Western Capital Partners LLC v. Blixseth et al
Plaintiff: |
Western Capital Partners LLC |
Defendant: |
Edra D. Blixseth and Matthew R. Crocker |
Case Number: |
1:2008cv02707 |
Filed: |
December 12, 2008 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Negotiable Instrument Office |
County: |
Denver |
Presiding Judge: |
Walker D. Miller |
Presiding Judge: |
Kathleen M. Tafoya |
Nature of Suit: |
None |
Cause of Action: |
Diversity |
Jury Demanded By: |
28:1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 30, 2009 |
Filing
91
ORDER. Both Plaintiffs Motion for Attorneys Fees and Motion for Correctionof Judgment Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 60(a) and F.R.C.P. 60(b) 22 and 67 are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 09/30/2009.(sah, )
|
February 20, 2009 |
Filing
46
ORDER re: 45 Judgment Debtor Exam, Defendant/judgment debtor Edra D. Blixseth has been found in CONTEMPT of this Courts order and authority. A warrant for arrest shall be issued by the Clerk of the Court, citing CONTEMPT of court as the violation of law, and commanding the United States Marshals Service to LOCATE, ARREST and DETAIN IN CUSTODY defendant Blixseth and to henceforth bring her to the Court for proceedings under Fed. R. Civ. P. 69. Execution of the warrant for arrest shall be limited to the confines of the State and District of Colorado. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/20/09. (erv, )
|
February 18, 2009 |
Filing
44
MINUTE ORDER denying 40 Committees Motion for Authorization to Telephonic Appearance in the Judgment Debtor Examination of Edra D. Blizseth on the basis of mootness. Defendant Edra D. Blixseth failed to appear at the Judgment Debtor Examination pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 69 scheduled for February 18, 2009. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/18/09.(erv, )
|
February 13, 2009 |
Filing
32
ORDER Certifying 15 Default Judgment, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/13/09. (erv, )
|
February 12, 2009 |
Filing
36
ORDER Defendant/judgment debtor Matthew R. Crocker has been found in CONTEMPT of this Courts order and authority. A warrant for arrest shall be issued by the Clerk of the Court, citing CONTEMPT of court as the violation of law, and commanding the Un ited States Marshals Service to LOCATE, ARREST and DETAIN IN CUSTODY defendant Crocker and to henceforth bring him to the Court for proceedings under Fed. R. Civ. P. 69. Execution of the warrant for arrest shall be limited to the confines of the State and District of Colorado, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/12/09. (gms, ) Modified on 2/17/2009 to correct typographical error(gms, ).
|
February 11, 2009 |
Filing
27
ORDER re: 23 Emergency MOTION to Appoint Receiver AND REQUEST FOR FORTHWITH HEARING filed by Western Capital Partners LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 602 before Judge Christine M. Arguello. Counsel for Plaintiff is DIRECTED to notify the debtor/Defendants and any other creditors who may have an interest in this case of this hearing. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/11/09. (erv, )
|
January 22, 2009 |
Filing
14
Judgment by Default (ORDER) re: 12 Motion for Default Judgment. Clerk to enter judgment by default in favor of Plaintiff and against Ms. Blixseth a/k/a Ms. Crooker and Mr. Crocker jointly and severally as follows: $13,298,628.13 in compensatory damages. Costs as established by the Bill of Costs that Plaintiff may submit pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54. Signed by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/22/09.(gms, )
|
January 7, 2009 |
Filing
11
ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 3/12/2009 09:45 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/7/09. (erv, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?