Canyon Resources Corporation et al v. Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Plaintiff: |
Canyon Resources Corporation and CR Kendall Corporation |
Defendant: |
Travelers Property Casualty Company of America |
Case Number: |
1:2008cv02215 |
Filed: |
October 10, 2008 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Insurance Office |
County: |
Jefferson |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert E. Blackburn |
Presiding Judge: |
Michael J. Watanabe |
Nature of Suit: |
Plaintiff |
Cause of Action: |
Diversity |
Jury Demanded By: |
28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 11, 2010 |
Filing
70
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The 68 Stipulation For Dismissal With Prejudice is APPROVED. Any pending motion is DENIED as moot. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 03/11/2010. (wjc, )
|
January 15, 2010 |
Filing
60
ORDER. Defendants Unopposed Motion To Correct Defendants Name 54 , filed01/15/2010, is GRANTED. The case caption is AMENDED to reflect that the defendant is The Travelers Property Casualty Company of America f/ka The Travelers Indemnity Company of Illinois. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 01/15/2010.(sah, )
|
January 8, 2010 |
Filing
51
ORDER. Plaintiffs collectively and defendant each SHALL FILE a brief, not to exceed fifteen (15) pages, construing the relevant terms of the policies by no later than Monday, 01/18/2010. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 01/08/2010. (sah, )
|
October 29, 2009 |
Filing
43
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Final Pretrial Conference held on 10/29/2009. Granting 41 Defendants 41 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify 40 Proposed Pretrial Order is GRANTED and the supplements will be included in the Final Pretrial order. (FTR - Debra Brown) (kmtcd)
|
September 28, 2009 |
Filing
35
MINUTE ORDER: Due to a conflict on the court's calendar, Settlement Conference start time is reset for 3:00 PM on 10/6/2009 in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 09/28/2009. (mjwcd )
|
August 17, 2009 |
Filing
33
ORDER granting 31 Parties Motion to Modify Scheduling Order to Extend the Fact and Expert Discovery Cut-Off and Dispositive Motion Deadline. The deadline to conduct fact and expert discovery is extended to 09/14/2009 and the deadline for dispositive motions is extended to 09/30/2009. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 08/17/2009.(sah, )
|
July 1, 2009 |
Filing
29
ORDER granting 27 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. The cut-off for fact discovery is extended to 08/14/2009. Expert and all other discovery 08/25/2009. Dispositive motion deadline 08/31/2009. Expert witness 07/10/2009 and Rebuttal expert witness 08/10/2009. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 07/01/2009.(sah, )
|
June 3, 2009 |
Filing
26
ORDER granting 24 Joint Motion to Approve Stipulation to Modify Scheduling Order. The deadlines for expert designations and rebuttal expert designations are 07/10/2009 and 08/10/2009 respectively and the deadline for expert discovery to 08/25/2009 by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 06/03/2009.(sah, )
|
January 13, 2009 |
Filing
13
TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Ten (10) Day Jury Trial set for 1/25/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 1/8/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 01/13/2009. (sah, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?