Home Design Services, Inc. v. Gomez et al
Plaintiff: |
Home Design Services, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Noe A. Gomez and Sandra Gomez |
Case Number: |
1:2009cv00268 |
Filed: |
February 9, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Copyright Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Philip A. Brimmer |
Presiding Judge: |
Michael E. Hegarty |
Nature of Suit: |
Both |
Cause of Action: |
Federal Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 1, 2010 |
Filing
74
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to the 73 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), this matter, and all claims asserted therein, is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys fees and costs, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/1/10. (ebs, )
|
February 10, 2010 |
Filing
72
MINUTE ORDER granting 70 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Vacate Telephonic Status Conference. The Status Conference set for 2/11/2010 is VACATED. Dismissal Papers due by 2/26/2010. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/10/2010. (mehcd)
|
January 28, 2010 |
Filing
68
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Granting 67 Joint Motion for Dismissal With Prejudice. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), all claims asserted in this matter against defendants Noe A. Gomez, Sandra Gomez, and G Construction, Inc. are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys fees and costs, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/28/10.(ebs, )
|
September 3, 2009 |
Filing
49
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 37 Plaintiff's Motion for Contempt, to Compel, and for Sanctions Against Defendants Noe Gomez and Sandra Gomez. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/3/2009. (mehcd) Modified on 9/8/2009 to correct the file date (ebs, ).
|
August 14, 2009 |
Filing
35
ORDER of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant KS Custom Builders, Inc. Only pursuant to the 34 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) all claims asserted in this matter against defendant KS Custom Builders, Inc. are dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys fees and costs, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/14/09.(ebs, )
|
July 27, 2009 |
Filing
27
MINUTE ORDER granting 19 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery and for Sanctions. Defendants shall respond to the propounded Interrogatories [docket #19-3] and Requests for Production of Documents [docket #19-2] on or before 8/10/2009. Grant ing Plaintiff's Request for Sanctions. Plaintiff shall have all costs and attorney's fees reasonably incurred in filing the within motion. Defendants may object to the reasonableness of the fees requested by Plaintiffs no later than 8/24/2009. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/27/2009. (mehcd) Modified on 7/28/2009 to add text re: the granting of Plaintiff's request for sanctions (ebs, ).
|
July 7, 2009 |
Filing
23
MINUTE ORDER granting 21 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint and Supporting Memorandum of Law. Clerk shall enter the Amended Complaint located at Docket #21-4, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/7/09.(ebs, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?