November 8, 2010 |
Filing
214
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs andattorneys fees. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/8/2010. (erv, )
|
September 20, 2010 |
Filing
197
ORDER granting 149 Defendants' Motion to Compel and for Leave to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum on Neurological Consulting, P.C., as set forth in the Order. Denying 166 Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order & Response to Motion to Compel as set forth in the Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/20/2010.(mjwcd)
|
September 14, 2010 |
Filing
190
MINUTE ORDER granting 180 defendants Unopposed Motion to Seal. Accordingly, the documents submitted by the defendants that have been filed as [179 shall be sealed until further order of the court; granting 183 Plaintiffs Stipulated Motion for In Camera Inspection. Accordingly, the documents submitted by the plaintiff that have been filed as 184 shall be sealed until further order of the court. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/14/2010.(erv, )
|
June 3, 2010 |
Filing
134
ORDER granting 132 Stipulated Motion. Scheduling Order 21 is amended. Discovery due by 7/9/2010 for the limited purpose of conducting certain depositions, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/3/2010.(mjwcd)
|
May 6, 2010 |
Filing
131
MINUTE ORDER granting 126 Stipulated Motion to Amend Scheduling Order for Limited Purpose of Completing Certain Depositions, and to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadline. Discovery due by 5/28/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 6/18/2010. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/6/2010.(erv, )
|
February 18, 2010 |
Filing
124
ORDER granting 122 Stipulated Motion to Amend Scheduling Order for Limited Purpose of Completing Depositions and for Defendants to Submit Expert Disclosures on Claim Handling Practices and Insurance Bad Faith. Discovery deadline for the limited pur pose of conducting certain depositions is 3/31/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 4/30/2010. Unum's disclosure deadline re: claim handling practices and insurance bad faith is 2/19/2010, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/18/2010.(mjwcd)
|
January 4, 2010 |
Filing
120
ORDER granting 91 Defendants Motion for Protective Order Protecting Confidential Status of Documents Pursuant to Docket No. 65 and F.R.C.P. [sic]26(c)(7). by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/4/2010.(erv, )
|
December 31, 2009 |
Filing
119
MINUTE ORDER granting 117 Plaintiff's Stipulated Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Re: Extension of Time to Submit Dislcosures [sic] of Expert Witnesses on Claim Handling Practices and Insurance Bad Faith and Rebuttal Opinions by One (1) Week, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/31/2009.(mjwcd )
|
December 4, 2009 |
Filing
108
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 90 Plaintiffs Disputed Motion to Strike Untimely Designation of Non-Retained and Retained Expert Witnesses by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/4/09.(erv, )
|
November 19, 2009 |
Filing
101
MINUTE ORDER granting 93 Plaintiffs Stipulated Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. The deadline for designation of bad faith and claims handling experts is extended up to and including January 4, 2010; The deadline for designation of rebuttal bad fai th and claims handling experts is extended up to and including February 4, 2010; Discovery due by 3/1/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 3/30/2010. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/6/2010. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/12/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/19/09.(erv, )
|
September 14, 2009 |
Filing
77
ORDER granting 73 Unopposed Motion to Clarify or Amend Docket 72 so that it includes an extension of the general discovery cut-off deadline to and including November 20, 2009 within the amendments to the scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/14/09.(erv, )
|
August 31, 2009 |
Filing
72
MINUTE ORDER granting 69 Plaintiffs Stipulated Motion to Amend 21 Scheduling Order as follows: to allow disclosure of expert witness opinions on claim handling and insurance bad faith through December 1, 2009; rebuttal opinions to be submitted on or before January 4, 2010; and extending the discovery deadline for the depositions of expert witnesses on claim handling and insurance bad faith through February 1, 2010. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/31/09.(erv, )
|
July 10, 2009 |
Filing
65
AGREED STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/10/09. (erv, )
|
July 7, 2009 |
Filing
61
MINUTE ORDER granting 59 Plaintiffs Stipulated Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Re: Extension of Time Until October 1, 2009, to Submit Disclosure of Expert Witnesses on Claim Handling Practices and Insurance Bad Faith and Extension of Time Until De cember 1, 2009, for Depositions of Such Expert Witnesses through October 1, 2009, and extending the discovery deadline for the depositions of expert witnesses on claim handling and insurance bad faith until December 1, 2009. Discovery due by 12/1/2009. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/7/09.(erv, )
|
June 12, 2009 |
Filing
50
MINUTE ORDER granting 26 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint; granting 42 Defendants Second Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. it is FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for amendment of pleadings is extended up to and including June 26, 2009. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/12/09.(erv, )(Modified on 6/17/2009 corrected text regarding the granting of motions)(erv, ).
|
May 27, 2009 |
Filing
41
MINUTE ORDER granting 28 Defendants Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order. The deadline to amend the pleadings or join additional parties is extended to May 27, 2009. The Rule 16 Scheduling Order 21 is amended consistent with this minute order. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/27/09.(erv, )
|
May 26, 2009 |
Filing
38
Minute ORDER granting 36 Motion to Vacate Settlement Conference. The Settlement Conference set before Magistrate Watanabe on 06/23/09 is vacated. Ordered that the parties shall file a joint written status report with the court on or before 08/07/09, regarding their private mediation scheduled for 07/29/09 by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 05/26/09.(jjh, )
|
April 22, 2009 |
Filing
24
ORDER granting 22 Motion to Vacate Settlement Conf. Settlement Conference Reset for 6/23/2009 03:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/22/09.(erv, )
|
January 14, 2009 |
Filing
15
ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 3/11/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/14/09. (erv, )
|