October 13, 2011 |
Filing
122
ORDER AFFIRMS and ADOPTS the Magistrate Judges 120 Report and Recommendations; Granting 112 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; Plaintiffs remaining claims are moot and this case is DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/13/2011.(erv, )
|
May 23, 2011 |
Filing
110
ORDER ACCEPTED 102 Report and Recommendations of the United States Magistrate Judge. Denying 83 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/23/2011.(erv, )
|
January 5, 2011 |
Filing
101
ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Make Monthly Filing Fee Payment or to Show Cause. On or before 1/30/2011, Plaintiff shall make the required monthly payments or show cause why he has no assets and no means by which to make the monthly payments for the mo nths of September 2010 through January 2011. Plaintiff shallfile certified account statements for the months of September 2010 through January 2011. By the 15th day of each month hereafter, beginning 2/15/2011, Plaintiff shall either make the require d monthly payment for each month orfile a certified copy of his inmate trust fund account statement for the month demonstrating that he is not required pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2) to make a monthly payment, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/5/11. (mnf, )
|
December 28, 2010 |
Filing
100
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 87 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a)(2)(B); (3). The Motion Hearing currently set for December 29, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. is VACATED, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/28/2010.(erv, )
|
July 7, 2010 |
Filing
73
MINUTE ORDER granting 65 Plaintiff's Motion for Order for Substitution Pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 25(d)(1). Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(d), Julie Russell is automatically substituted for Defendant Cathie Holst, and Steve Hartley is automatically substituted for Defendant Michael Arellano. The Clerk of Court is directed to substitute these parties accordingly. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/7/2010.(erv, )
|
May 5, 2010 |
Filing
63
Minute ORDER denying 57 Plaintiffs Motion for Order to Compel. Intheir response to Plaintiffs Motion (Doc. No. 61), Defendants state they are unable to locate any discovery requests sent to them by Plaintiff. In addition, Plaintiff has failed to co mply with D.C.COLO.LcivR 37.1 which requires that the motion set forth verbatim the interrogatory, request, and response to which the motion is directed. As such, Defendants are unable to respond to the discovery requests. Plaintiff may re-send the discovery requests to Defendants.Defendants are ORDERED to provide responses to Plaintiffs discovery requests within two weeks of their receipt of same by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/5/2010.(kmtcd, )
|
February 12, 2010 |
Filing
46
ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Preliminary Scheduling Conference set for 3/2/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/12/2010. (kmtcd, )
|
February 11, 2010 |
Filing
45
ORDER ADOPTING AND AFFIRMING 42 Report and Recommendations of the United States Magistrate Judge; granting in part and denying in part 18 Defendants Combined Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Compla int. Plaintiffs Claim One and all claims against Defendant Aristedes Zavaras are DISMISSED with prejudice; and Plaintiffs Claims Two and Three and the claims against Defendants Cathie Holst and Michael Arrellano shall be set for further proceedings. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/11/2010.(erv, )
|
January 7, 2010 |
Filing
42
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Re: 18 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Aristedes Zavaras, Cathie Holst, Michael Arrellano be GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff's Claim One and all claims against Aristedes Zavaras be DISMISSED with prejudice. Plaintiff's Claims Two and Three and the claims against Defendants Cathie Holst and Michael Arrellano be set for furthe proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/7/2010. (kmtcd, )
|
December 16, 2009 |
Filing
40
ORDER ACCEPTED 33 Report and Recommendations ofUnited States Magistrate Judge; denying 21 Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/16/09.(erv, )
|
August 4, 2009 |
Filing
33
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff be DENIED by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/4/09. (kmtcd)
|
March 18, 2009 |
Filing
11
ORDER Granting Service by te United States Marshal re: 3 Complaint filed by Robert D. Gandy by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/18/09. (erv, )
|
March 10, 2009 |
Filing
8
ORDER Assigning Case. Ordered that this case shall be assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1C.1, and to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 03/10/2009. (sah, )
|
March 4, 2009 |
Filing
7
ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave to Proceed Without Payment of Initial Partial Filing Fee by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 03/04/09. (jjh, )
|
February 3, 2009 |
Filing
2
ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency. Plaintiff has 30 days to file a trust fund statement that is certified by a prison official by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/2/2009. (llk, )
|