Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation v. EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.
Plaintiff: Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation
Defendant: Pacific Rim Engineered Products Ltd., Mayco Industries Group, Guide Technologies, Inc., EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc., Rick Mason, 1297835 Alberta Ltd. doing business as Mayco Industries Group, Wes Arnold and Kobelt Manufacturing Ltd.
Counter Claimant: 1297835 Alberta Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2008cv02750
Filed: December 17, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Contract Product Liability Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Marcia S Krieger
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2013 Filing 269 MANDATE of USCA as to #264 Notice of Appeal, filed by EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc., #261 Notice of Appeal, filed by Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation : (USCA Case No. 13-1351 & 13-1368) (dbrow, )
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER of USCA as to #264 Notice of Appeal, filed by EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc., #261 Notice of Appeal, filed by Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (USCA Case No. 13-1351 & 13-1368) (dbrow, )
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER of USCA as to #264 Notice of Appeal, filed by EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc., #261 Notice of Appeal, filed by Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. Parties are granted until 10/4/13, to file the preliminary appellate documents in both cases. In the alternative, if the parties finalize the settlement, they may file a motion or motions seeking voluntary dismissal of these appeals by 10/4/13. (USCA Case No. 13-1351 & 13-1368) (dbrow, )
September 4, 2013 Filing 266 USCA Case Number 13-1368 for #264 Notice of Appeal, filed by EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (dbrow, )
September 4, 2013 Filing 265 LETTER Transmitting Notice of Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the #264 Notice of Appeal, filed by EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc. to the U.S. Court of Appeals. ( Retained Counsel, Fee paid,) (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Preliminary Record)(dbrow, )
September 3, 2013 Filing 264 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #260 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees,,,, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify,,,, Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law,,,, Order on Motion to Strike,,, #233 Judgment by Defendant EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc. (Filing fee $ 455, Receipt Number 1082-3517090) (Lopach, Paul)
August 22, 2013 Filing 263 USCA Case Number 13-1351 for #261 Notice of Appeal, filed by Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (dbrow, )
August 22, 2013 Filing 262 LETTER Transmitting Notice of Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the #261 Notice of Appeal, filed by Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation to the U.S. Court of Appeals. ( Retained Counsel, Fee paid,) (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Preliminary Record)(dbrow, )
August 21, 2013 Filing 261 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #260 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees,,,, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify,,,, Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law,,,, Order on Motion to Strike,,, by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation (Filing fee $ 455, Receipt Number 1082-3501352) (Curtis, Cory)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 260 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW OR FOR NEW TRIAL, GRANTING MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES, AND DENYING MOTION FOR PREJUDGMENT INTEREST: Xtreme's Motion for Attorney's Fees #238 is GRANTED IN PART, insofar as the Judgment (#233) is DEEMED AMENDED to include an award of attorney's fees and expenses in favor of Xtreme in the amount of $500,610.10, and DENIED IN PART in all other respects. Xtreme's Motion to Amend the Judgment #240 to include prejudgment interest is DENIED. Encana's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, or in the alternative, For a New Trial #242 is DENIED. Encana's Motion to Strike #257 Mr. Stark's affidavit is DENIED AS MOOT. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/22/13.(msksec, )
April 25, 2013 Filing 259 REPLY to Response to #257 MOTION to Strike Declaration of David Stark (Doc.# 256-1) filed by Defendant EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Lopach, Paul)
April 15, 2013 Filing 258 RESPONSE to #257 MOTION to Strike Declaration of David Stark (Doc.# 256-1) filed by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Curtis, Cory)
March 20, 2013 Filing 257 MOTION to Strike Declaration of David Stark (Doc.# 256-1) by Defendant EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Lopach, Paul)
March 15, 2013 Filing 256 REPLY to Response to #238 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Counter Defendants Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation, Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation, Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Curtis, Cory)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER granting #254 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion for Attorney Fees. Extension granted up to and including March 15, 2013. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS WILL BE GRANTED. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/19/13. Text Only Entry(msksec, )
February 18, 2013 Filing 254 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #238 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) re: Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Its Reply in Support of Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs)(Curtis, Cory)
February 8, 2013 Filing 253 BRIEF in Opposition to #238 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Defendant EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lopach, Paul)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER granting #251 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion for Attorney Fees. Extension granted up to and including February 8, 2013. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS WILL BE GRANTED. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/11/13. Text Only Entry(msksec, )
January 11, 2013 Filing 251 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #238 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Defendant EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Lopach, Paul)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER finding as moot #245 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The motion sought an extension to December 21, 2012. That date has passed, rendering the motion moot. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/11/13. Text Only Entry(msksec, )
December 7, 2012 Filing 249 BRIEF in Support of #242 Renewed MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 50(b) or, in the Alternative, Motion for New Trial Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 59(a)(1)(A) filed by Defendant EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Lopach, Paul)
December 3, 2012 Filing 248 REPLY to Response to #240 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #233 Judgment Plaintiff's Rule 59(e) Motion to Amend Judgment to Include Pre-Judgment Interest filed by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Curtis, Cory)
November 20, 2012 Filing 247 RESPONSE to #240 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #233 Judgment Plaintiff's Rule 59(e) Motion to Amend Judgment to Include Pre-Judgment Interest filed by Defendant EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lopach, Paul)
November 20, 2012 Filing 246 BRIEF in Opposition to #242 Renewed MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 50(b) or, in the Alternative, Motion for New Trial Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 59(a)(1)(A) filed by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Quiat, Laurin)
November 15, 2012 Filing 245 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #238 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Defendant EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Lopach, Paul)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER granting #243 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Extension granted up to and including November 20, 2012. No further extensions will be granted for the reasons stated in the motion. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/24/12. Text Only Entry(msksec, )
October 23, 2012 Filing 243 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #240 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #233 Judgment Plaintiff's Rule 59(e) Motion to Amend Judgment to Include Pre-Judgment Interest, #238 MOTION for Attorney Fees , #242 Renewed MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 50(b) or, in the Alternative, Motion for New Trial Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 59(a)(1)(A) by Defendant EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Rynerson, Stephen)
October 12, 2012 Filing 242 Renewed MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 50(b) or, in the Alternative, Motion for New Trial Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 59(a)(1)(A) by Defendant EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 110, #4 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 111, #5 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 112, #6 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 113, #7 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 153, #8 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 221, #9 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 222 (1 of 2), #10 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 222 (2 of 2), #11 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 223, #12 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 224, #13 Volume 1 Encana Trial Transcript, #14 Volume 2 Encana Trial Transcript, #15 Volume 3 Encana Trial Transcript, #16 Volume 4 Encana Trial Transcript)(Lopach, Paul)
October 10, 2012 Filing 241 Costs Taxed in amount of $ 5,803.16 against Defendant Encana Oil & Gas (USA) Inc. (klyon, )
October 9, 2012 Filing 240 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #233 Judgment Plaintiff's Rule 59(e) Motion to Amend Judgment to Include Pre-Judgment Interest by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Curtis, Cory)
October 5, 2012 Filing 239 BRIEF in Support of #238 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Laurin Quiat and exhibits A - B, #2 Exhibit 1 - part 2 - exhibit C to Declaration of Laurin Quiat, #3 Exhibit 2 in Support of Brief, #4 Exhibit 3 in Support of Brief, #5 Exhibit 4 in Support of Brief)(Curtis, Cory)
October 5, 2012 Filing 238 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Curtis, Cory)
October 3, 2012 Filing 237 OBJECTIONS to #236 Plaintiff's Bill of Costs by Defendant EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Rynerson, Stephen) Modified on 10/4/2012 to create linkage (klyon, ).
September 28, 2012 Filing 236 Proposed Bill of Costs by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Laurin D. Quiat, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Fees of the clerk, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Fees of the court reporter, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Fees for witnesses, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D - Fees for exemplification and copies, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E - Costs incident to depositions)(Curtis, Cory)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER granting #234 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Extension granted up to and including October 5, 2012. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/26/12. Text Only Entry(msksec, )
September 25, 2012 Filing 234 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs, Including Costs Not Recoverable Under 20 U.S.C. 1920 by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Curtis, Cory)
September 14, 2012 Filing 233 JUDGMENT re: #232 Jury Trial - Completed. By Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 09/14/2012. (klyon, )
September 14, 2012 Filing 232 MINUTE ENTRY forJury Trial Day 5 held before Judge Marcia S. Krieger completed on 9/14/2012. Jury in deliberation. JURY VERDICT. Trial concluded. Court Reporter: Terri Lindblom. (mskcd)
September 13, 2012 Filing 231 Defendant's Tendered Jury Instructions. (mskcd) Modified on 9/17/2012 to correct typo (klyon, ).
September 13, 2012 Filing 230 Plaintiff's Tendered Jury Instructions and Verdict Form. (mskcd)
September 13, 2012 Filing 229 Court's Proposed Jury Instructions. (mskcd)
September 13, 2012 Filing 228 MINUTE ENTRY for Jury Trial Day Four held before Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/13/2012. Charging Conference, Court instructs the jury, closing arguments, Court Security Officer Sworn, Jury excused to begin deliberations. Trial continues. Court Reporter: Terri Lindblom. (mskcd)
September 12, 2012 Filing 226 MINUTE ENTRY for Jury Trial Day Three held before Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/12/2012. Witness testimony, exhibits received/refused are as set forth in the Minutes. Defendants rest. Rebuttal by plaintiff presented. Evidence completed. Trial continues. Court Reporter: Terri Lindblom. (mskcd)
September 11, 2012 Filing 225 MINUTE ENTRY for Jury Trial Day Two held before Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/11/2012. Witness testimony, exhibits received/refused are set forth in the Minutes. Plaintiff rests. Oral Rule 50 Motion by defendants. Defense case begins. Trial continues. Court Reporter: Terri Lindblom. (mskcd)
September 10, 2012 Filing 227 MINUTE ENTRY for Jury Trial Minutes Day One held before Judge Marcia S. Krieger Amended re #224 . Amended to reflect the complete date of proceeding. Court Reporter: Terri Lindblom. (mskcd)
September 10, 2012 Filing 224 MINUTE ENTRY for Jury Trial Day One held before Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/10/2012. Jury selection, opening statements. Witness testimony, exhibits received/refused are as set forth in the Minutes. Trial continues. Court Reporter: Terri Lindblom. (mskcd)
September 7, 2012 Filing 223 DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY Supplemental Counter Designation of Deposition Testimony by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Quiat, Laurin)
September 6, 2012 Filing 222 DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY (Supplemental) by Defendant EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Lopach, Paul)
August 1, 2012 Filing 221 TRANSCRIPT of Final Pretrial Conference held on 2-1-12 before Judge Krieger. Pages: 1-39. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/2/2012. (Zuckerman, Paul) Modified on 8/2/2012 to adjust text paragraphs (wjcsl, ).
March 2, 2012 Filing 220 Proposed Voir Dire Questions by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Quiat, Laurin)
March 2, 2012 Filing 219 Proposed Voir Dire Questions by Defendant EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Lopach, Paul)
February 1, 2012 Filing 218 MINUTE ENTRY for Final Pretrial Conference held before Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/1/2012. #184 Motion in Limine is DENIED; #185 Motion in Limine is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; #186 Motion in Limine is DENIED; #187 Motion in Limine is DENIED; #188 Motion in Limine is DENIED; #191 Motion in Limine is DENIED as moot; Jury Trial (5 days)set for 9/10/2012 09:00 AM; 9/11/12-9/14/12 at 8:30 a.m., in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. The Final Pretrial Order #217 is APPROVED. Other matters addressed and/or deadlines imposed are as set forth in the Minutes. (Court Reporter: Paul Zuckerman) (mskcd)
January 31, 2012 Filing 217 Proposed Pretrial Order - Joint Submission of Additional Stipulated Facts by Defendant EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Lopach, Paul)
January 27, 2012 Filing 216 NOTICE of Change of Firm Name by Defendant EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc. (Lopach, Paul)
November 22, 2011 Filing 215 DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Curtis, Cory)
November 14, 2011 Filing 214 Proposed Pretrial Order by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Witness List, #2 Appendix Exhibit List)(Curtis, Cory)
November 14, 2011 Filing 213 Proposed Jury Instructions by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Curtis, Cory)
November 14, 2011 Filing 212 Proposed Jury Instructions by Defendant EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Rynerson, Stephen)
November 14, 2011 Filing 211 DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY (Supplemental) by Defendant EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Lopach, Paul)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER SETTING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/1/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/14/11. (msksec, )
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER denying #208 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Revised Pretrial Order and Continue Setting of Pretrial Conference. The motions in limine are primarily directed at the relevance of certain items of evidence. The Court does not generally address motions raising relevance issues prior to trial, as the relevance of evidence cannot be fully assessed without a full understanding of the precise character of the evidence to be offered and the factual context within the trial in which that offer is made. The parties shall comply with the Court's Order at docket entry #203 as previously directed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/2/11. Text Only Entry(msksec, )
November 1, 2011 Filing 208 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Revised Pretrial Order and Continue Setting of Pretrial Conference by Defendant EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc., Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Gurr, Stephen)
September 27, 2011 Filing 207 Joint STATUS REPORT in Email Format by Defendant EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Lopach, Paul)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 206 MINUTE ORDER: Based on the representations of the parties that there are no outstanding issues for resolution at the discovery hearing, the hearing set for September 29, 2011, is VACATED. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/27/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(kmtlc1 )
August 29, 2011 Filing 205 MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held on 8/29/2011 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Joint Status Report or separate Status Reports due by 9/27/2011. Discovery Hearing set for 9/29/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. For further information, see attached minutes. (FTR: Nick Richards) (kmtcd)
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 204 MINUTE ORDER Scheduling Conference re: expedited discovery schedule set for 8/29/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/17/11. (gmssl, )
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 203 Opinion and ORDER granting in part and denying in part #189 Motion for Entry of an Order Regarding the Rig 7 Contract and #190 Motion for Entry of Order Regarding Xtreme Rig 7, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/15/11.(gmssl, )
July 8, 2011 Filing 202 JUDGMENT FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES by Clerk re: 201 Order on Motion for Judgment. See the Judgment for detail, by Clerk on 07/08/2011. (wjc, )
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER granting #200 Motion for Judgment: The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in favor of Defendant Alberta and against Mr. Weaver in the amount of $12,210.62. By Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/5/11.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (msklc2, )
May 16, 2011 Filing 200 Unopposed MOTION for Judgment Against Russell D. Weaver by Defendant 1297835 Alberta Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Wells, Mary)
March 25, 2011 Filing 199 RESPONSE to #187 MOTION in Limine Regarding Encana's Setoff, Prior Material Breach and Complete Performance "Affirmative Defenses" filed by Defendant EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Lopach, Paul)
March 25, 2011 Filing 198 RESPONSE to #185 MOTION in Limine Regarding Product Liability Evidence and Judicial Admissions filed by Defendant EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Lopach, Paul)
March 25, 2011 Filing 197 RESPONSE to #186 MOTION in Limine Regarding Defendant's Failure to Mitigate Defense filed by Defendant EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Lopach, Paul)
March 25, 2011 Filing 196 RESPONSE to #189 MOTION for Order to Enter an Order Regarding the Rig 7 Contract filed by Defendant EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Lopach, Paul)
March 25, 2011 Filing 195 RESPONSE to #184 MOTION in Limine Regarding Allegedly Positive Drug Tests filed by Defendant EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Lopach, Paul)
March 25, 2011 Filing 194 RESPONSE to #188 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation's 'Fire Resistant Clothing' Invoices filed by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Curtis, Cory)
March 25, 2011 Filing 193 RESPONSE to #191 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation's 'Contract Rate Revision' Invoices filed by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Curtis, Cory)
March 25, 2011 Filing 192 RESPONSE to #190 MOTION for Order to Enter an Order Regarding Xtreme Rig 7 filed by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Curtis, Cory)
March 11, 2011 Filing 191 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation's 'Contract Rate Revision' Invoices by Defendant EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Lopach, Paul)
March 11, 2011 Filing 190 MOTION for Order to Enter an Order Regarding Xtreme Rig 7 by Defendant EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Lopach, Paul)
March 11, 2011 Filing 189 MOTION for Order to Enter an Order Regarding the Rig 7 Contract by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhbits A - B, #2 Exhibit Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Curtis, Cory)
March 11, 2011 Filing 188 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation's 'Fire Resistant Clothing' Invoices by Defendant EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lopach, Paul)
March 11, 2011 Filing 187 MOTION in Limine Regarding Encana's Setoff, Prior Material Breach and Complete Performance "Affirmative Defenses" by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A - B, #2 Exhibit Exhibits C - D)(Curtis, Cory)
March 11, 2011 Filing 186 MOTION in Limine Regarding Defendant's Failure to Mitigate Defense by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Curtis, Cory)
March 11, 2011 Filing 185 MOTION in Limine Regarding Product Liability Evidence and Judicial Admissions by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Curtis, Cory)
March 11, 2011 Filing 184 MOTION in Limine Regarding Allegedly Positive Drug Tests by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Curtis, Cory)
March 1, 2011 Filing 183 Minute Entry for Final Pretrial Conference held before Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/1/2011. The Trial scheduled on March 14, 2011 at 1:00 p.m. is VACATED. Deadlines set and other matters addressed are as set forth in the Minutes. (Court Reporter: Paul Zuckerman) (mskcd)
February 25, 2011 Filing 182 DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY XTREM0E COIL DRILLING CORPORATIONS CROSS-DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Curtis, Cory)
February 15, 2011 Filing 181 Proposed Pretrial Order by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Exhibit List, #2 Appendix Witness List)(Curtis, Cory)
February 15, 2011 Filing 180 Proposed Jury Instructions and Special Verdict Forms with Authority by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Curtis, Cory)
February 15, 2011 Filing 179 Proposed Jury Instructions by Defendant EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Lopach, Paul)
February 14, 2011 Filing 178 NOTICE OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT by Defendant Pacific Rim Engineered Products Ltd. (Swift, Jeremy)
February 11, 2011 Filing 177 DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY by Defendant EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Lopach, Paul)
January 20, 2011 Filing 176 Costs Taxed in amount of $ 3,336.30 against Plaintiff (gmssl, )
December 23, 2010 Filing 175 Proposed Bill of Costs by Defendant Pacific Rim Engineered Products Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Swift, Jeremy)
December 9, 2010 Filing 174 JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P.54(b). Judgment is hereby entered in favor Defendant Pacific Rim Engineered Products, Ltd. and against Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation, on the claims in this action, with costs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1), by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/09/2010. (wjc, )
December 9, 2010 Filing 173 Minute Entry for Rule 16 Hearing held before Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/9/2010. #152 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) is GRANTED; #156 Motion for Attorney Fees is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; #160 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is GRANTED; #164 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney is GRANTED; #167 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint is DENIED. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/1/2011 10:30 AM and Jury Trial set for 3/14/2011 01:00 PM through the remainder of the week, all in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. All subsequent days of trial will begin at 8:30 a.m., unless counsel are notified otherwise. (Court Reporter: Tracy Weir) (mskcd)
December 7, 2010 Filing 172 BRIEF in Opposition to #167 MOTION for Leave to Amend Encana Oil & Gas (USA) Inc.'s Opposition to Extreme Coil Drilling Corporation's Motion for Leave to Amend filed by Defendant EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Lopach, Paul)
December 2, 2010 Filing 171 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Michael J. Hofmann by Paul Joseph Lopach on behalf of EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc. (Lopach, Paul)
November 24, 2010 Filing 170 RESPONSE to #164 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation filed by Defendant 1297835 Alberta Ltd.. (Wells, Mary)
November 24, 2010 Filing 169 RESPONSE to #160 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and/or Motion to Strike filed by Defendant 1297835 Alberta Ltd.. (Wells, Mary)
November 24, 2010 Filing 168 MEMORANDUM regarding #167 MOTION for Leave to Amend filed by Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/24/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(msksec, )
November 23, 2010 Filing 167 MOTION for Leave to Amend #66 First Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Amended Complaint)(Curtis, Cory) Modified on 11/24/2010 to add linkage (wjc, ).
November 19, 2010 Filing 166 REPLY to Response to #156 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs, or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment on Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Defendant 1297835 Alberta Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wells, Mary)
November 16, 2010 Filing 165 MEMORANDUM regarding #164 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/16/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(msksec, )
November 16, 2010 Filing 164 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Weaver, Russell)
November 4, 2010 Filing 163 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Eric Walter Kristiansen on behalf of Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation (Kristiansen, Eric)
November 2, 2010 Filing 162 RESPONSE to #156 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs, or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment on Attorney Fees and Costs Response of Russell D. Weaver filed by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Weaver, Russell)
November 2, 2010 Filing 161 RESPONSE to #156 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs, or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment on Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Xtreme's Response to Defendant 1297835 Alberta Ltd.'s Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Xtreme's Response to Defendant 1297835 Alberta Ltd.'s Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Xtreme's Response to Defendant 1297835 Alberta Ltd.'s Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs)(Curtis, Cory)
November 2, 2010 Filing 160 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and/or Motion to Strike by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Curtis, Cory)
October 20, 2010 Filing 159 CONFESSION of Motion for Entry of Final Judgment Pursuant to Fed R Civ P 54(B) by Defendant Pacific Rim Engineered Products Ltd.. (Swift, Jeremy)
October 20, 2010 Filing 158 Docket Annotation re: 157 Order. Modified on 10/20/2010 to edit signed date to same as filed date. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (wjc, )
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER Re-Setting TIME of Rule 16 Hearing 12/9/2010 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/19/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(msksec, ) Modified on 10/20/2010 to edit signed date to same as filed date (wjc, ).
October 12, 2010 Filing 156 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs, or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment on Attorney Fees and Costs by Defendant 1297835 Alberta Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Wells, Mary)
October 6, 2010 Filing 155 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Cory Murray Curtis on behalf of Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation (Curtis, Cory)
October 6, 2010 Filing 154 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Laurin D. Quiat on behalf of Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation (Quiat, Laurin)
October 6, 2010 Filing 153 STATUS REPORT Regarding Settlement Conference by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Weaver, Russell)
September 23, 2010 Filing 152 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) by Defendant Pacific Rim Engineered Products Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Swift, Jeremy)
September 21, 2010 Filing 151 Docket Annotation re: #150 Opinion and Order. Modified on 9/21/2010 to edit filed date. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (wjc, )
September 19, 2010 Filing 150 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING AND DENYING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: For the foregoing reasons, Alberta's Motion for Summary Judgment #101 is GRANTED and Alberta is entitled to judgment on Xtreme's claims against it for negligence and products liability. Pacific's Motion for Summary Judgment #104 is GRANTED and Pacific is entitled to judgment on Xtreme's claims against it for negligence and products liability. Pacific's Motion for Attorney's Fees #117 is DENIED. Encana's Motion for Summary Judgment #120 and Xtreme's Motion for Summary Judgment #121 are DENIED. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/19/10.(msksec, ) Modified on 9/21/2010 to edit filed date (wjc, ).
August 25, 2010 Filing 149 Docket Annotation re: #147 Notice of Change of Address, #148 Notice of Change of Address. Counsel filed #147 Notice of Change of Address in error. Counsel refiled corrected document at #148 Notice of Change of Address. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (wjc, )
August 25, 2010 Filing 148 NOTICE of Change of Address and Telephone Number by Russell D. Weaver (Weaver, Russell)
August 24, 2010 Filing 147 NOTICE of Change of Address and Telephone Number by Russell D. Weaver (Weaver, Russell)
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MINUTE ORDER granting #144 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of John E. Clough. Attorney John Ernest Clough terminated, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 08/23/2010.(wjc, )
August 23, 2010 Filing 145 MEMORANDUM regarding #144 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of John E Clough filed by Pacific Rim Engineered Products Ltd. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/23/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(msksec, )
August 23, 2010 Filing 144 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of John E Clough by Counter Claimant Pacific Rim Engineered Products Ltd., Defendant Pacific Rim Engineered Products Ltd.. (Swift, Jeremy)
August 20, 2010 Filing 143 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Paul D. Cooper on behalf of Pacific Rim Engineered Products Ltd., Pacific Rim Engineered Products Ltd. (Cooper, Paul)
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER RESETTING RULE 16 HEARING: Due to a scheduling conflict on the Court's calendar, the Rule 16 Hearing set for 8/3/2010 is VACATED and RESET to 12/9/2010 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger.Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/21/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(msksec, )
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER CONVERTING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO RULE 16 HEARING: The Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/3/2010 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger is converted to a Rule 16 Hearing. At this hearing, counsel should be prepared to advise the Court as to what procedure should be used to best facilitate the just, speedy and inexpensive determination of this action. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/6/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(msksec, )
May 24, 2010 Filing 140 REPLY to Response to #121 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Weaver, Russell)
May 21, 2010 Filing 139 REPLY to Response to #120 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Lopach, Paul)
May 12, 2010 Filing 138 Docket Annotation re: 137 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Modified on 5/12/2010 to edit filed date. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (wjc, )
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting #136 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Motion for Summary Judgment. Encana reply brief shall be filed on or before May 21, 2010. Xtreme reply brief shall be filed on or before May 24, 2010. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/10/10.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (msksec, ) Modified on 5/12/2010 to edit filed date (wjc, ).
May 10, 2010 Filing 136 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #121 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #120 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Lopach, Paul)
April 29, 2010 Filing 135 BRIEF in Opposition to #121 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit A-4, #5 Exhibit A-5, #6 Exhibit A-6, #7 Exhibit A-7, #8 Exhibit A-8, #9 Exhibit A-9, #10 Exhibit A-10, #11 Exhibit A-11, #12 Exhibit A-12, #13 Exhibit A-13, #14 Exhibit A-14, #15 Exhibit A-15, #16 Exhibit A-16, #17 Exhibit A-17, #18 Exhibit A-18, #19 Exhibit A-19, #20 Exhibit A-20, #21 Exhibit A-21, #22 Exhibit A-22, #23 Exhibit A-23)(Lopach, Paul)
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting #129 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment. Extension granted up to and including April 27, 2010. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/27/10.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (msksec, )
April 27, 2010 Filing 133 Exhibits in Support of #130 Response to Motion, by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "B-18", #2 Exhibit "B-19", #3 Exhibit "B-20", #4 Exhibit "B-21", #5 Exhibit "B-22", #6 Exhibit "B-23", #7 Exhibit "B-24", #8 Exhibit "B-25", #9 Exhibit "B-26", #10 Exhibit "B-27")(Weaver, Russell)
April 27, 2010 Filing 132 Exhibits in Support of #130 Response to Motion, by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "B-10", #2 Exhibit Exhibit "B-11", #3 Exhibit Exhibit "B-12", #4 Exhibit Exhibit "B-13", #5 Exhibit Exhibit "B-14", #6 Exhibit Exhibit "B-15", #7 Exhibit Exhibit "B-16", #8 Exhibit Exhibit "B-17")(Weaver, Russell)
April 27, 2010 Filing 131 Exhibits in Support of #130 Response to Motion, by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "B-3", #2 Exhibit Exhibit "B-4", #3 Exhibit Exhibit "B-5" part 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit "B-5" part 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit "B-6", #6 Exhibit Exhibit "B-7", #7 Exhibit Exhibit "B-8", #8 Exhibit Exhibit "B-9")(Weaver, Russell)
April 27, 2010 Filing 130 RESPONSE to #120 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "A" part 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit "A" part 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit "A" part 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit "A" part 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit "B-1" part 1, #6 Exhibit Exhibit "B-1" part 2, #7 Exhibit Exhibit "B-2" part 1, #8 Exhibit Exhibit "B-2" part 2)(Weaver, Russell)
April 27, 2010 Filing 129 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #120 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Weaver, Russell)
April 22, 2010 Filing 128 REPLY to Response to #117 MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Costs filed by Defendant Pacific Rim Engineered Products Ltd.. (Swift, Jeremy)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting #126 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment. Xtreme shall respond to Encana's Motion for Summary Judgment on or before 4/26/2010. The deadline for Encana to respond to Extreme is extended to 4/29/2010. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/22/10.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (msksec, )
April 22, 2010 Filing 126 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #121 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #120 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Re Joint Motion to Extend Briefing Deadlines)(Lopach, Paul)
April 14, 2010 Filing 125 RESPONSE to #117 MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Costs filed by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "1")(Weaver, Russell)
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a status report within ten days of the District Court's ruling on the motions for summary judgment to advise if a settlement conference should be set. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/7/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(kmtlc1)
April 7, 2010 Filing 123 STATUS REPORT on Mediation by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Weaver, Russell)
April 6, 2010 Filing 122 REPLY to Response to #104 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Pacific Rim Engineered Products Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Swift, Jeremy)
March 31, 2010 Filing 121 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "A" part 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit "A" part 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit "B", #4 Exhibit Exhibit "C", #5 Exhibit Exhibit "D")(Weaver, Russell)
March 30, 2010 Filing 120 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3 Part 1, #4 Exhibit A-3 Part 2, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit A-5, #7 Exhibit A-6, #8 Exhibit A-7, #9 Exhibit A-8, #10 Exhibit A-9, #11 Exhibit A-10, #12 Exhibit A-11, #13 Exhibit A-12, #14 Exhibit A-13, #15 Exhibit A-14, #16 Exhibit A-15, #17 Exhibit A-16, #18 Exhibit A-17, #19 Exhibit A-18, #20 Exhibit A-19, #21 Exhibit A-20, #22 Exhibit A-21)(Lopach, Paul)
March 30, 2010 Filing 119 ANSWER/REPLY to #114 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation.(Weaver, Russell)
March 24, 2010 Filing 118 RESPONSE to #104 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit Exhibit "B")(Weaver, Russell)
March 24, 2010 Filing 117 MOTION for Attorney Fees, MOTION for Costs by Defendant Pacific Rim Engineered Products Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C1, #4 Exhibit C2, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L)(Swift, Jeremy)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER denying #105 Motion for Attorney Fees, without prejudice, for failure to sufficiently comply with D.C.Colo.L.Civ.R. 7.1(A). Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/23/10.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (msksec, )
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MINUTE ORDER granting #112 Motion to Vacate Settlement Conference. The Settlement Conference set for 3/22/2010 is VACATED. The parties shall file a Status Report no later than 4/7/2010 to notify the court of their efforts to reschedule mediation with a private mediator or of their desire to reschedule a settlement with this court. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/11/10.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (kmtlc1 )
March 10, 2010 Filing 113 MEMORANDUM regarding #112 Joint MOTION to Vacate Settlement Conference filed by EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/10/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(msksec, )
March 10, 2010 Filing 112 Joint MOTION to Vacate Settlement Conference by Defendant EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Lopach, Paul)
March 9, 2010 Filing 114 AMENDED ANSWER to #66 Amended Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM against Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation by Defendant 1297835 Alberta Ltd. (wjc, )
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #98 MOTION to Amend #64 Amended Answer to Complaint to Assert Counterclaim for Attorney Fees by Defendant. The Clerk of Court shall file Maycos Amended Answer and Counterclaim (Doc. No. 98-5) by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/9/2010.(kmtcd, )
March 8, 2010 Filing 110 NOTICE Request To Be Removed From E-File Service by Defendant Kobelt Manufacturing Ltd. (Waltz, James)
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MINUTE ORDER granting #107 Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone at Settlement Conference. Messrs. May and Wilson may participate by telephone in the settlement conference set for March 22, 2010. Defendant 1297835 Alberta Ltd.'s counsel shall have telephone numbers available at which Messrs. May and Wilson may be reached. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/4/10.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (kmtlc1 )
March 4, 2010 Filing 108 MEMORANDUM regarding #107 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone at Settlement Conference filed by 1297835 Alberta Ltd. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/4/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(msksec, )
March 4, 2010 Filing 107 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone at #88 Settlement Conference by Defendant 1297835 Alberta Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Wells, Mary) Modified on 3/5/2010 to create linkage(sah2, ).
March 4, 2010 Filing 106 REPLY to Response to #101 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support and Request for Attorney Fees filed by Defendant 1297835 Alberta Ltd.. (O'Brien, Adam)
March 3, 2010 Filing 105 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Defendant Pacific Rim Engineered Products Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C-1, #4 Exhibit C-2, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L)(Swift, Jeremy)
March 3, 2010 Filing 104 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Pacific Rim Engineered Products Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D-1, #5 Exhibit D-2, #6 Exhibit D-3, #7 Exhibit D-4, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K-1, #15 Exhibit K-2, #16 Exhibit L, #17 Exhibit M, #18 Exhibit N, #19 Exhibit O, #20 Exhibit P)(Swift, Jeremy)
February 23, 2010 Filing 103 CONFESSION re #98 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #64 Amended Answer to Complaint to Assert Counterclaim for Attorney Fees by Defendant 1297835 Alberta Ltd.. (O'Brien, Adam) Modified on 2/24/2010 to delete duplicate text generated by the system (gmssl, ).
February 19, 2010 Filing 102 RESPONSE to #101 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support filed by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Weaver, Russell)
January 26, 2010 Filing 101 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support by Defendant 1297835 Alberta Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit A-4, #5 Exhibit A-5, #6 Exhibit A-6, #7 Exhibit A-7, #8 Exhibit A-8, #9 Exhibit A-9, #10 Exhibit A-10, #11 Exhibit A-11, #12 Exhibit A-12)(Wells, Mary)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MINUTE ORDER granting in part #95 Motion for Extension of Time to Designate Expert Witnesses. Defendant Mayco shall disclose its experts no later than February 8, 2010. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/20/10.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (kmtlc1)
January 19, 2010 Filing 99 MEMORANDUM regarding #98 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #64 Amended Answer to Complaint to Assert Counterclaim for Attorney Fees MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #64 Amended Answer to Complaint to Assert Counterclaim for Attorney Fees filed by 1297835 Alberta Ltd. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/19/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(msksec, )
January 19, 2010 Filing 98 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #64 Amended Answer to Complaint to Assert Counterclaim for Attorney Fees by Defendant 1297835 Alberta Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Wells, Mary)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE granting #94 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice of Defendant Kobelt Manufacturing Co. Ltd. Any and all claims against Defendant Kobelt Manufacturing Co. Ltd. are hereby dismissed, with prejudice, each party to pay his, her or its own costs and attorneys fees herein expended. All future captions shall so reflect, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 01/19/2010.(wjc, )
January 19, 2010 Filing 96 MEMORANDUM regarding #95 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Designate Expert Witnesses filed by 1297835 Alberta Ltd. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/19/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(msksec, )
January 19, 2010 Filing 95 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Designate Expert Witnesses by Defendant 1297835 Alberta Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Wells, Mary)
January 15, 2010 Filing 94 Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss Party by Defendant Kobelt Manufacturing Ltd.. (Waltz, James)
January 12, 2010 Filing 93 AMENDED ANSWER to #66 Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Defendant EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc. (wjc, )
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Minute ORDER granting #90 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Answer To Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Defendant. The clerk shall file the amended answer attached to the motion as exhibit A by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/12/2010.(kmtcd, )
January 11, 2010 Filing 91 MEMORANDUM regarding #90 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Answer To Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/11/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(msksec, )
January 8, 2010 Filing 90 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Answer To Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Defendant EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Lopach, Paul)
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting #86 Motion to Dismiss Party Party Guide Technologies, Inc., Rick Mason, and Wes Arnold. The Clerk of the Court shall terminate these parties. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/10/09.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (msklc2, )
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 3/22/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/8/09. (kmtcd)
December 8, 2009 Filing 87 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: Status Conference held on 12/8/2009. Settlement Conference set for 3/22/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. (FTR - Debra Brown) (kmtcd)
December 4, 2009 Filing 86 MOTION to Dismiss Party Guide Technologies, Inc., Rick Mason and Wes Arnold by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Weaver, Russell)
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MINUTE ORDER granting #83 Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline for Expert Disclosures Under Rule 26(a)(2) through December 16, 2009. The parties shall designate all experts and provide opposing counsel with all information specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) on or before 12/16/2009, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/01/2009.(wjc, )
November 30, 2009 Filing 84 MEMORANDUM regarding #83 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend the Deadline for Expert Disclosures Under Rule 26(a)(2) Through December 16, 2009 filed by Kobelt Manufacturing Ltd. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/30/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(msksec, )
November 25, 2009 Filing 83 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend the Deadline for Expert Disclosures Under Rule 26(a)(2) Through December 16, 2009 by Defendant Kobelt Manufacturing Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Waltz, James)
November 12, 2009 Filing 82 Docket Annotation re: #81 Notice of Entry of Appearance. Modified on 11/12/2009 to add text Amended to clarify title of document. Text only entry - no document attached. (wjc, )
November 11, 2009 Filing 81 Amended NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by James R. Waltz on behalf of Kobelt Manufacturing Ltd. (Waltz, James) Modified on 11/12/2009 to add text Amended to clarify title of document (wjc, ).
November 11, 2009 Filing 80 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by James R. Waltz on behalf of Kobelt Manufacturing Ltd. (Waltz, James)
October 7, 2009 Filing 79 Docket Annotation re: #78 Minute Order. Modified on 10/7/2009 to correct text of Notice docket number. Text only entry - no document attached. (wjc, )
October 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MINUTE ORDER re: #75 NOTICE of Withdrawal of #72 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a)(3)(B) and to Determine the Sufficiency of Answers Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 36(A)(6) by Defendant Pacific Rim Engineered Products Ltd. #72 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a)(3)(B) and to Determine the Sufficiency of Answers Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 36(A)(6) by Defendant Pacific Rim Engineered Products Ltd. is WITHDRAWN. The motion hearing set for 11/5/09 is VACATED by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/7/09. (kmtcd) Modified on 10/7/2009 to correct text of Notice docket number (wjc, ).
October 7, 2009 Filing 77 Docket Annotation re: #75 NOTICE of Withdrawal of #72 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a)(3)(B) and to Determine the Sufficiency of Answers Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 36(A)(6). Modified on 10/7/2009 edit text to clarify title of document and delete duplicate text. Text only entry - no document attached. (wjc, )
October 7, 2009 Filing 76 MEMORANDUM regarding #75 MOTION to Withdraw Document re #72 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a)(3)(B) and to Determine the Sufficiency of Answers Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 36(A)(6) filed by Pacific Rim Engineered Products Ltd. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/7/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(msksec, ) Modified on 10/8/2009 delete duplicate text (wjc, ).
October 6, 2009 Filing 75 NOTICE of Withdrawal of #72 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a)(3)(B) and to Determine the Sufficiency of Answers Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 36(A)(6) by Defendant Pacific Rim Engineered Products Ltd. (Swift, Jeremy) Modified on 10/7/2009 edit text to clarify title of document and delete duplicate text (wjc, ).
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Minute ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #72 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a)(3)(B) and to Determine the Sufficiency of Answers Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 36(A)(6) by Defendant Pacific Rim Engineered Products Ltd. Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 09/21/09. (kmtcd)
September 18, 2009 Filing 73 MEMORANDUM regarding #72 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a)(3)(B) and to Determine the Sufficiency of Answers Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 36(A)(6) MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a)(3)(B) and to Determine the Sufficiency of Answers Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 36(A)(6) filed by Pacific Rim Engineered Products Ltd. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/18/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(msksec, )
September 17, 2009 Filing 72 WITHDRAWN - MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a)(3)(B) and to Determine the Sufficiency of Answers Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 36(A)(6) by Defendant Pacific Rim Engineered Products Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Systemic Formulas, Inc. v. Kim)(Swift, Jeremy) Modified on 10/7/2009 to add text Withdrawn pursuant to Minute Order dated 10/07/2009 (wjc, ).
September 8, 2009 Filing 71 NOTICE of Change of Address of Russell D. Weaver by Russell D. Weaver (Weaver, Russell)
August 6, 2009 Filing 70 ANSWER to #66 Amended Complaint by EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc..(Lopach, Paul)
August 4, 2009 Filing 69 ANSWER to #66 Amended Complaint by 1297835 Alberta Ltd..(Wells, Mary)
August 3, 2009 Filing 68 ANSWER to #66 Amended Complaint by Kobelt Manufacturing Ltd..(Waltz, Richard)
July 30, 2009 Filing 67 ANSWER to #66 Amended Complaint by Pacific Rim Engineered Products Ltd..(Clough, John)
July 21, 2009 Filing 66 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Guide Technologies, Inc., Rick Mason, Wes Arnold, 1297835 Alberta Ltd., EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc., Kobelt Manufacturing Ltd., Pacific Rim Engineered Products Ltd., filed by Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation.(wjc, )
July 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #53 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. The First Amended Complaint attached as Exhibit A to the motion [Doc. No. 53-2], is and hereby will be filed by the Clerk of the Court, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 07/21/09.(wjc, )
June 16, 2009 Filing 64 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Defendant Mayco Industries Group. (wjc, )
June 16, 2009 Filing 63 DESIGNATION OF NON-PARTY at Fault by Defendant Mayco Industries Group. (wjc, )
June 16, 2009 Filing 62 DESIGNATION OF NON-PARTY At Fault by Defendant Pacific Rim Engineered Products (1987) Ltd. (wjc, )
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTE ORDER granting #55 Unopposed Motion of Defendant Pacific Rim Engineered Products (1987) Ltd for Leave to Designate Non Parties at Fault. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file Defendant's Designation of Non Parties at Fault (55-2). The #57 Unopposed Motion for Joinder in Defendant Pacific Rim Engineered Products (1987) Ltd's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Designate Non Parties at Fault is granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file the Designation of Non Parties at Fault (57-2). The #56 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Answer is granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file the Amended Answer to Complaint (56-2), by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 06/16/09.(wjc, )
June 15, 2009 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM regarding #57 Unopposed MOTION for Joinder re #55 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Designate Nonparties at Fault filed by Mayco Industries Group.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/15/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(msksec, )
June 15, 2009 Filing 59 MEMORANDUM regarding #56 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Amend Answer filed by Mayco Industries Group.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/15/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(msksec, )
June 15, 2009 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM regarding #55 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Designate Nonparties at Fault filed by Pacific Rim Engineered Products Ltd..Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/15/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(msksec, )
June 11, 2009 Filing 57 Unopposed MOTION for Joinder re #55 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Designate Nonparties at Fault by Defendant Mayco Industries Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(O'Brien, Adam)
June 11, 2009 Filing 56 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Amend #18 Answer by Defendant Mayco Industries Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Wells, Mary) Modified on 6/12/2009 to add linkage (wjc, ).
June 8, 2009 Filing 55 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Designate Nonparties at Fault by Defendant Pacific Rim Engineered Products Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Swift, Jeremy)
June 4, 2009 Filing 54 MEMORANDUM regarding #53 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/4/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(msksec, )
June 4, 2009 Filing 53 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint)(Weaver, Russell) Modified on 6/5/2009 to add linkage (wjc, ).
June 3, 2009 Filing 52 TRANSCRIPT of Scheduling Conference held on 04/27/09 before Magistrate Judge Tafoya. Pages: 1-20. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/1/2009. (Avery Woods Reporting, )
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 PROTECTIVE ORDER Regarding Product Preservation and Inspection by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 06/03/09. (wjc, )
June 1, 2009 Filing 50 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: Motion Hearing held on 6/1/2009. Defendants "MOTION for Protective Order" [Document #39, filed April 21, 2009] is GRANTED. Ms. Wells shall submit an amended proposed Protective Order on or before June 03, 2009. Plaintiff shall be responsible for expenses in excess of the expenses which would have been expended if the equipment had remained in Pharr, Texas for Defendants and their experts to inspect "Rig 6". This includes attorney time and expert witness time. Defendants will provide Plaintiff documentation of excess fees and expenses incurred. The court expects the Plaintiff to fund reasonable excess expenses without further Court intervention. On or before June 04, 2009, Plaintiff shall file a Motion to Amend the Complaint and a proposed amended complaint. Responses and replies are due pursuant to Local Rules. (FTR - Debra Brown) (kmtcd)
May 26, 2009 Filing 49 REPLY to Response to #39 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Mayco Industries Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wells, Mary)
May 11, 2009 Filing 48 RESPONSE to Motion re #39 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "A": Letter dated April 9, 2009)(Weaver, Russell)
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/3/2010 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/28/09. (msksec, )
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/1/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 3/31/2010. Status Conference set for 12/8/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/27/09. (kmtcd)
April 27, 2009 Filing 45 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: Scheduling Conference held on 4/27/2009. Discovery due by 3/1/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 3/31/2010. Motion Hearing set for 6/1/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Status Conference set for 12/8/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. (FTR - Debra Brown) (kmtcd)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/1/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 3/31/2010. Status Conference set for 12/8/2009 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 04/27/09. (wjc, )
April 24, 2009 Filing 43 NOTICE re #31 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Dismissal of Counterclaim by Defendant Pacific Rim Engineered Products Ltd., Counter Claimant Pacific Rim Engineered Products Ltd. (Clough, John)
April 22, 2009 Filing 42 Docket Annotation re: #38 Proposed Scheduling Order. Modified on 4/22/2009 to add text as counsel refiled at document #41 with signatures. Text only entry - no document attached. (wjc, )
April 22, 2009 Filing 41 Proposed Scheduling Order (with signature notations) by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Weaver, Russell)
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM regarding #39 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Mayco Industries Group.Motion is referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/21/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(msksec, )
April 21, 2009 Filing 39 MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Mayco Industries Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(O'Brien, Adam)
April 20, 2009 Filing 38 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Pacific Rim Engineered Products Ltd. (This document refiled at document #41 with signatures.) (Swift, Jeremy) Modified on 4/22/2009 to add text (wjc, ).
April 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER granting #35 Notice and Unopposed Motion to Withdraw of Wendy J. Lewis as Counsel, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 04/15/09.(wjc, )
April 14, 2009 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM regarding #35 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Wendy J. Lewis filed by Pacific Rim Engineered Products Ltd..Motion is referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/14/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(msksec, )
April 14, 2009 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Wendy J. Lewis by Defendant Pacific Rim Engineered Products Ltd., Counter Claimant Pacific Rim Engineered Products Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) re Motion to Withdraw)(Lewis, Wendy)
April 7, 2009 Filing 34 DESIGNATION OF NON-PARTIES at Fault by Defendant Mayco Industries Group. (gms, )
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Minute ORDER granting #29 1297835 Alberta Ltd.'s Unopposed Motion for Leave to Designate Non Parties at Fault. Clerk to file the designation, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/7/09.(gms, )
April 7, 2009 Filing 32 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jeremy Love Swift on behalf of Pacific Rim Engineered Products Ltd. (Swift, Jeremy)
April 7, 2009 Filing 31 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation by Pacific Rim Engineered Products Ltd..(Clough, John)
April 7, 2009 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM regarding #29 MOTION for Leave to Designate Non Parties at Fault filed by Mayco Industries Group.Motion is referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/7/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(msksec, )
April 7, 2009 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Designate Non Parties at Fault by Defendant Mayco Industries Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(O'Brien, Adam)
March 27, 2009 Filing 28 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Wendy Jean Lewis on behalf of Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation (Lewis, Wendy)
March 24, 2009 Filing 27 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John Ernest Clough on behalf of Pacific Rim Engineered Products Ltd. (Clough, John)
March 12, 2009 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation.. (Weaver, Russell)
March 5, 2009 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Kobelt Manufacturing Ltd... (Waltz, Richard)
March 5, 2009 Filing 24 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Defendant Kobelt Manufacturing Ltd. (Waltz, Richard)
March 4, 2009 Filing 23 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Adam Patrick O'Brien on behalf of Mayco Industries Group (O'Brien, Adam)
March 4, 2009 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Mayco Industries Group.. (Wells, Mary)
March 4, 2009 Filing 21 DESIGNATION OF NON-PARTY by Defendant Kobelt Manufacturing Ltd.. (Waltz, Richard)
March 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER denying #17 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint for failure to comply with local rule 7.1A. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/3/09.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (kmtlc1 )
March 3, 2009 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM regarding #17 First MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation.Motion is referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/3/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(msksec, )
March 2, 2009 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Mayco Industries Group.(Wells, Mary)
March 2, 2009 Filing 17 First MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document Proposed First Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order Granting Leave to File First Amended Complaint)(Weaver, Russell)
March 2, 2009 Filing 16 Kobelt Manufacturing Ltd.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Kobelt Manufacturing Ltd..(Waltz, Richard)
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER granting #10 Motion to Reset Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference set for 3/17/2009 is VACATED and RESET to 4/27/2009 at 9:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. The Rule 26(f) conference shall take place no later than April 6, 2009. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order no later than April 20, 2009. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/2/09.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (kmtlc1, )
March 2, 2009 Filing 14 STATEMENT D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.4 DISCLOSURE by Defendant EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Lopach, Paul)
March 2, 2009 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Jury Demand by EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc..(Lopach, Paul)
March 2, 2009 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM regarding #10 Amended MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference filed by Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation.Motion is referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/2/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(msksec, )
March 2, 2009 Filing 11 Docket Annotation re: #7 First MOTION to Reset Status Conference. Modified on 3/2/2009 to edit text to correct title of Motion. Text only entry - no document attached. (wjc, )
March 2, 2009 Filing 10 Amended MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order Resetting Scheduling Conference)(Weaver, Russell)
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice #7 Motion to Reset Scheduling Conference. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, a scheduling order must be issued within the earlier of 120 days after any defendant has been served with the complaint or 90 days after any defendant has appeared. Plaintiff indicates that Defendants have been served but does not state when service was made. Therefore, it is impossible to determine if the court may continue the scheduling conference. Any future motion in this regard must give the court the dates on which the parties were served with the complaint. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/2/09.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (kmtlc1 )
March 2, 2009 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM regarding #7 First MOTION to Reset Status Conference filed by Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation.Motion is referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/2/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(msksec, )
February 27, 2009 Filing 7 First MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order Resetting Status Conference)(Weaver, Russell) Modified on 3/2/2009 to edit text to correct title of Motion (wjc, ).
January 12, 2009 Filing 6 Docket Annotation re: 5 Minute Order. Modified on 1/12/2009 to correct filing date. Text only entry - no document attached. (wjc, )
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict, the Scheduling Conference set for March 17, 2009, will commence at 9:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Entered by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/6/09. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached)(kmtlc1, ) Modified on 1/12/2009 to correct filing date (wjc, ).
December 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Schedulingand Planning Conference set for 3/17/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/22/08. (jmp, )
December 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and depositions from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. Signed by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/22/08. (mskcd)
December 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND LETTER TO COUNSEL: REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Signed by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/19/08. (msksec, )
December 17, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, Receipt Number COX015239) Summons not issued, filed by Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(llk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation v. EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Rim Engineered Products Ltd.
Represented By: John Ernest Clough
Represented By: Jeremy Love Swift
Represented By: Wendy Jean Lewis
Represented By: Paul D. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayco Industries Group
Represented By: Mary Alice Wells
Represented By: Adam Patrick O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guide Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Paul J. Lopach
Represented By: Stephen D. Rynerson
Represented By: Stephen D. Gurr
Represented By: Michael James Hofmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1297835 Alberta Ltd. doing business as Mayco Industries Group
Represented By: Mary Alice Wells
Represented By: Adam Patrick O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wes Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kobelt Manufacturing Ltd.
Represented By: James R. Waltz
Represented By: Richard A. Waltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation
Represented By: Russell D. Weaver
Represented By: Eric Walter Kristiansen
Represented By: Cory Murray Curtis
Represented By: Laurin D. Quiat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: 1297835 Alberta Ltd.
Represented By: Adam Patrick O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?