McCulley et al v. Board of County Commissioners of the County of Jefferson, Colorado, The et al
Plaintiff: |
John McCulley and Carmen McCulley |
Defendant: |
Board of County Commissioners of the County of Jefferson, Colorado, The and Kaycee Starkey |
Counter Claimant: |
Kaycee Starkey |
Counter Defendant: |
John McCulley and Carmen McCulley |
Case Number: |
1:2009cv00563 |
Filed: |
March 16, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Civil Rights: Other Office |
County: |
Jefferson |
Presiding Judge: |
Boyd N. Boland |
Presiding Judge: |
Philip A. Brimmer |
Nature of Suit: |
Plaintiff |
Cause of Action: |
Federal Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 9, 2009 |
Filing
44
ORDER granting 21 Defendants Ted Mink and Carla Zinanti's Motion to Dismiss, which is converted into a Motion for Summary Judgment. All claims against these defendants in plaintiffs John and Carmen McCulley's Amended Complaint 14 are d ismissed with prejudice. The only remaining claims are the claim and counterclaim between the McCulleys and Kaycee Starkey. The Court declines to exercise its discretion to maintain jurisdiction over the claim and counterclaim between the McCulleys and Kaycee Starkey. These claims, therefore, are remanded to the District Court for Jefferson County, Colorado. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in favor of defendants Mink and Zinanti and against plaintiffs John and Carmen McCulley on all of the claims asserted against these defendants. Defendants Mink and Zinanti may have their costs by filing a bill of costs within fourteen days of the date of this order, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/9/09.(ebs, )
|
July 21, 2009 |
Filing
43
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Motion Hearing held on 7/21/2009. 21 Motion to Dismiss submitted and under advisement. Written order shall issue. (Court Reporter Janet Coppock) (pabcd)
|
May 1, 2009 |
Filing
25
ORDER granting 22 Sheriff Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery Based On Governmental Immunity. Discovery is stayed pending a ruling on the Defendant Jefferson County Sheriff Ted Mink and Jefferson County Animal Control Manager Carla Zinanti 039;s Combined Motion and Brief to Dismiss 21 . The parties shall file a status report within ten days after any ruling on the Motion to Dismiss addressing what, if any, additional pretrial matters should be scheduled, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/1/09.(ebs, )
|
April 20, 2009 |
Filing
18
ORDER re: 17 Plaintiffs' Brief in support of Leave to File Amended Complaint. Cause being shown, leave is granted to plaintiffs. Accepting 14 Amended Complaint and Jury Demand, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/20/09. (ebs, )
|
April 13, 2009 |
Filing
15
ORDER pursuant to Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), defendant Board of County Commissioners of the County of Jefferson, Colorado and all claims to the extent that they are asserted against the Board, are dismis sed from this case, with each party to bear its own attorneys fees and costs. Denying as moot 9 Jefferson County Board of County Commissioners' Combined Motion and Brief to Dismiss, and denying as moot 10 Defendant Board of County Commissioners' Motion to Stay Discovery Based on Governmental Immunity, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/13/09.(ebs, )
|
March 25, 2009 |
Filing
8
ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 5/1/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/25/09. (ebs, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?