December 2, 2011 |
Filing
252
ORDER to Cure Deficiency re 247 Notice of Appeal by James Conkleton, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/02/11. (bjrsl, )
|
October 13, 2011 |
Filing
234
ORDER re: 233 . The Court has not received such subpoenas from Plaintiff. Accordingly, if Plaintiff wants subpoenas to be issued for Mr. Piper and/or Mr. Hollenbeck, he must comply with the Courts directive to submit subpoenas for them by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/13/11. (jjh, )
|
August 24, 2011 |
Filing
206
MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 203 Plaintiff's Motion for Court Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/24/2011. (mehcd)
|
July 15, 2011 |
Filing
201
MINUTE ORDER denying 199 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/15/2011. (mehcd)
|
March 28, 2011 |
Filing
190
ORDER. Order Affirming in Part and Rejecting in Part Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment 156 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. GRANTED as to that portion of Claim Four asserted as to Defendant Misel and as to Claim Six against Defendant Lind. Defendants Thomas Misel and Richard Lind are DISMISSED from the case and shall hereafter be taken off the caption. Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED as that portion of C laim Four against as to Defendant DeGroot and as to Claim Three against Defendant Muro. Ordered that a three-day trial to the Court is set commencing on 10/17/11, at 9:00. A Final Trial Preparation Conference is set for 09/29/11, at 4:00 p.m by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 03/28/11.(jjh, )
|
March 15, 2011 |
Filing
189
AMENDED ORDER Affirming and Adopting Recommendation on Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement. ORDERED that the Recommendation on Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Supplement Complaint Pursuant to Rule 15(d) 165 is AFFIRMED AND ADOPTED and Plaintiffs Objections to the Recommendation 173 are OVERRULED. In accordance with the Recommendation. ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Supplement Compliant Pursuant to Rule 15(d) 153 is DENIED by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 03/15/11.(jjh, )
|
March 7, 2011 |
Filing
186
ORDER Affirming and Adopting Recommendation on Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement. Ordered that the Recommendation on Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Supplement Complaint 143 is Affirmed and Adopted and Plaintiff's Objections to the Recommendation 173 are Overruled. Ordered that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Supplement Complaint 117 is denied by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 03/07/11. (jjhsl, )
|
January 31, 2011 |
Filing
178
ORDER Denying as moot 174 Plaintiffs motion in limine; Denying 174 Plaintiffs motion to suppress, construed as a motion for sanctions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/31/2011.(erv, )
|
July 29, 2010 |
Filing
151
ORDER Affirming and adopting the Report and Recommendation 143 . Denying 117 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 7/29/10.(gmssl, )
|
July 12, 2010 |
Filing
150
MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 145 Plaintiff's Motion for Non-Appearance Subpoena Duces Tecums [sic]. To the extent that they have not already done so, the Defendants are directed to submit to the Plaintiff, on or before July 19, 2010, a verified response to Plaintiff's additional document requests affirming that no such documents exist. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/12/2010. (mehcd)
|
March 15, 2010 |
Filing
133
ORDER AFFIRMED IN PART AND REJECTED IN PART 89 Report and Recommendations. granting 114 Defendants Motion to Dismiss Injunctive and Declaratory Judgment Claims as Moot; granting in part and denying in part 54 Defendants Motion to Dismiss; It i s FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Objection in Part to Magistrate Judges Recommendation on Defendants Motion to Dismiss in Part 95 is DENIED AS MOOT; it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs Objection in Part to Magistrate Judges Recommendation on Defendants Motion to Dismiss in Part 112 is SUSTAINED IN PART AND OVERRULED IN PART by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/15/2010.(erv, )
|
January 22, 2010 |
Filing
125
ORDER re: 111 Plaintiffs Notice of Dismissal of Claims Five and Seven of this action pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A). It is therefore ORDERED that Claims Five and Seven of the Amended Complaint are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 1/22/2010. (erv, )
|
October 27, 2009 |
Filing
102
MINUTE ORDER granting 100 Plaintiff's Motion for Service of Magistrate Judge's Recommendation on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss in Part. The Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of the Report and Recommendation(docket #89) to Plaintiff. (SENT BY MEHCD ON 10/27/2009). By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/27/2009. (mehcd)
|
October 16, 2009 |
Filing
99
Minute ORDER denying without prejudice 97 Notice and Motion to Quash. Plaintiff may re-file a complete and signed motion by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/16/09.(jjh, )
|
October 8, 2009 |
Filing
94
MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 90 Plaintiff's Motion for Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/8/2009. (mehcd)
|
October 1, 2009 |
Filing
89
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION That 54 MOTION to Dismiss In Part filed by Richard (I) DeGroot, Richard Lind, Bonnie (I) Cantu, Thomas Misel, Richard DeGroot, Ed (I) Muro, James Lander, Aristedes W. Zavaras, Cathie Holst, John P. McGill, Bonnie Cantu, Ed Muro, James (I) Lander, Al Estep, Thomas (I) Misel, Joe Stommel, John (I) P. McGill be granted in part and denied in part, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/1/09. (gmssl, )
|
September 22, 2009 |
Filing
88
MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 85 Plaintiff's Motion to Deem First Set of Request for Admission Admitted for Lack of Response, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/22/2009. (mehcd)
|
July 29, 2009 |
Filing
78
ORDER granting 75 Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery in Part Based on Qualified Immunity. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/29/2009. (mehcd)
|
July 28, 2009 |
Filing
74
MINUTE ORDER denying 72 Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/28/2009. (mehcd)
|
May 19, 2009 |
Filing
56
MINUTE ORDER Denying as moot 52 Defendants Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/19/09.(erv, )
|
May 15, 2009 |
Filing
51
ORDER denying 49 Defendants Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/15/09.(erv, )
|
March 17, 2009 |
Filing
28
ORDER Granting service by the United States Marshal by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/17/09. (erv, )
|
March 4, 2009 |
Filing
24
ORDER DRAWING CASE. Ordered that this case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 03/04/2009. (sah, )
|
February 26, 2009 |
Filing
21
ORDER to Cure Deficiency re: 19 Notice of Appeal filed by James K. Conkleton by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 02/26/09. Appellant has 30 days to either pay the filing fee or file a proper 1915 motion with district court.(bjrsl, )
|
January 23, 2009 |
Filing
16
Minute ORDER denying as moot 13 Motion to Stay and Order denying as unnecessary 13 Motion to Quash. Plaintiff continues to have 30 days in which to submit an amended complaint as directed by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/23/09.(jjhsl, )
|
January 21, 2009 |
Filing
15
ORDER denying 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 01/21/09.(jjh, )
|
January 7, 2009 |
Filing
7
ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/07/09. (jjh, )
|