May 11, 2010 |
Filing
419
ORDER Striking Post Judgment submissions and Directing Clerk of Court to Refuse to Accept Similar filings. STRIKING 403 , 404 , 405 , 406 , 407 , 409 , 410 , 411 , 412 , 413 , 414 , 415 , 416 , 417 , and 418 ; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall refuse to accept any further filings from Mr. Preacher in this case. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/11/2010. (erv, )
|
February 26, 2010 |
Filing
363
MINUTE ORDER granting 349 Defendants' Motion to Stay Pending Ruling on Recommended Dismissals. This matter is temporarily stayed pending resolution of this Court's recommendations for dismissal. The Final Pretrial Conference scheduled for 3/16/2010, is vacated. The parties shall notify this Court within five days after a ruling on the pending recommendations to reschedule the Final Pretrial Conference, if necessary. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/26/2010. (mehcd)
|
February 16, 2010 |
Filing
362
MINUTE ORDER striking 358 Motion for Default Judgment, and striking 359 Motion for Judgment as improper and filed in contravention of this Court's orders. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/16/2010. (mehcd)
|
February 3, 2010 |
Filing
353
MINUTE ORDER denying 351 Plaintiff Preacher's Motion to Compell [sic]..., by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/3/2010. (mehcd)
|
December 31, 2009 |
Filing
344
MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 342 Plaintiff Preachers Motion to Compel. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/31/09.(erv, )
|
November 9, 2009 |
Filing
334
MINUTE ORDER striking 329 Motion for Default Judgment; striking 331 "Writ of Attachment prejudgment. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/9/2009. (mehcd)
|
October 16, 2009 |
Filing
312
MINUTE ORDER. The documents filed and signed by Plaintiff Preacher containing a false court seal and which the Court has construed as a Motion for Default Judgment 309 and a Motion to Remand (titled, Notice of Removal under 28 U.S.C. §1446(a)) 310 are stricken. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/16/2009.(sah, )
|
October 13, 2009 |
Filing
306
ORDER granting 303 Plaintiff Dawane Mallett is hereby DISMISSED as a named plaintiff in this matter. The caption on all subsequent filings shall reflect the removal of Dawane Mallett as a plaintiff in this case, and the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED that Mr. Mallett shall no longer receive copies of any filings in this matter. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/13/2009.(sah, )
|
October 8, 2009 |
Filing
304
MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 301 Motion for Sanctions and Motion to Compell (sic), by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/8/2009. (mehcd)
|
October 2, 2009 |
Filing
300
MINUTE ORDER striking 298 Plaintiff Preacher's Motion to Remand. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/2/2009. (mehcd)
|
September 30, 2009 |
Filing
297
MINUTE ORDER striking 294 Plaintiff Preacher's Motion for Default Judgment. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/30/2009. (mehcd)
|
September 22, 2009 |
Filing
293
MINUTE ORDER denying 284 Plaintiff Mallett's Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions; and denying 291 Plaintiff Preacher's Motion for Default Judgment, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/22/2009. (mehcd)
|
September 14, 2009 |
Filing
282
MINUTE ORDER denying 279 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal as duplicative, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/14/2009. (mehcd)
|
September 4, 2009 |
Filing
272
RECOMMENDATION BY UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. It is RECOMMENDED that the Motion for Reconsideration filed by Plaintiff David Baxter (a/k/a Richie Hill) 257 be granted, that Mr. Baxter be reinstated as a Plaintiff in this case, and that the action proceed on the claims raised by Plaintiffs Luke Preacher, Dawane Mallett and David Baxter (a/k/a Richie Hill). By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 09/04/2009. (sah, )
|
September 3, 2009 |
Filing
271
MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 268 the Motion for Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41 filed by Plaintiffs Mikeal Stine and Robert Utley, since leave of Court is not required to voluntarily dismiss from a case before the opposing party serves eith er an answer or motion for summary judgment. Plaintiffs Mikeal Stine and Robert Utley are dismissed as Plaintiffs in this case. The Clerk of the Court is directed to remove their names from the case caption and the mailing list. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/3/2009. (mehcd)
|
August 28, 2009 |
Filing
264
MINUTE ORDER striking 260 document filed by Plaintiff Preacher reflecting that Mr. Preacher has characterized himself as a court and has issued an order for the Clerk of the Court to enter default against Defendants (filed as a Motion for Judgment). By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/28/2009. (mehcd)
|
August 25, 2009 |
Filing
249
ORDER denying as moot 238 Motion to Stay. Defendants who have been properly served and/or who have waived service in this action shall file an answer or other response to the Third Amended Complaint on or before 09/08/09. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 08/25/09.(jjh, ) Modified on 8/31/2009 to correct the date order was signed (jjh, ).
|
August 24, 2009 |
Filing
248
MINUTE ORDER striking 245 Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for TRO/Preliminary Injunction/Evidentiary Hearing and Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Counsel, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/24/2009. (mehcd)
|
August 19, 2009 |
Filing
243
ORDER granting 239 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party David Baxter, a/k/a Richie Antonio Hall, is hereby DISMISSED as a named plaintiff in this matter. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/19/09.(erv, )
|
August 18, 2009 |
Filing
237
MINUTE ORDER striking 234 Plaintiff Preacher's Motion for Default Judgment, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/18/2009. (mehcd)
|
August 13, 2009 |
Filing
230
MINUTE ORDER striking 220 the Memorandum for Motion for Default Judgment. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/12/2009. (mehcd)
|
August 11, 2009 |
Filing
224
MINUTE ORDER denying 209 Writ of Mandamus to Compel the Court to Honor and Adhere to the Rules of 28 U.S.C. 144 and 455 filed by Plaintiff Nantambu, which is construed by the Court as a motion for recusal. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/10/2009. (mehcd)
|
August 10, 2009 |
Filing
226
MINUTE ORDER striking 214 Memorandum for Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Preacher, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/10/2009. (mehcd)
|
August 3, 2009 |
Filing
204
MINUTE ORDER striking 186 Motion for Default Judgment; striking 193 Motion for Default Judgment; striking 194 Motion for Default Judgment; striking 197 Motion for Default Judgment, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/3/2009. (mehcd)
|
July 29, 2009 |
Filing
189
ORDER denying Without Prejudice 83 Motion for Recusal/Disqualification. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/29/09.(erv, )
|
July 24, 2009 |
Filing
181
MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 177 Motion for Intervention; denying 177 Motion for Joinder of Parties, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/24/2009. (mehcd)
|
July 22, 2009 |
Filing
174
MINUTE ORDER denying 171 Plaintiffs' Motion for Order to Show Cause; denying 171 Request for Sanctions against Defendants, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/22/2009. (mehcd)
|
July 16, 2009 |
Filing
168
MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 166 Mark Justin Denny's Motion to Intervene by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/16/09.(erv, )
|
July 10, 2009 |
Filing
142
MINUTE ORDER granting 137 Motion for Order to the extent that the Court will review and consider any "exhibits," or documents other than pleadings or briefs filed by the parties, found at dockets #19, #54, #55, #68, #74, #79, #80, #84, #89 and #115 that were filed in support of Plaintiffs' request for preliminary injunctive relief, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/10/2009.(mehcd)
|
July 8, 2009 |
Filing
132
MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 127 Motion to Certify Class; denying without prejudice 127 Motion to Appoint Counsel, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/8/2009.(mehcd)
|
June 29, 2009 |
Filing
120
MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 19 Motion for T.R.O. filed by Plaintiffs Stine and Preacher, and allow all six Plaintiffs to re-file the motion containing all relevant allegations and documentation in one document, on or before 07/13/2009. Defendants shall file a response to the motion within 20 days after the motion is filed, and Plaintiffs may file one reply to the response within 15 days after the response is filed. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 06/29/2009.(sah, )
|
June 24, 2009 |
Filing
113
MINUTE ORDER denying 97 Plaintiff Stines Motion to Expedite Ruling by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/24/09.(erv, )
|
June 19, 2009 |
Filing
99
MINUTE ORDER Denying as moot 95 Motion for Order by Frankie Lee Ferguson, an inmate at the USP-MAX in Florence, Colorado. The Court construes this letter as a Motion for Order to Remove Frankie Lee Ferguson from the Witness List in this Case. The C ourt denies as moot the Motion, because Frankie Lee Ferguson is not listed on the docket as a plaintiff or defendant in this matter, nor is there a governing witness list as referred to by Mr. Ferguson. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/19/09.(erv, )
|
June 10, 2009 |
Filing
87
MINUTE ORDER denying 85 Plaintiff Nantambus Motion for Protective Order; denying 85 Plaintiff Nantambus Motion for Order by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/10/09.(erv, )
|
June 1, 2009 |
Filing
77
MINUTE ORDER denying 71 Plaintiff's Motion for Order by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/1/09.(erv, )
|
May 13, 2009 |
Filing
46
MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 38 Plaintiffs Motion for Order; all Plaintiffs shall participate in the Scheduling/Planning Conference set for June 9, 2009, at the hour of 9:30 a.m., in the Byron G. Rogers U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom 203, 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/13/09.(erv, )
|
April 24, 2009 |
Filing
33
MINUTE ORDER granting 27 Plaintiff's Motion to file Second Amended Complaint. Defendants who have been properly served and/or who have waived service in this action shall file an answer or other response to the Second Amended Verified Complaint on or before June 23, 2009. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/24/09.(erv, )
|
April 20, 2009 |
Filing
26
MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 24 Motion for Order for Permissive Intervention and Motion to Attend Preliminary Scheduling/Status Conference by Telephone filed by proposed intervenors George Scalf, Damani Nantambu, David Baxter and Robert Utley by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/20/09.(erv, )
|
March 20, 2009 |
Filing
11
ORDER Drawing Case. Ordered that this case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 03/20/2009. (sah, )
|
March 19, 2009 |
Filing
10
ORDER denying as moot 2 Motion for Injunction by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 03/18/09.(jjh, )
|
February 10, 2009 |
Filing
1
ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency. Plaintiff has 30 days to either pay the $350.00 filing fee or to file a Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, and to file a Prisoner Complaint by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/6/2009. (llk, )
|