Krepack v. Friedstein
Plaintiff: Howard D. Krepack
Defendant: Jay Friedstein
Case Number: 1:2008cv02605
Filed: December 1, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: P.I.: Other Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER denying 39 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel by Magistrate Judge Laird T. Milburn on 12/16/09.(erv, )
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying 44 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration and its Order dated November 12, 2009 43 . by Magistrate Judge Laird T. Milburn on 12/9/09.(erv, ) (Modified on 12/11/2009 corrected spacing error)(erv, ).
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying Without Prejudice as Premature 42 Plaintiffs Motion in Limine To Exclude the Testimony of Defense Witness Seth Bayer by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/13/09.(erv, )
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER re: 41 Defendant's Response to Motion that requests a thirty (30) day extension to file an amended response it its response to Plaintiffs 39 requests for admissions that are at issue. Since no reply has been timely filed by Plaintiff t o Defendants request for additional time, the Court, hereby GRANTS Defendants request and hereby ORDERS Defendant to file an amended response to Plaintiffs requests for admissions on or before November 23, 2009. by Magistrate Judge Laird T. Milburn on 11/12/09. (erv, )
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 33 Defendants motion for determination of Dr. Mark Purnells deposition fee by Magistrate Judge Laird T. Milburn on 7/20/09.(erv, )
February 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 3/23/2009 11:00 AM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Laird T. Milburn. by Magistrate Judge Laird T. Milburn on 2/26/09. (erv, )
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re: 4 Plaintiffs MOTION to Reassign Case Magistrate Judge filed by Howard D. Krepack. Defendant is hereby ORDERED to file a written response to Plaintiffs motion to reassign in writing with the Court on or before February 20, 2009. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/9/09. (erv, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krepack v. Friedstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard D. Krepack
Represented By: Sander N. Karp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Friedstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?