Marshall v. Estep et al
Plaintiff: Eric Marshall
Defendant: Kevin Estep and Aristedes W. Zavaras
Case Number: 1:2009cv00105
Filed: January 21, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Prison Condition Office
County: Kit Carson
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER denying 51 Motion for Certificate of Appealability by Eric Marshall, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 04/16/10.(bjrsl, )
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER to Cure Deficiency re 49 Notice of Appeal by Eric Marshall, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 03/29/10. Appellant has 30 days to either pay the filing fee or file a proper 1915 motion with district court.(bjrsl, )
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER accepting 38 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. Plaintiff Eric Marshall's case is dismissed. Denying as moot 18 Defendant Kevin Estep's Motion to Dismiss. Denying as moot 30 Plaintiff Eric Marshall's Motion for Extension of Time. Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of defendant Kevin Estep and against plaintiff Eric Marshall, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/11/10.(ebs, )
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 7 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.1 for his failure to make monthly payments of twenty percent of his preceding month's income until his filing fee was paid in full, or show cause each month that he has no assets with which to make the monthly payment, as directed by the court's orders of 1/21/09 and 5/20/09, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/22/09. (ebs, )
March 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING SERVICE BY UNITED STATES MARSHAL, with Certificate of Mailing, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/11/09. (ebs, )
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint within 30 days by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/26/09. (jjh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marshall v. Estep et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Estep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aristedes W. Zavaras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?