Ind v. Colorado Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Jacob Ind
Defendant: Colorado Department of Corrections, Susan Jones, Mary Nell McCormick, McCain Hildebrand, Rene Olivett and James W. Brown
Case Number: 1:2009cv00537
Filed: March 13, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER Pursuant to the Tenth Circuits Opinion and Mandate ECF Nos. [333-35], the Court ORDERS as follows: 1. The following docket entries are VACATED: a. Final Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law ECF No. 300 ; b. Final Judgment ECF No. 301 ; c. Taxation of Costs ECF No. 308 ); and d. Order RE: Plaintiffs Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs ECF No. 319 . 2. This case is DISMISSED AS MOOT, by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/19/2015. (evana, )
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER granting in part 303 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. By Judge William J. Martinez on 12/2/2014.(alowe)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 300 FINAL FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/31/2014. (evana, )
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER DIRECTING FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/13/2014. (ervsl, ) (Modified on 1/13/2014 edited title to reflect this is an Order Directing Findings of Fact)(ervsl, ).
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 270 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS and/or DEPOSITIONS, by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/7/2014. (wjmcd, )
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER granting 264 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss claim 5. by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/3/2014.(trlee, )
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER denying 198 Motion for Summary Judgment, by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/10/2013.(trlee, )
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER This matter is before the Court on Plaintiffs oral Motion to Compel production by Defendant Colorado Department of Corrections (CDOC) of certain documents pertaining to Plaintiff, who is currently incarcerated at the Limon Correctional Facility in Limon, Colorado. Plaintiffs oral Motion to Compel Production of Documents is denied, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/30/2013. (ervsl, )
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER granting 226 Defendants Colorado Department of Corrections and Mary Nell McCormicks Unopposed Motion to Seal Ex. B to Response to Motion to Compel. The Documents filed at ECF No. 216 shall remain RESTRICTED at RESTRICTION LEVEL 1 (viewable only by Case Participants and the Court), by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/23/2013.(ervsl, )
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 224 MINUTE ORDER granting 219 Defendants CDOCs and Mary Nell McCormicks Renewed, Unopposed Motion to Seal Exs. J and L to Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is directed to maintain the following documents UNDER RESTRICTION at LEVEL 1: Exhibit J 199 and Exhibit L 200 to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/16/2013.(ervsl, )
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 218 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 211 Defendants CDOCs and Mary Nell McCormicks Motion to Seal Exs. J and L to Motion for Summary Judgment, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/9/2013.(ervsl, )
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 193 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 05/13/2013. (klmcd)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER Plaintiffs Objection 165 to the Magistrate Judges July 6, 2012 Recommendation is SUSTAINED; The Court DECLINES TO ADOPT 161 Report and Recommendations; and denies 151 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Objection 165 to the Magistrate Judges July 6, 2012 by Judge William J. Martinez on 09/13/12.(alvsl, )
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MINUTE ORDER granting 153 Defendants Motion to Vacate January 26, 2012 Preliminary Scheduling Conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that discovery and scheduling in this matter are hereby STAYED pending resolution of Defendants Motion to Dismiss, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/23/2012.(ervsl, )
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER OVERRULING 138 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court; ADOPTED In It's Entirety 137 Report and Recommendations. Defendants Jones, Hildebrand, Olivett, Brown, and DeCesaro are dismissed as Parties-Defendants to this action, by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/19/2012.(ervsl, )
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER the parties are directed to confer and to file a Joint Status Report, Status Report due by 2/23/2011, by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/14/11. (lyg, )
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER denying 123 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/9/2011.(erv, )
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 114 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Depositions, Sanctions, and Stay of Discovery. To the extent that Plaintiff suffered any injury from the delay, he may file a motion detailing that injury and proposing an appropriate relief, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/22/10.(mnf, )
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MINUTE ORDER granting 100 Motion to Amend the Complaint; Denying as moot 96 Motion for Extension of Time ; by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/25/2010.(erv, )
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER AFFIRMED AND ADOPTED IN PART AND OVERRULED IN PART 75 Report and Recommendations of March 23, 2009. The Recommendation is overruled only as to Magistrate Judge Mixs recommendation to deny Plaintiffs official capacity claims against the indivi dual Defendants for prospective injunctive relief. I will allow those claims to go forward. The Recommendation is affirmed and adopted in all other respects. In accordance therewith, it is ORDERED that the Defendants Motion to Dismiss Final Amended C omplaint, filed October 9, 2010 50 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, as set forth herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint on or before Friday, October 22, 2010. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/30/2010.(erv, )
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting 82 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Discovery until such time as my Recommendation on the Motion to Dismiss [#75] is resolved. Upon resolution, the parties shall have sixty (60) days from the date of the ruling by the District Court J udge to schedule and complete depositions on the remaining issues. No further types of discovery shall be permitted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court sua sponte extends the dispositive motions deadline to ninety (90) days from the date of the ruling by the District Court Judge on the pending dispositive motion. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/3/2010.(erv, )
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Denying as moot 54 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; denying 63 Motion to Compel; denying 69 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/8/2010.(erv, )
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MINUTE ORDER denying 60 Plaintiffs Motion to Strike or to Sanction by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/22/2010.(klmcd)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 27 Motion to Dismiss entered by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/1/09. (wydcd, rrk)
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING SERVICE BY UNITED STATES MARSHAL, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/28/09. (ebs, )
April 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Plaintiffs Motion to Amend or Supplement Complaint. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/17/09.(erv, )
April 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting Service by the United States Marshall re: 3 Complaint filed by Jacob Ind by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/10/09. (erv, )
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Drawing Case. Ordered that this case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 04/06/2009. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ind v. Colorado Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Ind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Nell McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCain Hildebrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rene Olivett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?