July 1, 2010 |
Filing
152
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marcia S. Krieger: Rule 16 held on 7/1/2010. Dismissal Paper due by 7/15/2010. Defendant Snowmass's 134 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Motions to Dismiss ( 89 , 120 ) are DENIED withou t prejudice and with leave to renew. The effect of this Order will be stayed until 07/15/2010. The case will be closed with regard to the third-party plaintiff's claims against the third-party defendants, but the effect of the Order is stayed until 07/15/2010. (Court Reporter Paul Zuckerman) (wjc, )
|
May 4, 2010 |
Filing
139
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 132 Plaintiff's Unopposed Joint Motion for Stay of Proceedings Pending Completion of Settlement and Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 7/1/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 7/1/2010. The Settlement Conference set for 05/06/2010 is hereby vacated. The parties shall submit a proposed supplemental Scheduling Order by the close of business on 07/01/2010 after receiving direction from the District Court. At that time, the Court will determine when to reset the Settlement Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 05/04/2010.(wjc, )
|
March 17, 2010 |
Filing
115
MINUTE ORDER granting 102 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint, and the Clerk of Court is directed to enter the First Amended Complaint located at Docket #102-2; denying without prejudice 110 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Disclose Expert Report; granting 113 the Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Fact and Expert Discovery due by 4/30/2010. Absent exceptional cause, the Court is not inclined to grant any additional requests for extension of time. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/17/2010. (mehcd)
|
January 25, 2010 |
Filing
91
MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 88 the Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Absent exceptional cause, the Court is not inclined to grant additional requests for extensions of time. Joinder of Parties/Amendment of Pleadings due by 2/15/2010. Discovery due by 4/1/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 5/3/2010. Initial Expert Disclosures due by 3/12/2010. Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 3/26/2010. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/25/2010. (mehcd)
|
January 12, 2010 |
Filing
82
MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 55 Plaintiff' Bell Colorado, Limited's Motion to Strike Brush Creek Defendants' Additional Claim against Proposed Third-Party Defendant Alex Pananides, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 01/12/2010.(wjc, )
|
November 18, 2009 |
Filing
73
MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 63 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. To the extent the motion requests fees, the Court finds that an award of fees or other sanction is not appropriate under the circumstances, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/18/2009.(wjc, )
|
August 19, 2009 |
Filing
58
MINUTE ORDER granting 41 Motion of Brush Creek Defendants to Add Third Party/Additional Claims, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/19/2009. Clerk of the Court is directed to enter the Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Third Party Complaint. (mehcd)
|
July 7, 2009 |
Filing
39
TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/1/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/7/09. (msksec, )
|
April 28, 2009 |
Filing
22
ORDER ON PUBLIC TRUSTEE'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO DISMISS: Defendant Public Trustee of Pitkin County, Colorado's Unopposed 21 Motion to Dismiss the Public Trustee from Plaintiff's Claims for Damages, Costs and Expenses is granted. Any a nd all claims for damages, costs and expenses in this action against Defendant Public Trustee of Pitkin County are hereby DISMISSED. The caption shall be amended to reflect the deletion of the Public Trustee as a Defendant. On all future pleadings, the caption shall contain all remaining parties, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 04/28/09.(wjc, )
|
February 20, 2009 |
Filing
4
ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/20/09. (mskcd)
|