February 28, 2011 |
Filing
147
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice 146 is APPROVED. The Trial Preparation Conference set for 3/18/2011, is VACATED. The jury trial set for 4/4/2011, is VACATED. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/28/2011. (sah, )
|
November 15, 2010 |
Filing
130
MINUTE ORDER. Defendant The Boeing Companys Motion To File Surreply To Plaintiffs Reply Brief in Support of Motion To Continue Trial Date 128 is GRANTED. Defendant The Boeing Companys Surreply To Plaintiffs Reply Brief in Support of Motion To Continue Trial Date 127 Filed on 11/10/2010 [128-1] is accepted for filing. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/15/2010.(sah, )
|
September 30, 2010 |
Filing
114
ORDER. Defendants Unopposed Motion To Consolidate 110 , filed 09/24/2010, is GRANTED. Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 42(a) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 42.1, Civil CaseNo. 10-cv-02157-REB-KLM and Civil Case No. 10-cv-02199-ZLW are CONSOLIDATEDwith Civil Case No. 0 9-cv-00397-REB-MEH for all purposes. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 42.1, Civil Case No. 10-cv-02157-REB-MJW is REASSIGNED and Civil Case No. 10-cv-02199-ZLW is ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Michael Hegarty By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 09/30/2010.(sah, )
|
September 29, 2010 |
Filing
113
MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 111 The Consolidated Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify Original Scheduling Order to Extend Time to Conduct Discovery and Endorse Expert Witnesses. Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/5/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. The parties shall first conference together and then call Chambers at (303) 844-4507 at the designated time. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/29/2010. (mehcd)
|
August 25, 2010 |
Filing
107
ORDER. Defendants Unopposed Motion To Consolidate 106 , filed 08/24/2010, is GRANTED. Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 42(a) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 42.1, Civil CaseNo. 10-cv-01948-REB-MJW is CONSOLIDATED with Civil Case No. 09-cv-00397-REB-MEHfor all purposes. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 42.1, Civil Case No. 10-cv-01948-REB-MJW IS REASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Michael Hegarty. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 08/25/2010.(sah, )
|
August 20, 2010 |
Filing
105
ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion for Reconsideration or Clarification of Order and Request for Motion to Amend If Necessary 99 , filed 07/02/2010, is DENIED AS MOOT. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 08/20/2010.(sah, )
|
July 19, 2010 |
Filing
102
MINUTE ORDER granting 100 the Joint Motion to Vacate Pending Mediation; however, the Settlement Conference in Warren v. Continental Airlines, Inc., 10-cv-00485-REB-MEH remains set for 7/27/2010. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/19/2010. (mehcd)
|
June 28, 2010 |
Filing
98
ORDER. Defendant The Boeing Company, Inc.s Motion To Certify Order Denying Motion To Dismiss For Interlocutory Appeal 56 , filed 12/03/2009, is GRANTED. This Order is expressly MADE FINAL pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b), there being no just rea son for delay. This action shall is STAYED until either the time for defendant to file an interlocutory appeal under 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) expires or the Tenth Circuit finally disposes of any such appeal. The parties SHALL FILE a status report with the court every sixty (60) days from the date of this order. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 06/28/2010.(sah, )
|
May 7, 2010 |
Filing
97
ORDER. Defendant Continental Airlines, Inc.s Motion To Consolidate and Certificate of Compliance Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1 90 , filed 04/09/2010, is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 05/07/2010.(sah, )
|
March 17, 2010 |
Filing
87
MINUTE ORDER.Plaintiff Malloys Joinder in The Opposition To The Boeing Companys Motion To Certify Order Denying Motion To Dismiss For Interlocutory Appeal 85 is GRANTED. Plaintiff Malloy is permitted to join in Plaintiffs Opposition To The Boeing Companys Motion To Certify Order Denying Motion To Dismiss For Interlocutory Appeal (Dkt. No. 56) 70 filed 12/14/2009. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 03/17/2010.(sah, )
|
March 3, 2010 |
Filing
78
ORDER. Defendants Notice of Related Case and Unopposed Motion To Consolidate 77 filed 03/02/2010, is GRANTED. Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 42(a) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 42.1, Civil Case No. 10-cv-00400-PAB-MJW is CONSOLIDATED with Civil Case No. 09-cv-0039 7-REB-MEH for all purposes. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 42.1, Civil Case No. 10-cv-00400-PAB-MJW is REASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Michael Hegarty. By 03/10/2010, plaintiff in Civil Case No. 10-cv-00400 SHALL FILE either a written notice of joinder i n Plaintiffs Opposition to The Boeing Companys Motion To Certify Order Denying Motion To Dismiss for Interlocutory Appeal (Dkt. No. 56) 70 filed 12/14/2009 or, alternatively, a separate response to the motion; provided, furthermore, if plaintiff files a separate response, defendant may file a reply within the time permitted by D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1C. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 03/03/2010.(sah, )
|
November 23, 2009 |
Filing
55
ORDER denying 34 Defendant The Boeing Company, Inc.s Motion To Dismiss. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/23/2009.(sah, )
|
October 15, 2009 |
Filing
52
ORDER granting 50 Defendants Unopposed Motion To Consolidate Related Actions. Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 42(a) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 42.1, Civil Case No. 09-cv-02412-CMA-MEH is CONSOLIDATED with Civil Case No. 09-cv-00397-REB-MEH for all purposes. Plai ntiff in Civil Case No. 09-cv-02412 SHALL FILE either a written notice of joinder in Plaintiffs Response to Defendant Boeings Motion To Dismiss 37 , filed 07/01/2009, or, alternatively, a separate response to the motion, by no later than 10/19/2009. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/15/2009.(sah, )
|
September 28, 2009 |
Filing
49
ORDER granting 48 Defendants Unopposed Motion To Consolidate Related Actions. Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 42(a) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 42.1, Civil CaseNos. 09-cv-02208-REB-BNB, 09-cv-02209-REB-KLM, and 09-cv-02210-REB-KMT, are CONSOLIDATED with Civil Cas e No. 09-cv-00397-REB-MEH for all purposes. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 42.1, Civil Case Nos. 09-cv-02208-REB-BNB, 09-cv-02209-REB-KLM, and 09-cv-02210-REB-KMT, are REASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Michael Hegarty. Plaintiffs in Civil Case Nos. 09-cv-0 2208, 09-cv-02209, and 09-cv-02210, SHALL FILE either a written notice of joinder in Plaintiffs Response to Defendant Boeings Motion To Dismiss 37 filed 07/01/2009, or alternatively their own, separate responses to the motion within twenty (20) days of the date of this order. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 09/28/2009.(sah, )
|
August 10, 2009 |
Filing
45
TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER Fifteen (15) day Jury Trial set for 4/4/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 3/18/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1001, one (1) hour being reserved, before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/10/09. (rebsec, )
|
June 15, 2009 |
Filing
32
ORDER. Unopposed Amended Motion To Consolidate Related Actions 28 , filed 06/05/2009 is GRANTED. Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 42(a)(2) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 42.1, Civil Action Nos. 09-cv-00398-REB-MJW, 09-cv-00399-REB-CBS, 09-cv-00400-REB-MEH, 09-cv-1064 -REB-KLM, 09-cv-1065-CMA-KMT, 09-cv-01066-REB-MEH, and 09-cv-01067-REB-CBS, are CONSOLIDATED with Civil Action No. 09-cv-00397-REB-MEHfor all purposes. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 42.1, Civil Action Nos. 09-cv-00398-REB-MJW, 09-cv-00399-REB-CBS, 09-cv-1064-REB-KLM, 09-cv-1065-CMA-KMT, and 09- cv-01067-REB-CBS are REASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Michael Hegarty by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 06/15/2009.(sah, )
|
June 8, 2009 |
Filing
31
MINUTE ORDER. Notice of Voluntary Withdrawal of Motion To Consolidate Related Actions (Docket No. 7) 29 filed 06/05/2009. The notice is being construed by the court as a motion, and the motion is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion To Consolidate Related Actions 7 filed 03/03/2009 is WITHDRAWN by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 06/08/2009.(sah, )
|
May 27, 2009 |
Filing
27
MINUTE ORDER denying 26 Plaintiffs Motion For Leave to File a Sur-Reply or in the Alternative for Oral Argument by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 05/27/2009.(sah, )
|