
110
OPINION AND ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR INDICATIVE RULING: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiffs Clara E. Salazar and Juanita Ybarrs Rule 62.1 Motion for Indicative Ruling that a Substantial Issue is Raised WarrantingReconsideration 98 is DENIED. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/22/11.(msksec, )
|
March 15, 2010 |
Filing
87
ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS, ADOPTING RECOMMENDATION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE, AND GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. The Plaintiffs' 84 Objections to Report and Recommendations are OVERRULED. The 82 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED. Butterball's 40 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. The Plaintiffs' 41 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. The Plaintiffs' 34 Motion to Certify Class is DENIED, AS MOOT. The Clerk of Court shall close this case, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 03/15/2010.(wjc, )
|
December 3, 2009 |
Filing
82
RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE - IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT: 1. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (filed May 15, 2009) (doc. # 40 ) be GRANTED and that summary judgment be entered in favor of Defendant Butterball and against Plaintiffs on: (1) Butterball's Thirty First Affirmative Defense to the First Cause of Action under the FLSA, 29 U.S.C. § 207(a)(1), pursuant to 29 U.S.C. § 203(o), and (2) on Butterball's Thirty Second Affirmative Defense to the Second Cause of Action under the Colorado Minimum Wage Act, Colo. Rev. Stat. § 8-6-101 et seq., and Colorado Minimum Wage Order 24. 2. In light of the Recommendation that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment be granted, that "Plain tiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Butterball's 29 U.S.C. § 203(o) Affirmative Defense" (filed May 15, 2009) (doc. # 41 ) be DENIED; and 3. In light of the Recommendation that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment be granted, that "Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Collective Action Certification" (filed May 15, 2009) (doc. # 34 ) be DENIED AS MOOT by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 12/3/2009. (cbscd)
|
November 3, 2009 |
Filing
79
Minute Entry for Motion Hearing proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 11/3/09, Withdrawing 70 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. Counsel advise the Court that they would like the Motion for Class Certification 34 HELD in ABEYA NCE until final ruling has been made on Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment 40 , and Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgement 41 . Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/9/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. (FTR Court Reporter - B. Abiakam)(babia)
|
January 5, 2009 |
Filing
27
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 1/5/09. (gms, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?