September 13, 2010 |
Filing
148
ORDER denying 135 Plaintiff's Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment and for a New Trial by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/13/2010.(erv, )
|
March 25, 2010 |
Filing
145
MINUTE ORDER. The Unopposed Motion To Withdraw Defendants Motion 133 Under F.R.Civ.P. Rule 54(d)(2) and Rule 11 For an Award of Attorneys Fees Against Plaintiff 144 filed 03/24/2010 is GRANTED. Defendants Motion Under F.R.Civ.P Rule 54(d)(2) and Rule 11 For an Award of Attorneys Fees Against Plaintiff 133 filed 02/12/2010, is WITHDRAWN. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 03/25/2010.(sah, )
|
January 27, 2010 |
Filing
129
ORDER. The Motion for Summary Judgment Field by NCUA as Liquidating Agent for Norlarco Credit Union 72 filed 10/30/2009, is GRANTED. The Motion for Summary Judgment on all Counterclaims of Defendant, Public Service Employees Credit Union, Against Plaintiff, Colonial Savings, F.A. 74 filed 10/30/2009, is GRANTED. Plaintiff Colonial Savings, F.A.s Motion for Summary Judgment 75 filed 10/30/2009, is DENIED. The First Amended Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs Claims by Defendant, Pub lic Service Employees Credit Union 79 filed 11/04/2009, is GRANTED. JUDGMENT SHALL ENTER in favor of the defendants, Public Service Employees Credit Union, Doing Business as Public Service Credit Union, a Colorado Nonprofit Corporation, Norlarco Cr edit Union, a Colorado Nonprofit Corporation, and the National Credit Union Administration, as Liquidating Agent for Norlarco Credit Union, and against the plaintiff, Colonial Savings, F.A., a Federal Savings Association. JUDGMENT SHALL ENTER in favo r of the defendant and counterclaimant, Public Service Employees Credit Union, Doing Business as Public Service Credit Union, a Colorado Nonprofit Corporation, and against the plaintiff and counterclaim defendant, Colonial Savings, F.A., a Federal Sa vings Association. JUDGMENT SHALL ENTER in favor of the defendant and counterclaimant, Public Service Employees Credit Union, Doing Business as Public Service Credit Union, a Colorado Nonprofit Corporation, and against the plaintiff and counterclaim defendant, Colonial Savings, F.A., a Federal Savings Association. The defendants are AWARDED their costs, to be taxed by the Clerk of the Court pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(d)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1.. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 01/27/2010.(sah, )
|
November 5, 2009 |
Filing
81
MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 80 Motion to Vacate by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/5/09. Defendant Public Service Employee's Credit Union's (PSECU) Motion To Vacate Minute Order and Grant Relief Concerning Defendant& #039;s Motions for Summary Judgment [#80], filed November 4, 2009, is GRANTED IN PART. PSECU's request for an expansion of the page limitation applicable under REB Civ. Practice Standard V.I.4 is GRANTED, and PSECU may file summary judgment mot ions totalling 30 pages. PSECU's Amended Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claims by Defendant, Public Service Employees Credit Union [#79], filed November 4, 2009, is accepted for filing as timely filed. That PSECU's Motion To Vacate Minute Order and Grant Relief Concerning Defendant's Motions for Summary Judgment [#80], filed November 4, 2009, otherwise is DENIED.(rebcd)
|
November 2, 2009 |
Filing
76
MINUTE ORDER striking 73 Motion For Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs Claims by Defendant, Public Service Employees Credit Union. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/02/2009.(sah, )
|
September 24, 2009 |
Filing
57
ORDER. The Motion To Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Jurisdiction 5 filed 12/15/2008, is DENIED. The Motion To Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) 7 , filed 12/22/2008, is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 09/24/2009.(sah, )
|
July 21, 2009 |
Filing
42
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/21/09. (cbssec) Modified on 7/22/2009 to add text (sah2, ).
|
March 2, 2009 |
Filing
21
TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Five (5) Day Jury Trial set for 1/25/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 1/8/2010 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 03/02/2009. (sah, )
|