Gianzero et al v. Wal Mart Stores, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Josephine Gianzero and Jennifer Jensen
Defendant: American Home Assurance Co., Claims Management, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc. and Concentra Health Services, Inc.
Respondent: Lexington Insurance Company
Interested Party: Lauren Tarver, Patrice S. Matthes, Niccolo Grando, Mark Plucinski, Robin Haney and Steven A. Fernandez
Case Number: 1:2009cv00656
Filed: March 24, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Boyd N Boland
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 515 ORDER Approving Supplemental Distribution to Confirmed Claimants in Subclasses B and C, and Payment of Related Claims Administration Expenses. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/24/2014.(klyon, )
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 514 MINUTE ORDER: The Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion For (1) Approval of a Supplemental Distribution To Confirmed Claimants in Subclasses B and C; and (2) Payment of Related Claims Administration Expenses [#512]2 filed June 23, 2014 is DENIED as moot. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/24/2014.(klyon, )
June 23, 2014 Filing 513 Amended MOTION to Supplement by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Kathleen Wyatt on Behalf of Gilardi & Co, LLC Re Report on Uncashed Checks, Settlement Fund Balance, and Actual and Estimated Costs for Supplemental Distribution to Confirmed Claimants in Subclasses B and C, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order Approving Supplemental Distribution to Confirmed Claimants in Subclasses B and C, and Payment of Related Claims Administration Expenses)(Koncilja, Frances)
June 23, 2014 Filing 512 Unopposed MOTION to Supplement by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Kathleen Wyatt on Behalf of Gilardi & Co, LLC Re Report on Uncashed Checks, Settlement Fund Balance, and Actual and Estimated Costs for Supplemental Distribution to Confirmed Claimants in Subclasses B and C, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order Approving Supplemental Distribution to Confirmed Claimants in Subclasses B and C, and Payment of Related Claims Administration Expenses)(Koncilja, Frances)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 511 MINUTE ORDER granting #498 Supplement To Plaintiffs' Verified Motion For Issuance of Contempt Citation Against Lexington Insurance Company and Its Agent Mark Kanady and To Enforce Settlement Agreement and Order Payment of The Amount of $3,964,489.30 from Lexington Insurance Company and/or Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/14/2013. (klyon, )
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 510 ORDER denying #496 Plaintiffs' Verified Motion for Issuance of Contempt Citation Against Lexington Insurance Company and its Agent Mark Kanady and to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Order Payment of the Amount of $3,964,489.30 from Lexington Insurance Company And/or Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/25/13. (kfinn, )
July 30, 2012 Filing 509 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE SETTLEMENT CLASS REPRESENTATIVES AND CLASS MEMBERS AND DEFENDANTS WAL-MART STORES, INC., CLAIMS MANAGEMENT, INC., AMERICAN HOME ASSURANCE COMPANY, AND CONCENTRA HEALTH SERVICES, INC. by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Drake, C.)
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 508 ORDER granting #505 Motion for Leave to Restrict Public Access #506 Restricted Document - Level 1 by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/23/2012.(dbrow, )
July 9, 2012 Filing 507 REPLY in Support of #496 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement, and #498 MOTION to Supplement #496 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement filed by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #506 filed 7/9/12. Text Only Entry. (mjgsl, )
July 9, 2012 Filing 506 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiff Josephine Gianzero.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Contempt and Supplement Thereto)(Koncilja, Frances)
July 9, 2012 Filing 505 MOTION for Leave to Restrict Document by Plaintiff Josephine Gianzero. (Attachments: #1 Restricted Attachment Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Verified Motion & Supplement Thereto for Issuance of Contempt Citation Against Lexington Insurance Company and its Agent Mark Kanady, #2 Restricted Attachment Exhibit 1 to Plaintffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Verified Motion & Supplement Thereto)(Koncilja, Frances) Modified on 7/10/2012 exhibits have been placed under restriction due to filing error. Exhibits were correctly refiled at document #506(sahsl, ).
July 5, 2012 Filing 504 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE with the Second Amended Protective Order by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Lindsay, Greg)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 503 ORDER GRANTING #499 MOTION TO RESTRICT PUBLIC ACCESS by Respondent. Lexington's Response To Plaintiffs' Verified Motion (and Supplement Thereto) For Issuance of Contempt Citation Against Lexington Insurance Company [#500] and the exhibits thereto SHALL BE MAINTAINED under Level 1 restriction. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/2/12.(dbrow, )
June 25, 2012 Filing 502 RESPONSE to #496 Plaintiffs' Verified Motion (And Supplement Thereto) For Issuance Of Contempt Citation. (Public entry for Restricted Document #500 filed 6/25/12) Text Only Entry (mjgsl, ) Modified on 7/3/2012 to correct typo (mjgsl, ).
June 25, 2012 Filing 501 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Respondent Lexington Insurance Company. (Mickley, Lisa)
June 25, 2012 Filing 500 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Respondent Lexington Insurance Company.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit 1-B, #4 Exhibit 1-C, #5 Exhibit 1-D, #6 Exhibit 2)(Mickley, Lisa)
June 25, 2012 Filing 499 MOTION for Leave to Restrict Document by Respondent Lexington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Mickley, Lisa)
June 15, 2012 Filing 498 MOTION to Supplement #496 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement by Plaintiff Josephine Gianzero. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Koncilja, Frances)
June 11, 2012 Filing 497 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service by Plaintiff Josephine Gianzero. (Koncilja, Frances)
June 8, 2012 Filing 496 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement by Plaintiff Josephine Gianzero. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Motion to Enforce, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Motion to Enforce, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B-1 to Dec. of FAK, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Motion to Enforce, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C-1 to Dec. of PAM, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D to Motion to Enforce)(Koncilja, Frances)
April 19, 2012 Filing 495 TRANSCRIPT of Fairness Hearing held on March 23, 2012 before Judge Blackburn. Pages: 1-19. Prepared by: Bonnie Carpenter. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/23/2012. (Hoard, Charlotte)
March 28, 2012 Filing 494 FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk re: #492 Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal and #493 Order of Injunction, by Clerk on 3/28/12. (gmssl, )
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 493 ORDER of Injunction, pursuant to the Settlement Agreement, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/26/12. (Attachments: #1 Addendum) (gmssl, )
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 492 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting #483 Motion for Final Approval of Settlement, as set forth and approving the payment of Attorneys' fees (re: #484 Motion for Attorney Fees). Court directs judgment and immediate entry by the Clerk of the Court, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/26/12.(gmssl, ) Modified on 3/27/2012 to correct spelling error (gmssl, ).
March 23, 2012 Filing 491 MINUTE ENTRY for Fairness Hearing held on 3/23/2012 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. (Court Reporter: Bonnie Carpenter) (rebcd)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 489 MINUTE ORDER granting #464 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for an Order Preliminarily Approving Class Action Settlement, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 03/23/2012.(wjcsl, )
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 488 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot the motions docketed as #440 , #443 , #448 , #453 , #465 , by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 03/23/2012.(wjcsl, )
March 22, 2012 Filing 490 Amicus Curiae Motion in Limine Pro Publicum Regarding the Proposed Class Action Settlement by Elizabeth Steiner (Attachments: #1 Part 2)(sah, )
March 21, 2012 Filing 487 RESPONSE to #472 Objections Filed By Patrice Matthes by Defendants American Home Assurance Co., Claims Management, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Beer, Naomi)
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 486 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion For Class Member Patrice Matthes To Participate in 3/23/2012 Settlement Fairness Hearing By Telephone #485 filed 3/14/2012, is GRANTED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/15/2012.(sahsl, )
March 14, 2012 Filing 485 Unopposed MOTION for Order to Allow Class Member Patrice Matthes to Participate in March 23, 2012 Settlement Fairness Hearing by Telephone by Plaintiff Josephine Gianzero. (Koncilja, Frances)
March 12, 2012 Filing 484 Unopposed MOTION for Award Attorney Fees Reimbursement of Expenses, and for Payment of Incentive Awards to the Class Representatives, by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (sah, )
March 12, 2012 Filing 483 MOTION for Final Approval of the Proposed Class Action Settlement by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(sah, )
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ORDER. Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion To Exceed Page Limit For PlaintiffsMotion For Final Approval of The Proposed Class Action Settlement #477 filed3/9/2012, is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion To Exceed Page Limit For Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion For Award of Attorneys Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and For Payment of Incentive Awards To The Class Representatives #478 filed 3/9/2012, is GRANTED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/12/2012.(sah, )
March 12, 2012 Filing 481 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: A Fairness Hearing is set for 3/23/2012 at 09:00 AM before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry (sah, )
March 9, 2012 Filing 480 DECLARATION of Markham Sherwood on Behalf of Gilardi & Co, LLC re Mailing of Notice of Proposed Class Action Settlement, Report on Requests for Exclusion, and Actual and Estimated Costs regarding MOTION for Order to Exceed Page Limit for Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and for Payment of Incentive Awards to the Class Representatives #478 , MOTION for Order to Exceed Page Limit on Motion for Final Approval #477 by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Cera, Solomon)
March 9, 2012 Filing 479 DECLARATION of Frances A. Koncilja, Solomon B. Cera and Steven U. Mullens regarding MOTION for Order to Exceed Page Limit for Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and for Payment of Incentive Awards to the Class Representatives #478 , MOTION for Order to Exceed Page Limit on Motion for Final Approval #477 by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cera, Solomon)
March 9, 2012 Filing 478 MOTION for Order to Exceed Page Limit for Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and for Payment of Incentive Awards to the Class Representatives by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion to Exceed Page Limit)(Cera, Solomon)
March 9, 2012 Filing 477 MOTION for Order to Exceed Page Limit on Motion for Final Approval by Plaintiff Josephine Gianzero. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion to Exceed Page Limit, #2 Exhibit A to Motion for Final Approval, #3 Exhibit B to Motion for Final Approval)(Koncilja, Frances)
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 475 MINUTE ORDER: denying without prejudice #425 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying without prejudice #437 Motion to Compel, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/25/12.(bnbcd, )
January 24, 2012 Filing 476 LETTER re: #470 Settlement Notice by Interested Party Niccolo Grando. (sah, )
January 23, 2012 Filing 474 OBJECTIONS to #470 Notice (Other) by Interested Party Mark Plucinski. (sah, )
January 13, 2012 Filing 473 LETTER re: #470 Notice (Other) by Interested Party Robin Haney. (sah, )
January 10, 2012 Filing 472 OBJECTIONS to #470 Settlement Agreement by Interested Party Patrice S. Matthes. (sah, )
January 4, 2012 Filing 471 STATEMENT by Interested Party Steven A. Fernandez. (sah, )
November 30, 2011 Filing 470 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT re #469 Order on Motion for Order by Defendants American Home Assurance Co., Claims Management, Inc., Concentra Health Services, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen (sah, )
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 469 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion To File Fully Executed Copy of the Settlement Agreement #468 filed 11/29/2011, is GRANTED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/30/2011.(sah, )
November 29, 2011 Filing 468 Unopposed MOTION for Order to File a Fully Executed Copy of the Settlement Agreement by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-A6)(Koncilja, Frances)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 467 ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND SETTING FINAL FAIRNESS HEARING. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/22/2011. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Proposed Class Action Settlement) (sah, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2011: #2 Publication Notice Proposed Settlement and Final Settlement Hearing) (sah, ).
November 21, 2011 Filing 465 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate Trial Dates by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Koncilja, Frances)
November 21, 2011 Filing 464 Unopposed MOTION for Order to Preliminarily Approve Class Action Settlement by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Motion for Preliminary Approval, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 to Settlement Agreement, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A-2 to Settlement Agreement, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Order of Injunction, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A-3 to Settlement Agreement, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A-4 to Settlement Agreement, #7 Exhibit Exhibit A-5 to Settlement Agreement, #8 Exhibit Exhibit A-6 to Settlement Agreement, #9 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order to Motion for Preliminary Approval, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Proposed Order for Preliminary Approval, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Proposed Order for Preliminary Approval)(Koncilja, Frances)
November 18, 2011 Filing 466 MINUTE ENTRY for Status Conference held before Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/18/2011. (Court Reporter: Suzanne Claar) (rebcd)
October 31, 2011 Filing 463 Unopposed MOTION for Order to Replace Exhibit A, Dkt. No. 73-4, With Redacted Exhibit A by Defendants American Home Assurance Co., Claims Management, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #2 Exhibit A)(Beer, Naomi)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 462 MINUTE ORDER. The Stipulated Motion To Set Hearing on TheMotion For Preliminary Approval on November 18, 2011 at 1:30 p.m. #461 is GRANTED. The Trial Preparation Conference set for 11/18/2011, at 1:30 p.m. is converted to a hearing on the parties anticipated motion for preliminary approval of settlement. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/18/2011.(sah, )
October 17, 2011 Filing 461 Stipulated MOTION for Hearing/Conference on the Motion for Preliminary Approval on November 18, 2011 at 1:30 p.m. by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order Approving Parties' Stipulated Motion to Set Hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Approval on November 18, 2011 at 1:30 p.m.)(Koncilja, Frances)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 460 ORDER. The Joint Motion To File Under Seal Joint Notice and Status Report #455 filed 9/22/2011, IS GRANTED. The Joint Notice and Status Report #456 is FILED UNDER SEAL. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/29/2011.(sah, )
September 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ORDER Concerning Joint Notice and 457 Status Report. All pending pre-trial deadlines are vacated. Pending further developments, Trial Preparation Conference set for 11/18/2011 at 01:30 PM before Judge Robert E. Blackburn, bench trial set 11/29/11, additional trial preparation conference (In Court Hearing) set for 1/4/2012 at 01:30 PM before Judge Robert E. Blackburn, and jury trial set 1/9/12 shall remain set on the court's calendar, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/23/11. (gmssl, )
September 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 458 MINUTE ORDER : the Pretrial Conference set for October 3, 2011, and the deadline to submit a proposed Pretrial Order of September 26, 2011, are VACATED, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/23/11. (bnbcd, )
September 22, 2011 Filing 457 JOINT NOTICE AND STATUS REPORT by Defendants American Home Assurance Co., Claims Management, Inc.. Public entry to #456 SEALED DOCUMENT filed on 9/22/2011. TEXT ONLY ENTRY- NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (sah, )
September 22, 2011 Filing 456 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants American Home Assurance Co., Claims Management, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Beer, Naomi)
September 22, 2011 Filing 455 Joint MOTION to Seal Joint Notice and Status Report by Defendants American Home Assurance Co., Claims Management, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Beer, Naomi)
September 8, 2011 Filing 454 DECLARATION of Naomi Beer regarding Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Motion to Decertify and Request for Hearing #453 by Defendants American Home Assurance Co., Claims Management, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20)(Beer, Naomi)
September 8, 2011 Filing 453 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Motion to Decertify and Request for Hearing by Defendants American Home Assurance Co., Claims Management, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Beer, Naomi)
September 6, 2011 Filing 452 RESPONSE to #437 MOTION to Compel Concentra filed by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email)(Cook-Olson, Amy)
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 451 MINUTE ORDER granting #447 Motion for Order by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/2/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebcd)
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 450 MINUTE ORDER granting #444 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/2/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebcd)
September 1, 2011 Filing 449 DECLARATION of Sana Muttalib in Support of Defendant Concentra Health Services Inc.'s Motion to Decertify Class regarding MOTION to Certify Class Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.'s Motion to Decertify Class #448 by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-9 to Muttalib Declaration, #2 Exhibits 10-16 to Muttalib Declaration)(Maddigan, Michael)
September 1, 2011 Filing 448 MOTION to Certify Class Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.'s Motion to Decertify Class by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Maddigan, Michael)
September 1, 2011 Filing 447 Unopposed MOTION for Order to Grant Defendant Concentra Health Services Inc.'s to Exceed the Page Limit on its Motion to Decertify Class by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Maddigan, Michael)
September 1, 2011 Filing 446 DECLARATION of Jennifer Pickard - Second regarding Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Summary Judgment Motions #444 by Defendants American Home Assurance Co., Claims Management, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Beer, Naomi)
September 1, 2011 Filing 445 DECLARATION of Naomi Beer regarding Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Summary Judgment Motions #444 by Defendants American Home Assurance Co., Claims Management, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Beer, Naomi)
September 1, 2011 Filing 444 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Summary Judgment Motions by Defendants American Home Assurance Co., Claims Management, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Beer, Naomi)
September 1, 2011 Filing 443 Joint MOTION for Order to Set Briefing Schedule for Summary Judgment Motions and Motions to Decertify by Defendant Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Beer, Naomi)
September 1, 2011 Filing 442 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sana Muttalib on behalf of Concentra Health Services, Inc. (Muttalib, Sana)
September 1, 2011 Filing 441 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael McDonald Maddigan on behalf of Concentra Health Services, Inc. (Maddigan, Michael)
August 31, 2011 Filing 440 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cook-Olson, Amy)
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 439 MINUTE ORDER : re: #437 MOTION to Compel Concentra filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero. The defendants shall respond to the Motion on or before September 6, 2011. No reply will be accepted without leave of court, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/22/11. (bnbcd, )
August 19, 2011 Filing 438 MEMORANDUM regarding #437 MOTION to Compel Concentra filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/19/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
August 19, 2011 Filing 437 MOTION to Compel Concentra by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Koncilja, Frances)
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 436 MINUTE ORDER : granting #434 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael D. Alper and Terence M. Ridley terminated, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/17/11.(bnbcd, )
August 17, 2011 Filing 435 MEMORANDUM regarding #434 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as Co-Counsel of Record by Terence M. Ridley and Michael D. Alper filed by Concentra Health Services, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/17/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
August 16, 2011 Filing 434 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as Co-Counsel of Record by Terence M. Ridley and Michael D. Alper by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Ridley, Terence)
August 5, 2011 Filing 433 RESPONSE to #425 MOTION for Reconsideration of Court's Order July 11, 2011 Order [Dkt 411] filed by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cook-Olson, Amy)
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 432 SECOND AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/4/11. (lsw, )
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER granting #428 Motion to Amend Protective Order, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/4/11.(lsw, )
August 1, 2011 Filing 430 STIPULATION by Defendants American Home Assurance Co., Claims Management, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Federal Rule of Evidence Rule 502 Non-Waiver Agreement Regarding Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' Request for Production Number 17)(Beer, Naomi)
July 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 429 MEMORANDUM regarding #428 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Protective Order filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/27/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
July 26, 2011 Filing 428 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Protective Order by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Koncilja, Frances)
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 427 MINUTE ORDER : re: #425 MOTION for Reconsideration of Court's Order July 11, 2011 Order [Dkt 411]filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero. The defendants shall respond to the Motion on or before August 5, 2011. No reply will be accepted without leave of court, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/26/11. (bnbcd, )
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 426 MEMORANDUM regarding #425 MOTION for Reconsideration of Court's Order July 11, 2011 Order [Dkt 411] filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/26/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
July 25, 2011 Filing 425 MOTION for Reconsideration of Court's Order July 11, 2011 Order [Dkt 411] by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of F. Koncilja)(Koncilja, Frances)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 424 MINUTE ORDER: granting #422 Joint Motion to Permit Two Expert Depositions to Occur After the Close of Discovery, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/15/11.(bnbcd, )
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 423 MEMORANDUM regarding #422 Joint MOTION for Order to Permit Two Expert Depositions to Occur After the Close of Discovery filed by Wal Mart Stores, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/15/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebcd)
July 15, 2011 Filing 422 Joint MOTION for Order to Permit Two Expert Depositions to Occur After the Close of Discovery by Defendant Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Beer, Naomi)
July 15, 2011 Filing 421 DECLARATION of Markham Sherwood re Mailing of Notice of Class Action regarding Order,,, #379 by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cera, Solomon)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion to Seal Exhibit C #395 is DENIED. This order shall be effective and Document No. 396 shall be unsealed and deemed a part of the public record at the later of: (a) July 28, 2011, or (b) following a ruling by the district judge if an objection to this order is filed. See D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2J. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/13/2011.(sah, )
July 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER: denying #394 Motion for Protective Order.The deposition of Dr. Orgel shall be reset to a date and time as the parties and the witness may agree, but shall occur no later than August 1, 2011 Discovery due by 8/1/2011, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/13/11.(bnbcd, )
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER. Defendant American Home Assurance Co.s Motion to File Under Seal [etc.] #343 is DENIED. This order shall be effective and Document No. 344 shall be unsealed and deemed a part of the public record at the later of: (a) July 27, 2011, or (b) following a ruling by the district judge if an objection to this order is filed. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/12/2011.(sah, )
July 12, 2011 Filing 417 RESPONSE to #394 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order regarding the Deposition of Dr. David Orgel and Request for Expedited Briefing and Hearing filed by Defendants American Home Assurance Co., Claims Management, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Beer, Naomi)
July 12, 2011 Filing 416 Docket Annotation re: #415 Response to Motion. Counsel will file a corrected version of the document. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (sah, ) Modified on 7/12/2011 to correct linkage and to clarify entry(sah2, ).
July 12, 2011 Filing 415 RESPONSE to #394 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order regarding the Deposition of Dr. David Orgel and Request for Expedited Briefing and Hearing filed by Defendants American Home Assurance Co., Claims Management, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Beer, Naomi)
July 12, 2011 Filing 414 RESPONSE to #394 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order regarding the Deposition of Dr. David Orgel and Request for Expedited Briefing and Hearing filed by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Hensen, Stephen)
July 11, 2011 Filing 413 Exhibit 14 Redacted in Support of #130 Response, by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (sah, )
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER. (1)The First Motion to Seal is GRANTED with respect to Exhibit 14, which shall remain sealed, and is otherwise DENIED. Exhibits 1 through 13 and 15 shall be unsealed and deemed a part of the public record Motion for Leave; denying #355 Motion to Seal; (2) The Motion to Substitute #325 is GRANTED, and the Clerk of the Court is directed to accept for filing Doc. # 325-1; (3) The Second Motion to Seal [Doc. # 314], Third Motion to Seal #355 , Fourth Motion to Seal [Doc. # 365], and Fifth Motion to Seal #367 are DENIED. The materials sought to be filed under seal shall be unsealed and deemed a part of the public record; and (4) The Motion to Exceed Page Limit #341 is GRANTED. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/8/2011.(sah, )
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER. (1) Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Concentra #305 is GRANTED as specified with respect to Interrogatory 19, and otherwise DENIED; (2) Concentras Motion: Ex Parte Interviews #308 is GRANTED to allow the ex parte interviews, and otherwise DENIED; (3) Wal-Marts Motion to Compel #309 is GRANTED to require full answers to Interrogatories No. 1, 2, 4 (except concerning the purpose of the inquiry or survey), and 5, and otherwise DENIED; (4) Plaintiffs Motion to Compel AHAC #311 is GRANTED with respect to Interrogatory No. 33 to require AHAC to explain the contents of the chart and to supplement the chart to bring it current, and otherwise DENIED; (5) Plaintiffs First Motion to Compel Wal-Mart #312 is GRANTED with respect to Interrogatory No. 23, subparts (b), (f), and (g); GRANTED with respect to Production Request No. 17; and otherwise DENIED; (6) Plaintiffs Motion for Protective Order #313 is DENIED as premature; (7) Plaintiffs Second Motion to Compel Wal-Mart #316 is DENIED; (8) Concentras Motion re: Confidential Documents #351 is DENIED; (9) Motion re Fortunato Deposition #362 is DENIED; and (10) The parties shall make supplemental discovery responses consistent with this Order on or before 8/1/2011. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/8/2011.(sah, )
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 410 ORDER. Defendants Emergency Motion Regarding Class Notice #407 filed 7/5/2011, is GRANTED. The Request for Exclusion to be included in the notice to the class contemplated by my Order Directing Notice to Class #379 , filed 6/9/2011, SHALL INCLUDE a postage prepaid and pre-addressed return label, all costs and expenses of which SHALL BE paid by defendants. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/8/2011.(sah, )
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 409 MINUTE ORDER re: #407 Defendants Emergency Motion Regarding Class Notice. The plaintiffs shall respond to the Motion on or before 7/25/2011. No reply will be accepted without leave of court. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/5/2011. (sah, )
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 408 MEMORANDUM regarding #407 Emergency MOTION for Order to Regarding Class Notice filed by American Home Assurance Co., Concentra Health Services, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/5/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
July 5, 2011 Filing 407 Emergency MOTION for Order to Regarding Class Notice by Defendants American Home Assurance Co., Claims Management, Inc., Concentra Health Services, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Beer, Naomi)
July 1, 2011 Filing 406 1 CD-ROM re #405 Notice (Other) by Defendant Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. Conventionally submitted material. Available in the Clerk's Office. TEXT ONLY ENTRY- NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (sah, )
July 1, 2011 Filing 405 NOTICE re #379 Order,,, Notice of Joint Submission Under Seal of Class List in Compliance with the Court's Order Directing Notice to Class by Defendants American Home Assurance Co., Claims Management, Inc., Concentra Health Services, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen (Beer, Naomi)
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 404 MINUTE ORDER :denying #402 Motion for Protective Order, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/27/11.(bnbcd, )
June 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 403 MEMORANDUM regarding #402 MOTION for Protective Order With Respect to New and Expanded 30(B)(6) Deposition Topics filed by Wal Mart Stores, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/27/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, ) Modified on 6/28/2011 to remove repetitive text (sah2, ).
June 24, 2011 Filing 402 MOTION for Protective Order With Respect to New and Expanded 30(B)(6) Deposition Topics by Defendant Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Beer, Naomi)
June 24, 2011 Filing 401 ERRATA re #394 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order regarding the Deposition of Dr. David Orgel and Request for Expedited Briefing and Hearing by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Markert, Pamela)
June 24, 2011 Filing 400 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Natalia Solis Ballinger on behalf of American Home Assurance Co., Claims Management, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc. (Ballinger, Natalia)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 399 MINUTE ORDER re: #394 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order regarding the Deposition of Dr. David Orgel and Request for Expedited Briefing and Hearing filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero, IT IS ORDERED that the defendants shall respond to the Motion on or before July 12, 2011. No reply will be accepted without leave of court. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/21/2011. (erv, )
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 398 MEMORANDUM regarding #395 MOTION to Seal Exhibit C Pursuant to Amended Protective Order filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero, #394 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order regarding the Deposition of Dr. David Orgel and Request for Expedited Briefing and Hearing filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/21/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
June 20, 2011 Filing 397 Exhibit C in Support of #394 Plaintiffs' Emergency MOTION for Protective Order Regarding the Deposition of Dr. David Orgel and Request for Expedited Briefing and Hearing by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Public entry for Sealed Document #396 filed 06/20/2011.) TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (wjc, )
June 20, 2011 Filing 396 UNSEALED- SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit C in Support of #394 by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Markert, Pamela) Modified on 7/28/2011 pursuant to the Order dated 7/14/2011 (sahsl, ).
June 20, 2011 Filing 395 MOTION to Seal Exhibit C Pursuant to Amended Protective Order by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Markert, Pamela)
June 20, 2011 Filing 394 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order regarding the Deposition of Dr. David Orgel and Request for Expedited Briefing and Hearing by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit D)(Markert, Pamela)
June 16, 2011 Filing 393 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena to Primack by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen (Attachments: #1 Subpoena Duces Tecum)(Koncilja, Frances)
June 16, 2011 Filing 392 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena to Pitzer by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen (Attachments: #1 Subpoena Duces Tecum)(Koncilja, Frances)
June 16, 2011 Filing 391 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena to Phillips by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen (Attachments: #1 Subpoena Duces Tecum)(Koncilja, Frances)
June 16, 2011 Filing 390 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena to Patten by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen (Attachments: #1 Subpoena Duces Tecum)(Koncilja, Frances)
June 16, 2011 Filing 389 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena to Parks by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen (Attachments: #1 Subpoena Duces Tecum)(Koncilja, Frances)
June 16, 2011 Filing 388 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena to Mulvaney by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen (Attachments: #1 Subpoena Duces Tecum)(Koncilja, Frances)
June 16, 2011 Filing 387 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena to Alan Burgess by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen (Attachments: #1 Subpoena Duces Tecum)(Koncilja, Frances)
June 13, 2011 Filing 386 TRANSCRIPT of TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE held on June 6, 2011, before Judge Blackburn. Pages: 1 - 15.
< NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov.

< Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/15/2011. (sclaa, )
June 10, 2011 Filing 385 REPLY to Response to #314 Proposed MOTION to Seal Motion to Compel and Related Documents Reply in support of Plaintiffs' motion to compel production of documents identified on privilege log filed by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Giblin, Gwendolyn)
June 10, 2011 Filing 384 REPLY to Response to #311 MOTION to Compel American Home Assurance Company to 1st Set of Interrogatories and 1st Set of RFPs filed by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of F. Koncilja in Support of Reply to Motion to Compel AHAC, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-D to Declaration of F. Koncilja)(Koncilja, Frances)
June 10, 2011 Filing 383 REPLY to Response to #312 MOTION to Compel Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and Claims Management, Inc. to 3rd Set of Interrogatories & 4th Set of Requests for Production filed by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of F. Koncilja in Support of Reply to Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Mtn to Compel WM & CMI, #2 Exhibits A-D to Declaration of F. Koncilja)(Koncilja, Frances)
June 10, 2011 Filing 382 REPLY to Response to #313 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Absent Class Member Discovery filed by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Giblin, Gwendolyn)
June 10, 2011 Filing 381 REPLY to Response to #309 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Respond to Wal-Mart's Second Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents filed by Defendant Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Beer, Naomi)
June 10, 2011 Filing 380 REPLY to Response to #308 MOTION for Order to Conduct Ex Parte Meetings with Plaintiffs' Medical Providers filed by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Drake, C.)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER Directing Notice to Class. That the Notice of Class Action, Exhibit A, is APPROVED for mailing to putative class members in this action; That the Request for Exclusion from Class Action, Exhibit B, is APPROVED for mailing, along with the Notice of Class Action, to putative class members in this action; That the Publication Notice of Class Action, Exhibit C, is APPROVED for publication as directed in this order; That the Posted Notice of Class Action, Exhibit D, is APPROVED for posting at Wal-Mart work sites in Colorado, as directed in this order. The plaintiffs shall bear the cost of the production, duplication, mailing, and publication of the Notice of Class Action, Request for Exclusion from Class Action, Publication Notice of Class Action, and Posted Notice of Class Action, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/9/11. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(lsw, )
June 9, 2011 Filing 378 REPLY to Response to #305 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Concentra Health Services, Inc. filed by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Markert, Pamela)
June 9, 2011 Filing 377 REPLY to Response to #362 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing for Relief from May 9, 2011 Order Regarding Deposition of Dr. Fortunato and Request for Sanctions filed by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Markert, Pamela)
June 8, 2011 Filing 376 RESPONSE to #362 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing for Relief from May 9, 2011 Order Regarding Deposition of Dr. Fortunato and Request for Sanctions filed by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Cook-Olson, Amy)
June 6, 2011 Filing 375 Exhibit X in Support of #362 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing for Relief from May 9, 2011 Order Regarding Deposition of Dr. Fortunato and Request for Sanctions by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen.Public entry for #368 SEALED DOCUMENT filed on 6/6/2011. TEXT ONLY ENTRY- NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (sahsl, )
June 6, 2011 Filing 373 Minute Entry for Hearing re Setting Trial Dates held on 6/6/2011 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. The Court will issue a separate order confirming dates agreed on. (Court Reporter: Suzanne Claar) (rebcd)
June 6, 2011 Filing 372 AMENDED MEMORANDUM by Deputy Clerk re #308 MOTION for Order to Conduct Ex Parte Meetings with Plaintiffs' Medical Providers. (sah, )
June 6, 2011 Filing 371 MEMORANDUM by Deputy Clerk re #308 MOTION for Order to Conduct Ex Parte Meetings with Plaintiffs' Medical Providers. (sah, )
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 370 MINUTE ORDER re: #351 MOTION to Enforce Confidentiality Designations for Documents Produced Under the Court's Protective Order filed by Concentra Health Services, Inc. The hearing on this matter was set in error, and the setting for 06/10/2011 has been VACATED, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/6/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (bnbsec, )
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 369 MEMORANDUM regarding #367 MOTION to Seal Exhibit X Pursuant to Amended Protective Order in Support of Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion [Dkt No 362] filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/6/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
June 6, 2011 Filing 368 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Markert, Pamela)
June 6, 2011 Filing 367 MOTION to Seal Exhibit X Pursuant to Amended Protective Order in Support of Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion [Dkt No 362] by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Markert, Pamela)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 366 MEMORANDUM regarding #365 Proposed MOTION to Seal Exhibit A Pursuant to D.C.Colo.LCivR. 7.2 in support of Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant Concentra Health Services Motion for Protective Order Dkt 359 filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/6/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
June 6, 2011 Filing 365 MOTION to Seal Exhibit A Pursuant to D.C.Colo.LCivR. 7.2 in support of Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant Concentra Health Services Motion for Protective Order #359 by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Markert, Pamela) Modified on 6/7/2011 to create linkage (sah, ).
June 6, 2011 Filing 364 DECLARATION of Pamela A. Markert regarding Emergency MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing for Relief from May 9, 2011 Order Regarding Deposition of Dr. Fortunato and Request for Sanctions #362 by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit Y)(Markert, Pamela)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 363 MEMORANDUM regarding #362 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing for Relief from May 9, 2011 Order Regarding Deposition of Dr. Fortunato and Request for Sanctions filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/6/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
June 6, 2011 Filing 362 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing for Relief from May 9, 2011 Order Regarding Deposition of Dr. Fortunato and Request for Sanctions by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Markert, Pamela)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 361 MINUTE ORDER granting #352 Motion to Expedite. A Motion Hearing is set for 6/10/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. The hearing is concerning Defendand Concentra Health Services, Inc's Motion to Enforce Confidentiality Designations for Documents Produced Under the Court's Protective Order #351 . A response is due on or before 06/08/2011, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/6/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (bnbsec, )
June 3, 2011 Filing 374 Exhibit A in Support of #359 Brief in Opposition to Motion, by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. Public entry to #365 SEALED document filed on 6/3/2011. TEXT ONLY ENTRY- NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (sahsl, )
June 3, 2011 Filing 360 UNSEALED-SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Markert, Pamela) Modified on 7/11/2011 pursuant to the Order dated 7/8/2011 (sahsl, ).
June 3, 2011 Filing 359 BRIEF in Opposition to #351 MOTION to Enforce Confidentiality Designations for Documents Produced Under the Court's Protective Order filed by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D)(Markert, Pamela)
June 2, 2011 Filing 357 MEMORANDUM regarding #355 MOTION to Seal EXHIBIT E IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONDUCT EX PARTE MEETINGS WITH PLAINTIFFS MEDICAL PROVIDERS (DKT #308) filed by Concentra Health Services, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/2/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
June 1, 2011 Filing 358 Exhibit E in Support of #308 MOTION for Order to Conduct Ex Parte Meetings with Plaintiffs' Medical Providers by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.. Public entry for #356 SEALED DOCUMENT filed on 6/1/2011. TEXT ONLY ENTRY- NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (sah, )
June 1, 2011 Filing 356 UNSEALED-SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Drake, C.) Modified on 7/11/2011 pursuant to the Order dated 7/8/2011(sahsl, ).
June 1, 2011 Filing 355 MOTION to Seal EXHIBIT E IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONDUCT EX PARTE MEETINGS WITH PLAINTIFFS MEDICAL PROVIDERS (DKT #308) by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E)(Drake, C.)
June 1, 2011 Filing 354 Docket Annotation re: #308 MOTION for Order to Conduct Ex Parte Meetings with Plaintiffs' Medical Providers. Entry modified to SEAL Exhibit E as it contained unredacted information. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (sah2, )
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 353 MEMORANDUM regarding #352 MOTION to Expedite Concentra Motion to Enforce Confidentiality filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero, #351 MOTION to Enforce Confidentiality Designations for Documents Produced Under the Court's Protective Order filed by Concentra Health Services, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/1/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
May 31, 2011 Filing 352 MOTION to Expedite Concentra Motion to Enforce Confidentiality by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Giblin, Gwendolyn)
May 31, 2011 Filing 351 MOTION to Enforce Confidentiality Designations for Documents Produced Under the Court's Protective Order by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cook-Olson, Amy)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 350 MINUTE ORDER granting #332 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for One of Their Attorneys to Participate in 6/6/11 Hearing by Telephone, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/31/11.(gmssl, )
May 31, 2011 Filing 348 Docket Annotation re: #334 Response to Motion. This docket entry was modified to correct the linkage and alter the text to reflect the actual title of this document. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (gmssl, )
May 31, 2011 Filing 347 MEMORANDUM regarding #341 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit on Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Answers to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents filed by American Home Assurance Co., #343 MOTION to Seal Exhibit B to the Declaration of David Stills [Doc. #342] filed by American Home Assurance Co. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/31/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
May 27, 2011 Filing 349 Exhibit B to the Declaration of David Stills attached to #342 Response to Motion to Compel Answers to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents by Defendant American Home Assurance Co. (Public Entry for Sealed Document #344 filed 5/27/11). TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (gmssl, )
May 27, 2011 Filing 346 BRIEF in Opposition to #308 MOTION for Order to Conduct Ex Parte Meetings with Plaintiffs' Medical Providers filed by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Giblin, Gwendolyn)
May 27, 2011 Filing 345 BRIEF in Opposition to #309 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Respond to Wal-Mart's Second Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents filed by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Giblin, Gwendolyn)
May 27, 2011 Filing 344 UNSEALED-SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant American Home Assurance Co.. (Beer, Naomi) Modified on 7/12/2011 to UNSEAL pursuant to the Order dated 7/12/2011 (sahsl, ).
May 27, 2011 Filing 343 MOTION to Seal Exhibit B to the Declaration of David Stills [Doc. #342] by Defendant American Home Assurance Co.. (Beer, Naomi)
May 27, 2011 Filing 342 RESPONSE to #311 MOTION to Compel American Home Assurance Company [Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Answers to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents] filed by Defendant American Home Assurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of David Stills, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Joseph Davide)(Beer, Naomi)
May 27, 2011 Filing 341 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit on Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Answers to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents by Defendant American Home Assurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Beer, Naomi)
May 27, 2011 Filing 340 DECLARATION of Naomi Beer regarding Response to Motion, #338 and #342 by Defendants American Home Assurance Co., Claims Management, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V)(Beer, Naomi) Modified on 5/31/2011 to create a linkage (gmssl, ).
May 27, 2011 Filing 339 DECLARATION of Amber Jene Sayle regarding Response to Motion #334 by Defendants Claims Management, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E to Declaration)(Sayle, Amber)
May 27, 2011 Filing 338 RESPONSE to #312 MOTION to Compel Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and Claims Management, Inc. [Answers to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Interrogatories and to Plaintiffs' Fourth Set of Requests for Production of Documents] filed by Defendants Claims Management, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Michele Mackey)(Beer, Naomi)
May 27, 2011 Filing 337 Exhibits in Support of #335 Response to Motion Exhibit B by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Cook-Olson, Amy)
May 27, 2011 Filing 336 RESPONSE to #313 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Absent Class Member Discovery filed by Defendants American Home Assurance Co., Claims Management, Inc., Concentra Health Services, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Beer, Naomi)
May 27, 2011 Filing 335 RESPONSE to #305 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Concentra Health Services, Inc. filed by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Cook-Olson, Amy)
May 27, 2011 Filing 334 RESPONSE to 323 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents Identified on Privilege and Redaction Logs, by Defendants Claims Management, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc. (Beer, Naomi) Modified on 5/31/2011 to correct the linkage and alter the text to reflect the actual title of this document (gmssl, ).
May 27, 2011 Filing 333 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 04/28/2011 before Magistrate Judge Boland. Pages: 1-36. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/29/2011. (Avery Woods Reporting, )
May 26, 2011 Filing 332 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing/Conference re #267 Minute Order for One of Plaintiffs' Attorneys to Participate in June 6, 2011 Hearing by Telephone by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Cera, Solomon)
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 331 MINUTE ORDER. Joint Motion to Modify the Courts Order of May 9, 2011 Regarding Depositions #329 is GRANTED. The Rule 30(b)(6) deposition of Wal-Mart Stores shall occur on 6/28/2011, at 9:00 a.m., in Denver, Colorado. The deposition of Dr. Bethany Wallace shall occur on 6/30/2011, at 9:00 a.m., in Colorado Springs, Colorado. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/24/2011.(sah, )
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 330 MEMORANDUM regarding #329 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify The Court's Order of May 9, 2011 Regarding Depositions filed by Wal Mart Stores, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/20/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
May 19, 2011 Filing 329 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify The Court's Order of May 9, 2011 Regarding Depositions by Defendant Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Beer, Naomi)
May 12, 2011 Filing 328 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 04/22/2011 before Magistrate Judge Boland. Pages: 1-88. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/15/2011. (Avery Woods Reporting, )
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 327 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion to Supplement May 6, 2011 Motion to Compel Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and Claims Management, Inc. to Comply with Plaintiffs Discovery Requests, Specifically Request for Production 17 #321 . By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/12/2011.(sah, )
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 326 MEMORANDUM regarding #325 MOTION for Order to Replace Exhibit 14 with Redacted Exhibit 14 in Response to May 5, 2011 Court Order filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/12/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
May 11, 2011 Filing 325 MOTION for Order to Replace Exhibit 14 with Redacted Exhibit 14 in Response to May 5, 2011 Court Order by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 14 - Redacted)(Markert, Pamela)
May 10, 2011 Filing 324 MEMORANDUM regarding 323 MOTION to Compel filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/10/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
May 10, 2011 Filing 322 MEMORANDUM regarding #321 MOTION to Supplement #312 MOTION to Compel Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and Claims Management, Inc. filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/10/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
May 10, 2011 Filing 321 MOTION to Supplement #312 MOTION to Compel Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and Claims Management, Inc. by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Koncilja, Frances)
May 9, 2011 Filing 323 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Identified on Privlefe and Redaction Logs by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and Claims Management Inc.; Declaration of Pamela A. markert in Support Thereof; and Exhibits A through L Attached to the Markert Declaration by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. Public entry to #316 SEALED DOCUMENT filed on 5/9/2011. TEXT ONLY ENTRY- NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (sah, ) (sah2, ).
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 320 MINUTE ORDER re: #309 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Respond to Wal-Mart's Second Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents filed by Wal Mart Stores, Inc., #308 MOTION for Order to Conduct Ex Parte Meetings with Plaintiffs' Medical Providers filed by Concentra Health Services, Inc., #313 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Absent Class Member Discovery filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero, #312 Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and ClaimsManagement, Inc. Answers to Plaintiffs Third Set of Interrogatories andResponses to Plaintiffs Fourth Set of Requests for Production of Documents filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero, #305 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Concentra Health Services, Inc. filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero, #311 Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Defendant American Home AssuranceCompanys Answers to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories and Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Production of Documents filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero, #314 Proposed MOTION to Seal Motion to Compel and Related Documents filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero. The parties shall respond to their respective Motions on or beforeMay 27, 2011. Any replies are due on or before June 10, 2011, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/9/11. (bnbcd, )
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER: re: #310 Amended Joint Stipulation Regarding Deposition Schedule filed by the parties. Depositions shall be taken at the date, time, and place noted. No other depositions are allowed. This order may be modified only by further order of the court. Agreements of counsel altering this order will not bind or be enforced by the court, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/9/11. (bnbcd, )
May 9, 2011 Filing 318 MEMORANDUM regarding #314 Proposed MOTION to Seal Motion to Compel and Related Documents filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/9/2011. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(sah, )
May 9, 2011 Filing 317 Docket Annotation re: #314 Proposed MOTION to Seal Motion to Compel and Related Documents. Entry modified on 5/9/2011 to note that the main document is in public view and the attached exhibits are SEALED due to filing error. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (sahsl, )
May 9, 2011 Filing 316 UNSEALED-SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Compel, #2 Markert Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L)(Giblin, Gwendolyn) Modified on 7/11/2011 to UNSEAL pursuant to the Order dated 7/8/2011 (sahsl, ).
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 315 MEMORANDUM regarding #309 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Respond to Wal-Mart's Second Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents filed by Wal Mart Stores, Inc., #308 MOTION for Order to Conduct Ex Parte Meetings with Plaintiffs' Medical Providers filed by Concentra Health Services, Inc., #313 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Absent Class Member Discovery filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero, #312 MOTION to Compel Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and Claims Management, Inc. filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero, #311 MOTION to Compel American Home Assurance Company filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero, #314 Proposed MOTION to Seal Motion to Compel and Related Documents filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/9/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
May 6, 2011 Filing 314 Proposed MOTION to Seal Motion to Compel and Related Documents by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit-SEALED, #2 Exhibit-SEALED, #3 Exhibit-SEALED, #4 Exhibit-SEALED, #5 Exhibit-SEALED, #6 Exhibit-SEALED, #7 Exhibit-SEALED, #8 Exhibit-SEALED, #9 Exhibit-SEALED, #10 Exhibit-SEALED, #11 Exhibit-SEALED, #12 Exhibit-SEALED, #13 Exhibit-SEALED, #14 Exhibit-SEALED)(Giblin, Gwendolyn) Modified on 5/9/2011 to note that the main document is in public view and the attached exhibits are SEALED due to filing error. (sahsl, ).
May 6, 2011 Filing 313 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Absent Class Member Discovery by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Giblin, Gwendolyn)
May 6, 2011 Filing 312 MOTION to Compel Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and Claims Management, Inc. by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Koncilja, Frances)
May 6, 2011 Filing 311 MOTION to Compel American Home Assurance Company by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Koncilja, Frances)
May 6, 2011 Filing 310 STIPULATION re #301 Stipulation, Amended Regarding Deposition Schedule by Defendant Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Beer, Naomi)
May 6, 2011 Filing 309 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Respond to Wal-Mart's Second Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents by Defendant Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Beer, Naomi)
May 6, 2011 Filing 308 MOTION for Order to Conduct Ex Parte Meetings with Plaintiffs' Medical Providers by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E-SEALED )(Drake, C.) Modified on 6/1/2011 to SEAL Exhibit E (sah2, ).
May 6, 2011 Filing 307 MEMORANDUM regarding #305 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Concentra Health Services, Inc. filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/6/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
May 6, 2011 Filing 306 DECLARATION of Pamela A. Markert regarding MOTION to Compel Discovery from Concentra Health Services, Inc. #305 by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Markert, Pamela)
May 6, 2011 Filing 305 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Concentra Health Services, Inc. by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Markert, Pamela)
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 304 MINUTE ORDER. The defendants shall file a motion to seal Exhibits 1-15 to Plaintiffs Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.s Motion for Protective Order, if at all, on or before May 11, 2011. See D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2B. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/5/2011. (sah, )
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 303 MINUTE ORDER. Unopposed Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 6 to Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.s Motion for Protective Order #271 is GRANTED. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/5/2011.(sah, )
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER. Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.s Motion for Protective Order #272 is DENIED. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/5/2011.(sah, )
April 29, 2011 Filing 301 STIPULATION re #284 Order on Motion for Hearing/Conference, Regarding Deposition Schedule by Defendants American Home Assurance Co., Claims Management, Inc., Concentra Health Services, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Ridley, Terence)
April 29, 2011 Filing 300 MEMORANDUM by Deputy Clerk re #288 Exhibits. (sah, )
April 29, 2011 Filing 298 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena to Produce Documents to Steven U. Mullens, Esq. by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena, #2 Exhibit A)(Cook-Olson, Amy)
April 29, 2011 Filing 297 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena to Produce Documents to William G. Herrera, M.D. of Colorado Springs Neurological Associates, P.C. by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena to Produce, #2 Exhibit A)(Cook-Olson, Amy)
April 28, 2011 Filing 299 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland: Motion Hearing held on 4/28/2011. taking under advisement #272 Motion for Protective Order (FTR: G.Mattei) (bnbcd, )
April 28, 2011 Filing 296 Exhibits 1 through 15 in Support of #290 Brief in Opposition to Motion by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. Public entry to #294 SEALED DOCUMENT filed on 4/27/2011. TEXT ONLY ENTRY-NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (sahsl, )
April 27, 2011 Filing 295 MEMORANDUM regarding #293 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1 Through 15 Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR. 7.2 filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/27/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
April 27, 2011 Filing 294 UNSEALED-SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Unsealed- Exhibit 2, #2 Unsealed- Exhibit 3, #3 Unsealed- Exhibit 4, #4 Unsealed- Exhibit 5, #5 Unsealed- Exhibit 6, #6 Unsealed- Exhibit 7, #7 Unsealed- Exhibit8, #8 Unsealed- Exhibit 9, #9 Unsealed- Exhibit 10, #10 Unsealed- Exhibit11, #11 Unsealed- Exhibit 12, #12 Unsealed- Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 14, #14 Unsealed- Exhibit 15)(Koncilja, Frances) Modified on 7/11/2011 to UNSEAL exhibits 1 through 13 and 15 pursuant to the Order dated 7/8/2011 (sahsl, ).
April 27, 2011 Filing 293 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1 Through 15 Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR. 7.2 by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Koncilja, Frances)
April 27, 2011 Filing 292 Docket Annotation re: #289 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1 through 15 Pursuant to D.C.COLO.L.CivR. 7.2. Entry modified on 4/27/2011 to indiciate the exhibits as SEALED due to filing error. Counsel will refile the exhibits. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (sahsl, )
April 27, 2011 Filing 291 MEMORANDUM regarding #289 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1 through 15 Pursuant to D.C.COLO.L.CivR. 7.2 filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/27/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
April 26, 2011 Filing 290 BRIEF in Opposition to #272 MOTION for Protective Order Re: Ex Parte Contact with Former Employees filed by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 17)(Koncilja, Frances)
April 26, 2011 Filing 289 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1 through 15 Pursuant to D.C.COLO.L.CivR. 7.2 by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 (SEALED) Exhibit 1, #2(SEALED) Exhibit 2, #3 (SEALED) Exhibit 3, #4 (SEALED) Exhibit 4, #5 (SEALED) Exhibit 5, #6 (SEALED) Exhibit 6, #7 (SEALED) Exhibit 7, #8 (SEALED) Exhibit 8, #9 (SEALED) Exhibit 9, #10 (SEALED) Exhibit 10, #11 (SEALED) Exhibit 11, #12 (SEALED) Exhibit 12, #13 (SEALED) Exhibit 13, #14 (SEALED) Exhibit 14, #15 (SEALED) Exhibit 15)(Koncilja, Frances) Modified on 4/27/2011 to indiciate the exhibits as SEALED due to filing error (sahsl, ).
April 26, 2011 Filing 288 (SEALED)Video Deposition Transcripts of Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero and Jennifer Jensen in Support of #285 Motion Hearing by Defendants American Home Assurance Co., Claims Management, Inc., Concentra Health Services, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc. 4 DVDs and two bound transcripts. Conventionally submitted pursuant to request by chambers. TEXT ONLY ENTRY- NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (sah2, ) Modified on 4/29/2011 to SEAL pursuant to the Memorandum dated 4/29/2011.(sah, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/30/2018: #1 Continuation of Main Document) (athom, ). Modified on 1/30/2018 to add the two bound transcripts to the original entry and to note that the documents are no longer available in paper format in the Clerk's Office. The DVDs remain in the SEALED Room (athom, ).
April 25, 2011 Filing 287 NOTICE of Submission of Video Deposition Transcripts of Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero and Jennifer Jensen by Defendants American Home Assurance Co., Claims Management, Inc., Concentra Health Services, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Beer, Naomi)
April 22, 2011 Filing 286 Minute Entry for Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/22/2011; Defendants Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc., American Home Assurance Company and Concentra Health Services, Inc.s Motion Regarding Expert Discovery and Request for Expedited Hearing [Doc. #269; filed 4/13/11] is GRANTED for the reasons stated on the record. (Court Reporter: FTR - Monique Wiles) (klmcd )
April 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 285 MINUTE ORDER. Defendants Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc., and American Home Assurance Companys Motion for Leave to Submit the Attached Declaration of Naomi Beer in Response to Plaintiffs Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motion Regarding Expert Discovery #282 is DENIED. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/22/2011.(sah, )
April 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER. Defendants Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc., American Home Assurance Company and Cincentra Health Services, Inc.s Motion Regarding Expert Discovery and Request for Expedited Hearing #269 is GRANTED. See Order for details. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/22/2011.(sah, )
April 22, 2011 Filing 283 MEMORANDUM regarding #282 MOTION for Leave to Submit the Attached Declaration of Naomi Beer in Response to Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion Regarding Expert Discovery filed by American Home Assurance Co., Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/22/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
April 21, 2011 Filing 282 MOTION for Leave to Submit the Attached Declaration of Naomi Beer in Response to Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion Regarding Expert Discovery by Defendants American Home Assurance Co., Claims Management, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Naomi Beer in Response to Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion Regarding Expert Discovery, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Beer, Naomi)
April 20, 2011 Filing 281 BRIEF in Opposition to #269 Emergency MOTION for Hearing/Conference and Motion Regarding Expert Discovery filed by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Frances A. Koncilja, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Frances A. Koncilja, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Frances A. Koncilja, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Pamela A. Markert, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A of Declaration of Pamela A. Markert, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B of Declaration of Pamela A. Markert, #7 Exhibit Exhibit C of Declaration of Pamela A. Markert, #8 Exhibit Exhibit D of Declaration of Pamela A. Markert, #9 Exhibit Exhibit E of Declaration of Pamela A. Markert, #10 Exhibit Exhibit F of Declaration of Pamela A. Markert, #11 Exhibit Exhibit G of Declaration of Pamela A. Markert, #12 Exhibit Exhibit H of Declaration of Pamela A. Markert, #13 Exhibit Exhibit I of Declaration of Pamela A. Markert, #14 Exhibit Exhibit J of Declaration of Pamela A. Markert, #15 Exhibit Exhibit K of Declaration of Pamela A. Markert, #16 Exhibit Exhibit L of Declaration of Pamela A. Markert)(Koncilja, Frances)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion to Seal Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2 #257 is DENIED. Plaintiffs Memorandum In Opposition to Defendants Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and Claims Management Inc.s Motion for Protective Order and/or to Quash #258 shall remain sealed until 4/29/2011. Plaintiffs Memorandum In Opposition to Defendants Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and Claims Management Inc.s Motion for Protective Order and/or to Quash #258 shall be unsealed and deemed a part of the public record on 5/2/2011. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/18/2011.(sah, )
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 279 AMENDED ORDER : re: #254 MOTION for Protective Order and/or to Quash filed by Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc. The amended order is to correct the date Deloitte & Touche LLP shall comply with the subpoena and produce all responsive documents, no later than April 26, 2011, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/15/11. (bnbcd, )
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER: denying #254 Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and Claims Management Inc.s Motion for Protective Order and/or to Quash. Deloitte & Touche LLP shall comply with the subpoena and produce all responsive documents at a date and time as may be agreed, but not later than 26, 2011, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/15/11.(bnbcd, )
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 277 MINUTE ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #272 MOTION for Protective Order Re: Ex Parte Contact with Former Employees : Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Parties shall respond to the Motion on or before April 26, 2011. No reply will be accepted without leave of court, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/14/11. (bnbcd, )
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 276 MINUTE ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #269 Defendants Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Claims Management Inc.s, American Home Assurance Company and Concentra Health Servicees, Inc.s Motion Regarding Expert discovery and Request for Expedited Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Plaintiffs shall respond to the Motion on or before April 20, 2011.No reply will be accepted without leave of court, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/14/11. (bnbcd, )
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 274 MEMORANDUM regarding #272 MOTION for Protective Order Re: Ex Parte Contact with Former Employees filed by Concentra Health Services, Inc., #271 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Exhibit 6 to Concentra's Motion for Protective Order filed by Concentra Health Services, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/14/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
April 13, 2011 Filing 275 Exhibit 6 in Support of #272 MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc. (Public entry for Sealed Document #273 filed 04/13/2011.) TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED.(wjc, )
April 13, 2011 Filing 273 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Alper, Michael)
April 13, 2011 Filing 272 MOTION for Protective Order Re: Ex Parte Contact with Former Employees by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6 - Filed Under Seal)(Alper, Michael)
April 13, 2011 Filing 271 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Exhibit 6 to Concentra's Motion for Protective Order by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Granting Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 6 (Declaration) to Defendant's Motion for Protective Order Under Seal)(Alper, Michael)
April 13, 2011 Filing 270 MEMORANDUM regarding #269 Emergency MOTION for Hearing/Conference and Motion Regarding Expert Discovery filed by American Home Assurance Co., Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/13/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
April 13, 2011 Filing 269 Emergency MOTION for Hearing/Conference and Motion Regarding Expert Discovery by Defendants American Home Assurance Co., Claims Management, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Beer, Naomi)
April 6, 2011 Filing 268 RESPONSE to #228 MOTION for Hearing/Conference re #201 Scheduling Order, Regarding Submission of Trial Plan and Trial Date, and Request for Hearing filed by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Cera, Solomon) Modified on 4/7/2011 to remove repetitive text (sah, ).
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 267 MINUTE ORDER. On 6/6/2011, commencing at 1:30 p.m. (M.D.T.) the court shall conduct a hearing to discuss setting a trial date in this matter. The court reserving one (1) hour for this hearing. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/4/2011. (sah, )
March 31, 2011 Filing 266 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 03/18/2011 before Magistrate Judge Boland. Pages: 1-36. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/5/2011. (Avery Woods Reporting, )
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 265 MINUTE ORDER denying #236 Plaintiffs' Opposed Motion to Strike Defendants' Response Brief Regarding a Trial Date. The Plaintiffs may file a response to #228 Defendants' Motion Regarding Submission of Trial Plan and Trial Date, and Request for Hearing on or before 4/6/11, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/24/11.(lsw, )
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER. Defendant Claims Management, Inc.s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Statutes of Limitations #203 filed 8/10/2011, is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/24/2011.(sah, )
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 263 MINUTE ORDER. On 4/4/2011, commencing at 10:30 a.m., the court shall conduct a telephonic setting conference to set a hearing before Judge Blackburn regarding setting a trial date in this matter. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/24/2011. (sah, )
March 18, 2011 Filing 262 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland: Motion Hearing held on 3/18/2011. Taking under advisement #254 Defendants Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and Claims Management Incs motion for protective order and/or quash. (FTR: G.Mattei) (bnbcd, )
March 15, 2011 Filing 261 RESPONSE to #257 MOTION to Seal pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR. 7.2 filed by Defendant Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Beer, Naomi)
March 14, 2011 Filing 259 MEMORANDUM regarding #257 MOTION to Seal pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR. 7.2 filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/14/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
March 11, 2011 Filing 260 Memorandum in Opposition to #254 MOTION for Protective Order and/or to Quash filed by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. Public entry for #258 SEALED DOCUMENT filed on 3/11/2011. TEXT ONLY ENTRY-NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (sah, )
March 11, 2011 Filing 258 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Walling Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Depo Excerpts, #3 Exhibit C - Jan. 24, 2011 Letter, #4 Exhibit D - Feb. 9, 2011 Letter, #5 Exhibit E - Feb. 10, 2011 Letter, #6 Exhibit F - Feb. 17, 2011 Letter, #7 Exhibit G - ABC of Rating, #8 Exhibit H - Reserves, #9 Exhibit I - Overview, #10 Exhibit J - Colo Results, #11 Exhibit K - Sept 20, 2010 E-mail)(Koncilja, Frances)
March 11, 2011 Filing 257 MOTION to Seal pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR. 7.2 by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email Exchange, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Koncilja, Frances)
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 256 MINUTE ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #254 MOTION for Protective Order and/or to Quash: Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Plaintiffs shall respond to the Motion on or before March 11, 2011. No reply will be accepted without leave of court, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/24/11. (bnbcd, )
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 255 MEMORANDUM regarding #254 MOTION for Protective Order and/or to Quash filed by Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/24/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
February 23, 2011 Filing 254 MOTION for Protective Order and/or to Quash by Defendants Claims Management, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Beer, Naomi)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 253 MINUTE ORDER. The Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.s Unopposed Motion to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits in Support of Defendants Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Depositions of Concentra Health Services, Inc. #240 is GRANTED. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/18/2011.(sah, )
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER. The Joint Motion #249 is GRANTED. I have entered theAmended Protective Order separately. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/18/2011. (sah, )
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 251 AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/18/2011. (sah, )
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 250 MEMORANDUM regarding #249 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #63 Protective Order filed by American Home Assurance Co., Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/18/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebcd)
February 17, 2011 Filing 249 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #63 Protective Order by Defendants American Home Assurance Co., Claims Management, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Beer, Naomi)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER. The Motion to Compel #233 is DENIED. The parties are directed to have a meaningful Rule 7.1A conference to attempt to resolve their disagreements about the esi and database discovery. The Rule 7.1A conference must be accomplished by face-to-face meetings, and the exchange of correspondence, e-mails, and telephone conferences will not suffice. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/22/2010. (sah, )
October 22, 2010 Filing 247 Minute Entry for Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/22/2010; #233 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Depositions of Concentra Health Services Inc. is DENIED for the reasons stated on the record. The Court suggests that the parties meet and confer today and in person, in order to resolve the issue presented in court today. (Court Reporter FTR - Monique Wiles) (klmcd )
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 246 MINUTE ORDER. Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.s Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limit on its Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Depositions of Concentra Health Services, Inc. #239 is GRANTED. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/22/2010.(sah, )
October 21, 2010 Filing 244 MEMORANDUM regarding #239 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Depositions of Concentra Health Services, Inc. filed by Concentra Health Services, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/21/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
October 21, 2010 Filing 243 MEMORANDUM regarding #240 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Certain Exhibits in Support of Defendant's Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Depositions of Concentra Health Services, Inc. filed by Concentra Health Services, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/21/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
October 20, 2010 Filing 245 Exhibits 3 and 4in Support of #241 Brief in Opposition to Motion, by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.. Public entry to #242 SEALED DOCUMENT filed 10/20/2010. TEXT ONLY ENTRY- NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (sah2, )
October 20, 2010 Filing 242 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Ridley, Terence)
October 20, 2010 Filing 241 BRIEF in Opposition to #233 MOTION to Compel Depositions of Concentra Health Services, Inc. filed by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Placeholder for Exhibits 3 and 4 Which Have Been Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit A to Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Ridley, Terence)
October 20, 2010 Filing 240 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Certain Exhibits in Support of Defendant's Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Depositions of Concentra Health Services, Inc. by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Ridley, Terence)
October 20, 2010 Filing 239 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Depositions of Concentra Health Services, Inc. by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Ridley, Terence)
October 20, 2010 Filing 238 RESPONSE to #236 MOTION to Strike #232 Response to Motion Defendants' Response Brief Regarding a Trial Date filed by Defendants American Home Assurance Co., Claims Management, Inc., Concentra Health Services, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Beer, Naomi)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 237 MINUTE ORDER. A hearing on the Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Depositions of Concentra Health Services, Inc. #233 filed 10/07/2010, is set for 10/22/2010, at 9:00 a.m., in Courtroom A-401. Defendants shall respond to the Motion on or before 10/20/2010. No reply will be accepted without leave of court. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/12/2010. (sah, )
October 11, 2010 Filing 236 MOTION to Strike #232 Response to Motion Defendants' Response Brief Regarding a Trial Date by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpts of a Court Hearing Transcript)(Markert, Pamela)
October 7, 2010 Filing 235 DECLARATION of Pamela A. Markert regarding MOTION to Compel Depositions of Concentra Health Services, Inc. #233 by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Markert, Pamela)
October 7, 2010 Filing 234 MEMORANDUM regarding #233 MOTION to Compel Depositions of Concentra Health Services, Inc. filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/7/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
October 7, 2010 Filing 233 MOTION to Compel Depositions of Concentra Health Services, Inc. by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Markert, Pamela)
October 4, 2010 Filing 232 RESPONSE to #227 MOTION for Trial Date filed by Defendants American Home Assurance Co., Claims Management, Inc., Concentra Health Services, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Beer, Naomi)
September 20, 2010 Filing 231 BRIEF in Support of #203 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Statutes of Limitations and Further Request for Hearing filed by Defendant Claims Management, Inc.. (Beer, Naomi)
September 17, 2010 Filing 230 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 09/03/2010 before Magistrate Judge Boland. Pages: 1-28. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/20/2010. (Avery Woods Reporting, )
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 229 MINUTE ORDER. The following motions are before the court for preliminary consideration: (1) Plaintiffs Motion For a Trial Date #227 ; and 2) Defendants Motion Regarding Submission of Trial Plan and Trial Date, and Request for Hearing #228 both filed 09/10/2010. The Trial Preparation Conference set for 09/17/2010, and the jury trial set to commence 10/04/2010, are VACATED and are CONTINUED, pending further order of court. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 09/15/2010.(sah, )
September 10, 2010 Filing 228 MOTION for Hearing/Conference re #201 Scheduling Order, Regarding Submission of Trial Plan and Trial Date, and Request for Hearing by Defendants American Home Assurance Co., Claims Management, Inc., Concentra Health Services, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Beer, Naomi)
September 10, 2010 Filing 227 MOTION for Trial Date by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Giblin, Gwendolyn)
September 3, 2010 Filing 226 BRIEF in Opposition to #203 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Statutes of Limitations filed by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Giblin, Gwendolyn)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER: granting #211 Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.s Motion to Compel Plaintiffs Medical Records. On or before September 20, 2010, the plaintiffs shall provide supplemental discovery responses consistent with this order and produce to the defendants all medical records in their possession, custody, and control relating to or arising from the plaintiffs workplace injuries and all materials contained in their workers compensation case files, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/3/10.(bnbcd, )
September 3, 2010 Filing 224 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland: Motion Hearing held on 9/3/2010. Defendant Concentra Health Services, Incs motion to compel plaintiffs medical records [Doc. #211; filed 8/19/10] is granted. Plaintiffs shall provide supplemental discovery responses on or before September 20, 2010. (Court Reporter FTR-G.Mattei) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit defendant, #2 Exhibit plaintiffs) (bnbcd, )
September 1, 2010 Filing 223 ERRATA re #219 Response to Motion to Compel Plaintiffs' Medical Records by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Koncilja, Frances)
August 31, 2010 Filing 222 Docket Annotation re: #221 Brief in Support of Motion. Modified on 8/31/2010 to clarify text and to create linkage. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (sah, )
August 31, 2010 Filing 221 Reply in Memorandum of Law in Support of #196 Proposed For of Class Notice and Plan for Providing filed by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (sah, ) Modified on 8/31/2010 to clarify text and to create linkage(sah, ).
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 220 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion To File Consolidated Reply Brief Exceeding The Page Limit in Support of Proposed Class Action Notice and Notice Plan #218 is GRANTED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 08/31/2010.(sah, )
August 31, 2010 Filing 219 RESPONSE to #211 Renewed MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Medical Records filed by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Koncilja, Frances)
August 30, 2010 Filing 218 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to File Consolidated Reply Brief Exceeding the Page Limit in Support of Proposed Class Notice and Notice Plan by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Giblin, Gwendolyn)
August 27, 2010 Filing 217 SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to #209 Response, to Plaintiffs' Proposed Form and Plan of Class Notice and Request for Hearing by Defendants American Home Assurance Co., Claims Management, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Beer, Naomi)
August 26, 2010 Filing 216 SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to #208 Response to Plaintiffs' Proposed Class Notice and Request for Hearing by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Pages Excerpt of August 9, 2010 Scheduling Conference Transcript)(Ridley, Terence)
August 26, 2010 Filing 215 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 08/09/2010 before Magistrate Judge Boland. Pages: 1-52. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/29/2010. (Avery Woods Reporting, )
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 214 MINUTE ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #211 Renewed MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Medical Records : Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Plaintiff shall respond to the Motion on or before August 31, 2010. No reply will be accepted without leave of court, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/20/10. (bnbcd, )
August 20, 2010 Filing 213 Docket Annotation re: #211 Renewed MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Medical Records. Entry modified on 8/20/2010 to remove the notation of "renewed" document is not a "renewed" motion to compel. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (sah2, )
August 20, 2010 Filing 212 MEMORANDUM regarding #211 Renewed MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Medical Records filed by Concentra Health Services, Inc..Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/20/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
August 19, 2010 Filing 211 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Medical Records by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Ridley, Terence) Modified on 8/20/2010 to remove the notation of "renewed" document is not a "renewed" motion to compel(sah2, ).
August 13, 2010 Filing 210 Docket Annotation re: #207 Response. Counsel has refiled response and can be found at docket entry #209 . TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (sah2, )
August 12, 2010 Filing 209 RESPONSE to #196 Statement to Plaintiffs' Proposed Form and Plan of Class Notice and Request for Hearing by Defendants American Home Assurance Co., Claims Management, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B-1, #3 Exhibit B-2, #4 Exhibit C-1, #5 Exhibit C-2)(Beer, Naomi)
August 12, 2010 Filing 208 RESPONSE to #196 Statement to Plaintiffs' Proposed Class Notice and Request for Hearing by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ridley, Terence)
August 12, 2010 Filing 207 RESPONSE to #196 Statement to Plaintiffs' Proposed Form and Plan of Class Notice and Request for Hearing by Defendants American Home Assurance Co., Claims Management, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B-1, #3 Exhibit B-2, #4 Exhibit C-1, #5 Exhibit C-2)(Beer, Naomi)
August 11, 2010 Filing 206 Docket Annotation re: 200 Scheduling Order, #201 Scheduling Order. Duplicate entries were filed in error. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (sah2, )
August 11, 2010 Filing 205 JOINDER re #203 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Statutes of Limitations by Defendants American Home Assurance Co., Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Beer, Naomi)
August 10, 2010 Filing 204 JOINDER re #203 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Statutes of Limitations by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Alper, Michael)
August 10, 2010 Filing 203 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Statutes of Limitations by Defendant Claims Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1)(Beer, Naomi)
August 9, 2010 Filing 202 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland: Scheduling Conference held on 8/9/2010. Discovery due by 7/15/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 9/1/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/3/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. The parties shall file with the district judge a Motion for Trial Date, with a justificatio as to the length of trial and a trial plan on or before September 10, 2010, length of briefs are limited to 7 pages. (Court Reporter FTR: Ginny Kramer) (gkram )
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 201 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery due by 7/15/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 9/1/2011. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/26/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/3/2011 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 08/09/2010. (sah, )
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 200 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery due by 7/15/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 9/1/2011. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/26/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/3/2011 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 08/09/2010. (sah, )
August 5, 2010 Filing 199 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 01/27/2010 before Magistrate Judge Boland. Pages: 1-32. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/8/2010. (Avery Woods Reporting, )
August 3, 2010 Filing 198 Proposed Scheduling Order of the Parties (Amended) by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Koncilja, Frances)
July 19, 2010 Filing 197 DECLARATION of Gwendolyn R. Giblin re Class Notice and Notice Plan regarding Order on Motion for Order, #194 by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Giblin, Gwendolyn)
July 19, 2010 Filing 196 STATEMENT re #194 Order on Motion for Order, Plaintiffs' Proposed Class Notice and Notice Plan by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Giblin, Gwendolyn)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 195 MINUTE ORDER : Scheduling Conference set for 8/9/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/6/10. (bnbcd, )
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER. Plaintiffs Status Report, Request To Lift the Stay, Set New Deadlines for Filing Form of Notice To Class, and To Set Scheduling Conference #187 is GRANTED. The stay of this case is LIFTED, effective immediately. The parties ARE DIRECTED to contact United States Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland to set a scheduling conference in an effort to develop an amended scheduling order in this case. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 06/30/2010.(sah, )
June 30, 2010 Filing 193 Reply in Support of #187 Motion For Leave To File Reply in Support of Plaintiffs Status Report, Request To Lift Stay, Set New Deadlines For Filing Form of Notice To Class, and To Set Scheduling Conference filed by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (sah, )
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 192 MINUTE ORDER granting #191 Plaintiffs Motion For Leave To File Reply in Support of Plaintiffs Status Report, Request To Lift Stay, Set New Deadlines For Filing Form of Notice To Class, and To Set Scheduling Conference. The court notes that pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1.C, a party who files a motion may file a reply in support of the motion within 14 days after service of aresponse to the motion. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 06/30/2010.(sah, )
June 30, 2010 Filing 191 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Status Report, Request to Lift the Stay, Set New Deadlines for Filing Form of Notice to Class, and To Set Scheduling Conference by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #2 Proposed Document Ex A Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Status Report, Request to Lift the Stay, Set New Deadlines for Filing Form of Notice to Class, and To Set Scheduling Conference, #3 Proposed Document Ex B Proposed Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Status Report, Request to Lift the Stay, Set New Deadlines for Filing Form of Notice to Class, and To Set Scheduling Conference)(Koncilja, Frances)
June 28, 2010 Filing 190 RESPONSE to #187 MOTION for Order to Plaintiffs' Status Report, Request to Lift the Stay, Set New Deadlines for Filing Form of Notice to Class, and to Set Scheduling Conference filed by Defendants American Home Assurance Co., Claims Management, Inc., Concentra Health Services, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Beer, Naomi)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 189 MINUTE ORDER re: #187 Plaintiffs Status Report, Request to Lift theStay, Set New Deadlines for Filing Form of Notice to Class, and To set Scheduling Conference. The defendants shall respond to the Motion on or before 06/28/2010. No reply will be accepted without leave of court. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 06/21/2010. (sah, )
June 21, 2010 Filing 188 Docket Annotation re: #187 MOTION for Order to. Entry modified on 6/21/2010 to change event into a motion. Pursuant to request from chambers. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (sah, )
June 18, 2010 Filing 187 STATUS REPORT , REQUEST TO LIFT THE STAY, SET NEW DEADLINES FOR FILING FORM OF NOTICE TO CLASS, AND TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Event changed into a Motion for Order) (Koncilja, Frances) Modified on 6/21/2010 to change event into a motion. (sah, ).
June 9, 2010 Filing 186 STATUS REPORT of the Parties by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Koncilja, Frances)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MINUTE ORDER re: #180 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding the Deadline for Defendants to Respond or Object to Written Discovery Pending a Ruling on the Joint Motion to Stay, or, in the Alternative, for a One Week Extension of the Deadline to Serve Written Responses an filed by American Home Assurance Co., Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc. The response now due on May 3, 2010 on the Motion for Protective Order (docket no. 180) and the hearing set for May 7, 2010, are VACATED. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/20/10. (bnbcd, )
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER. The Joint Motion To Stay Pending Resolution of Tenth Circuit Proceedings Regarding Class Certification Order #179 is GRANTED. Pending further order, the action is STAYED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 04/20/2010.(sah, )
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MINUTE ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #180 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding the Deadline for Defendants to Respond or Object to Written Discovery Pending a Ruling on the Joint Motion to Stay, or, in the Alternative, for a One Week Extension of the Deadline to Serve Written Responses and objections: Motion Hearing set for 5/7/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Plaintiffs shall respond to the Motion on or before May 3, 2010. No reply will be accepted without leave of court, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/20/10. (bnbcd, )
April 19, 2010 Filing 182 NOTICE re #180 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding the Deadline for Defendants to Respond or Object to Written Discovery Pending a Ruling on the Joint Motion to Stay, or, in the Alternative, for a One Week Extension of the Deadline to Serve Written Responses an Amended Certificate of Service by Defendants American Home Assurance Co., Claims Management, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document Amended Certificate of Service)(Beer, Naomi)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MEMORANDUM regarding #180 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding the Deadline for Defendants to Respond or Object to Written Discovery Pending a Ruling on the Joint Motion to Stay, or, in the Alternative, for a One Week Extension of the Deadline to Serve Written Responses an filed by American Home Assurance Co., Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/19/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
April 19, 2010 Filing 180 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding the Deadline for Defendants to Respond or Object to Written Discovery Pending a Ruling on the Joint Motion to Stay, or, in the Alternative, for a One Week Extension of the Deadline to Serve Written Responses and Objections by Defendants American Home Assurance Co., Claims Management, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Beer, Naomi)
April 15, 2010 Filing 179 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Tenth Circuit Proceedings Regarding Class Certification Order by Defendants American Home Assurance Co., Claims Management, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Beer, Naomi)
April 14, 2010 Filing 178 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael D. Alper on behalf of Concentra Health Services, Inc. (Alper, Michael)
April 14, 2010 Filing 177 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Terence M. Ridley on behalf of Concentra Health Services, Inc. (Ridley, Terence)
April 12, 2010 Filing 176 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Claims Management, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc..(Beer, Naomi)
April 12, 2010 Filing 175 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by American Home Assurance Co..(Beer, Naomi)
April 2, 2010 Filing 174 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena to Produce Documents to National Council on Compensation Insurance by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen (Attachments: #1 Subpoena)(Koncilja, Frances)
April 1, 2010 Filing 173 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stephen Jerome Hensen on behalf of Concentra Health Services, Inc. (Hensen, Stephen)
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion To Strike Brief in Support of Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs (sic) Class Action Complaint [dkt no. 53] #59 is DENIED. The defendants' reply #53 is accepted for filing. Defendants Motion To Strike Affidavits of Dr. David Logan Orgel #91 is DENIED. Plaintiffs Motion To File Response To Defendants Surreply Regarding Class Certification #96 filed 11/06/2009 is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 03/30/2010.(sah, )
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER denying #29 defendants Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Class Action Complaint. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 03/29/2010.(sah, )
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting #44 Plaintiffs' Motion For Class Certification. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 03/29/2010.(sah, )
March 19, 2010 Filing 169 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena to Produce Documents to Eschelon Telecom, Inc. by Defendant Wal Mart Stores, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Pages Subpoena)(Beer, Naomi)
March 11, 2010 Filing 167 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena to Produce Documents to Qwest Communications Company LLC by Defendant Wal Mart Stores, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Pages Subpoena In A Civil Case)(Beer, Naomi)
February 19, 2010 Filing 166 Second STATUS REPORT Joint by Defendant Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Beer, Naomi)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MINUTE ORDER: granting #163 Joint Status Report and Request for Extension. The parties shall have up to and including February 19, 2010 to continue the meet and confer process in an effort to resolve discovery issues that arose with respect to certain electronically-stored information. The parties will file a further status report on that date, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/16/10.(bnbcd, )
February 10, 2010 Filing 164 MEMORANDUM regarding #163 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Continue the Meet and Confer Process and Joint Status Report filed by Wal Mart Stores, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/10/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
February 10, 2010 Filing 163 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Continue the Meet and Confer Process and Joint Status Report by Defendant Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Beer, Naomi)
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER. The Motion to Compel Wal-Mart #110 is and DENIED IN PART and DENIED IN PART AS MOOT. The Motion to Compel Concentra [138-21] is GRANTED IN PART; DENIED IN PART; and DENIED IN PART AS MOOT. The Motion to Seal [ 137] is GRANTED. The Plaintiffs Motion to Exceed #138 is GRANTED. Concentras Motion to Exceed #156 is GRANTED. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/27/2010.(sah, )
January 27, 2010 Filing 168 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland: Motion Hearing held on 1/27/2010. Plaintiffs motion to compel defendant Wal-Mart to provide discovery [Doc.#110 ; filed 11/23/10] is denied in part and denied in part as moot as stated on the record. (Court Reporter FTR-G.Mattei) (bnbcd, )
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MINUTE ORDER: granting #159 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Delphine L. Farr terminated, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/27/10.(bnbcd, )
January 27, 2010 Filing 160 MEMORANDUM regarding #159 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero.Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/27/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebcd)
January 27, 2010 Filing 159 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Koncilja, Frances)
January 25, 2010 Filing 158 MEMORANDUM regarding #156 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel filed by Concentra Health Services, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/25/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebcd)
January 25, 2010 Filing 157 RESPONSE to #138 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Motion to Compel Discovery from Concentra Health Services, Inc. filed by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Drake, C.)
January 25, 2010 Filing 156 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Drake, C.)
January 22, 2010 Filing 155 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 01/07/10 before Magistrate Judge Boland. Pages: 1-54. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/26/2010. (Avery Woods Reporting, )
January 20, 2010 Filing 154 RESPONSE to #138 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Motion to Compel Discovery from Concentra Health Services, Inc. filed by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Drake, C.)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MINUTE ORDER granting #151 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants have to and including 1/25/2010 in which to file a response to docket no. 138, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/20/10.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (bnbsec, )
January 19, 2010 Filing 152 MEMORANDUM regarding #151 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #138 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Motion to Compel Discovery from Concentra Health Services, Inc. filed by Concentra Health Services, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/19/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebcd)
January 19, 2010 Filing 151 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #138 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Motion to Compel Discovery from Concentra Health Services, Inc. by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Drake, C.)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting #148 Stipulated Motion to Continue Deadlines. Discovery due by 7/16/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 7/16/2010. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/28/2010. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/4/2010 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/15/2010.(sah, )
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MEMORANDUM regarding #148 Stipulated MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #105 Order on Motion to Continue, #49 Scheduling Order filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero.Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/14/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebcd)
January 14, 2010 Filing 148 Stipulated MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #105 Order on Motion to Continue,, #49 Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Koncilja, Frances)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 147 Minute ORDER granting #113 , #122 , and #129 Motions to Seal. The Clerk of the Court is directed to retain UNDER SEAL the documents specified in the Motions listed in this Minute Order by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/08/10.(jjh, )
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MINUTE ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #138 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Motion to Compel Discovery from Concentra Health Services, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/8/10. (bnbcd, )
January 8, 2010 Filing 145 Docket Annotation re: #110 MOTION to Compel. This docket entry was modified to reactivate motion as it was terminated in error. Text only entry - no document attached (gms, )
January 7, 2010 Filing 144 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland: Motion Hearing held on 1/7/2010. Plaintiffs motion to compel defendant Wal-Mart to provide discovery [Doc. #110 ; filed November 23, 2009] is granted in part and denied in part as stated on the record. Defendants motion to enforce confidentiality designation for specific documents produced under the stipulation and protective order [Doc #112 ; filed November 25, 2009] is granted as stated on the record. Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.s motion to enforce confidentiality designations for documents produced under the courts protective order [Doc #121 ; filed December 7, 2009] is granted as stated on the record. (Court Reporter FTR-G.Mattei.) (bnbcd, )
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER: granting #112 Defendants Motion to Enforce Confidentiality Designation forSpecific Documents Produced Under the Stipulation and Protective Order. Granting #121 Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.s Motion to EnforceConfidentiality Designations for Documents Produced Under the Courts Protective Order, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/7/10.(bnbcd, )
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER: Granting in part and denying in part #110 Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Defendant Wal-Mart to Provide Discovery. The Wal-Mart defendants shall make the supplemental discovery required by this Order on or before January 22, 2010. Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/7/10.(bnbcd, )
January 4, 2010 Filing 141 MEMORANDUM regarding #138 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Motion to Compel Discovery from Concentra Health Services, Inc. filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero, #137 MOTION to Seal Exhibit 3 to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendant Concentra filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/4/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebcd)
December 30, 2009 Filing 140 Exhibit 3 in Support of the Motion to Compel Discovery from Concentra Health Services, Inc. by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. Public entry for #139 SEALED DOCUMENT filed on 12/30/2009. TEXT ONLY ENTRY- NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (sah2, )
December 30, 2009 Filing 139 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Koncilja, Frances)
December 30, 2009 Filing 138 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Motion to Compel Discovery from Concentra Health Services, Inc. by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order re motion to exceed, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Pamela Markert, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Pamela Markert, #4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Pamela Markert, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Pamela Markert, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Pamela Markert, #7 Exhibit 7 Declaration of Pamela Markert, #8 Exhibit 8 Declaration of Pamela Markert, #9 Exhibit 9 Declaration of Pamela Markert, #10 Exhibit 10 Declaration of Pamela Markert, #11 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Pamela Markert, #12 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Pamela Markert, #13 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Pamela Markert, #14 Exhibit 14 to Declaration of Pamela Markert, #15 Exhibit 15 Declaration to Pamela Markert, #16 Exhibit 16 - Declaration of Pamela Markert, #17 Exhibit 17 to Declaration to Pamela Markert, #18 Exhibit 18 to Declaration of Pamela Markert, #19 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Pamela Markert, #20 Exhibit Motion to Compel Discovery From Concentra Health Services, Inc.)(Koncilja, Frances)
December 30, 2009 Filing 137 MOTION to Seal Exhibit 3 to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendant Concentra by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order to Motion to Seal)(Koncilja, Frances)
December 28, 2009 Filing 136 RESPONSE to #121 MOTION to Enforce Confidentiality Designations for documents Produced Under the Court's Protective Order filed by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Koncilja, Frances)
December 22, 2009 Filing 135 RESPONSE In Opposition to #110 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Compel filed by Defendant Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (sah, )
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MINUTE ORDER granting #127 Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.s Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limit on Its Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/22/2009.(sah, )
December 22, 2009 Filing 133 Docket Annotation re: #130 Response. Entry modified on 12/22/2009 to SEAL document. Text only entry - no document attached (sah, )
December 22, 2009 Filing 132 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Amber J. Sayle on behalf of Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc., American Home Assurance Co. (Sayle, Amber)
December 22, 2009 Filing 131 MEMORANDUM regarding #127 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on its Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed by Wal Mart Stores, Inc., #129 First MOTION to Seal filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/22/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebcd)
December 21, 2009 Filing 130 (SEALED)RESPONSE To Defendants Wal-Mart Motion to Enforce Confidentiality Designation for Specific Documents Produced Under the Stipulation and Protective Order by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Koncilja, Frances) Modified on 12/22/2009 to SEAL. Document was filed incorrectly. (sah, ).
December 21, 2009 Filing 129 First MOTION to Seal by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Koncilja, Frances)
December 21, 2009 Filing 128 DECLARATION of NAOMI BEER regarding Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on its Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #127 by Defendant Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Beer, Naomi)
December 21, 2009 Filing 127 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on its Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by Defendant Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Beer, Naomi)
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MINUTE ORDER. A hearing on Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.s Motion to Enforce Confidentiality Designations for Documents Produced Under the Courts Protective Order #121 is set for January 7, 2010, at 1:30 p.m., along with the previously set hearing, in Courtroom A-401. Parties shall respond to the Motion on or before 12/28/2009. No reply will be accepted without leave of court. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/08/2009. (sah, )
December 7, 2009 Filing 126 Exhibits 1 through 6 in Support of #121 MOTION to Enforce Confidentiality Designations for documents Produced Under the Court's Protective Order by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.. Public entry for #123 SEALED DOCUMENT filed 12/07/2009. TEXT ONLY ENTRY- NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (sahsl, )
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MEMORANDUM regarding #121 MOTION to Enforce Confidentiality Designations for documents Produced Under the Court's Protective Order filed by Concentra Health Services, Inc., #122 MOTION to Seal Certain Exhibits in Support of Motion to Enforce Confidentiality Designations Under the Protective Order filed by Concentra Health Services, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/07/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebcd)
December 7, 2009 Filing 123 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 2- Agreement for On-Site and Medical Case Management Services, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Agreement for On-Site Services, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Letter of Understanding, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Physician Services Agreement, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Schedule I Physician's Service Agreement)(Cook-Olson, Amy)
December 7, 2009 Filing 122 MOTION to Seal Certain Exhibits in Support of Motion to Enforce Confidentiality Designations Under the Protective Order by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Cook-Olson, Amy)
December 7, 2009 Filing 121 MOTION to Enforce Confidentiality Designations for documents Produced Under the Court's Protective Order by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 7 Landco v. Colorado Springs, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - Declaration of Mike McCord, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Clearone v. Chiang)(Cook-Olson, Amy)
December 3, 2009 Filing 120 BRIEF in Support of #91 MOTION to Strike 85 Reply to Response to Motion, #83 Sealed Document, Affidavits of Dr. David Logan Orgel filed by Defendants Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc., American Home Assurance Co., Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Beer, Naomi) (Modified on 12/4/2009 edited duplicate text)(erv, ).
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MINUTE ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #112 MOTION to Enforce #63 Protective Order Re Confidentiality Designation for Specific Documents Produced Under the Stipulation and Protective Order: Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Plaintiffs shall respond to the Motion on or before December 21, 2009. No reply will be accepted without leave of court, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/1/09. (bnbcd, )
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MEMORANDUM regarding #113 MOTION to Seal Certain Exhibits in Support of Defendants Motion to Enforce Confidentiality Designation for Specific Documents Produced Under the Stipulation and Protective Order filed by Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc., #112 MOTION to Enforce #63 Protective Order Re Confidentiality Designation for Specific Documents Produced Under the Stipulation and Protective Order filed by Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/30/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebcd) Modified on 12/1/2009 to remove system generated duplicate text (sah2, ).
November 25, 2009 Filing 117 Exhibit G ( part 1) in Support of #112 MOTION to Enforce #63 Protective Order Re Confidentiality Designation for Specific Documents Produced Under the Stipulation and Protective Order by Defendants Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc.. Public entry to #115 SEALED DOCUMENT filed on 11/25/2009. TEXT ONLY ENTRY-NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (sah2, )
November 25, 2009 Filing 116 Exhibits G through J in Support of #112 MOTION to Enforce #63 Protective Order Re Confidentiality Designation for Specific Documents Produced Under the Stipulation and Protective Order, by Defendants Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc.. Public entry to #114 SEALED DOCUMENT filed 11/25/2009. TEXT ONLY ENTRY- NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (sah2, )
November 25, 2009 Filing 115 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc.. (Beer, Naomi)
November 25, 2009 Filing 114 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G Part 2 of 2, #2 Exhibit H Part 1 of 3, #3 Exhibit H Part 2 of 3, #4 Exhibit H Part 3 of 3, #5 Exhibit I part 1 of 2, #6 Exhibit I Part 2 of 2, #7 Exhibit J)(Beer, Naomi)
November 25, 2009 Filing 113 MOTION to Seal Certain Exhibits in Support of Defendants Motion to Enforce Confidentiality Designation for Specific Documents Produced Under the Stipulation and Protective Order by Defendants Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Beer, Naomi)
November 25, 2009 Filing 112 MOTION to Enforce #63 Protective Order Re Confidentiality Designation for Specific Documents Produced Under the Stipulation and Protective Order by Defendants Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Beer, Naomi)
November 23, 2009 Filing 111 MEMORANDUM regarding #110 MOTION to Compel filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/23/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebcd)
November 23, 2009 Filing 110 MOTION to Compel Defendant Wal-Mart to Provide Discovery by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (sah, ) Modified on 1/8/2010 to reactivate motion as it was terminated in error (gms, ).
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MINUTE ORDER granting #107 Plaintiffs Opposed Motion to Exceed Page Limit on Motion to Compel Defendant Wal-Mart to Provide Discovery. Defendant shall respond to the Motion to Compel on or before 12/21/2009. No reply will be accepted without leave of court. A hearing on this Motion is set for 01/07/2010, at 1:30 p.m., for one hour, in Courtroom A-401. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/23/2009.(sah, )
November 20, 2009 Filing 108 MEMORANDUM regarding #107 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Motion to CompelDefendant Wal-Mart to Provide Discovery filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/20/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebcd)
November 20, 2009 Filing 107 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Motion to CompelDefendant Wal-Mart to Provide Discovery by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #2 Proposed Document, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Koncilja, Frances)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MINUTE ORDER granting #103 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record. Attorney W. Bradley Betterton-Fike is withdrawn from the representation of plaintiffs. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/19/2009.(sah, )
November 19, 2009 Filing 104 MEMORANDUM regarding #103 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/19/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MINUTE ORDER granting #101 Joint Motion to Continue Deadlines for Designation of Experts. The plaintiffs shall designate all experts and provide opposing counsel with all information specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 (a)(2) on or before January 19, 2010; The defendants shall designate all experts and provide opposing counsel with all information specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) on or before March 2, 2010; The plaintiffs shall designate all rebuttal experts and provide opposing counsel with all information specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) on or before March 16, 2010, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/18/09.(bnbcd, )
November 18, 2009 Filing 103 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order to Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record)(Koncilja, Frances)
November 18, 2009 Filing 102 MEMORANDUM regarding #101 Joint MOTION to Continue Deadlines for Designation of Experts filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/18/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec)
November 18, 2009 Filing 101 Joint MOTION to Continue Deadlines for Designation of Experts by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order re Joint Motion to Continue Deadlines for Designation of Experts)(Markert, Pamela)
November 18, 2009 Filing 100 RESPONSE to #91 MOTION to Strike 85 Reply to Response to Motion, #83 Sealed Document, filed by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(sah, )
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MINUTE ORDER granting #98 Plaintiffs Partially Unopposed Motion To Exceed Page Limit on Response To Motion To Strike Affidavits of Dr. David Logan Orgel. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/18/2009.(sah, )
November 12, 2009 Filing 98 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Response to #91 Defendants' Motion to Strike Affidavits of Dr. David Logan Orgel by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Plaintiffs' Response to Motion to Strike Affidavits of Dr. David Logan Orgel, #2 Exhibit 1 to Plaintiffs' Response to Motion to Strike Affidavits of Dr. David Logan Orgel with Exhibits A, B, C and D, #3 Exhibit 2 to Plaintiffs' Response to Motion to Strike Affidavits of Dr. David Logan Orgel, #4 Exhibit 3 to Plaintiffs' Response to Motion to Strike Affidavits of Dr. David Logan Orgel, #5 Exhibit 4 to Plaintiffs' Response to Motion to Strike Affidavits of Dr. David Logan Orgel, #6 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order re Plaintiffs' Partially Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limit on Plaintiffs' Response to Motion to Strike Affidavits fo Dr.)(Koncilja, Frances) Modified on 11/13/2009 to remove repetitive text and to create linkage (sah, ).
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MINUTE ORDER granting #95 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #91 Motion To Strike Affidavits of Dr. David Logan Orgel, to 11/12/09 by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/9/09.(erv, )
November 6, 2009 Filing 96 MOTION for Order to Plaintiffs' Motion to File Response to Defendants' Surreply Regarding Class Certification by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Response to the Defendants' Surreply Regarding Class Certification)(Koncilja, Frances)
November 5, 2009 Filing 95 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #91 MOTION to Strike 85 Reply to Response to Motion, #83 Sealed Document by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Koncilja, Frances) Modified on 11/6/2009 to remove repetitive text (sah2, ).
October 19, 2009 Filing 94 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Delphine L. Farr by Frances A. Koncilja on behalf of all plaintiffs (Koncilja, Frances)
October 19, 2009 Filing 93 SURREPLY In Opposition to #44 Plaintiff's MOTION to Certify Class filed by Defendants Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc., American Home Assurance Co., Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (sah, )
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MINUTE ORDER granting #90 Defendants Motion For Leave To File Surreply. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/19/2009.(sah, )
October 16, 2009 Filing 91 MOTION to Strike 85 Reply to Response to Motion, #83 Sealed Document,,,, by Defendants Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc., American Home Assurance Co., Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit 1-B, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Pages Lombato v. Ford - 2007 WL 3342598 *17 (D.Colo.), #8 Pages Hammond v. City of Junction City, KS - 126 Fed.Appx. 886, 2005 WL 481574 (C.A. 10(Kan.)))(Beer, Naomi)
October 16, 2009 Filing 90 MOTION for Leave to to File Surreply by Defendants Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc., American Home Assurance Co., Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Surreply In Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #2 Pages Romberio v. UnumProvident Corp., 2009 WL 87510, *7, #3 Pages Lee v. American Airlines, 2002 WL 3120803)(Beer, Naomi)
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER : The settlement conference set for October 15, 2009, at 9:00 a.m., is VACATED, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/9/09. (bnbcd, )
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MINUTE ORDER granting #87 Motion for Extension of Time, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/5/09. The court will hold in abeyance the plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification until 10/19/09.(rebcd)
October 2, 2009 Filing 87 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Afford the Parties an Opportunity to Meet and Confer Regarding Class Certification Briefing by Defendants Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc., American Home Assurance Co., Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Beer, Naomi)
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting #82 plaintiffs Motion To Seal Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 09/25/2009.(sah, )
September 21, 2009 Filing 84 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service Amended by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Koncilja, Frances)
September 18, 2009 Filing 85 REPLY to Response to #44 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. Public Entry for SEALED Document #83 , filed 9/18/09) TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (erv, )
September 18, 2009 Filing 83 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Pages Unpublished Opinion 2008 WL 384576, #30 Pages Unpublished Opinion 2009 WL 1458032, #31 Pages Unpublished Opinion 2007 WL 891371, #32 Pages ICAO Opinion - 2007 WL 4429065, #33 Pages Unpublished Opinion 2009 WL 909817, #34 Pages Unpublished Opinion 2009 WL 900787, #35 Pages Unpublished Opinion 2008 WL 786315, #36 Pages ICAO Opinion 1998 WL 957280, #37 Pages ICAO Opinion 1993 WL 547507, #38 Pages Unpublished Opinion 2001 WL 1795093, #39 Pages ICAO Opinion 2002 WL 31727638)(Betterton-Fike, W.) (Modified on 9/22/2009 edited duplicate text)(ervsl, ).
September 18, 2009 Filing 82 MOTION to Seal Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2 by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Betterton-Fike, W.)
September 3, 2009 Filing 81 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Pamela Ann Markert by Pamela Ann Markert on behalf of all plaintiffs (Markert, Pamela)
September 3, 2009 Filing 80 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Gwendolyn R. Giblin by Gwendolyn R. Giblin on behalf of all plaintiffs (Giblin, Gwendolyn)
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Establishing ESI and Paper Document Production Protocol. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 09/16/2009. (sah, )
July 22, 2009 Filing 78 REPLY to Response to #59 MOTION to Strike #53 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Koncilja, Frances)
July 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MINUTE ORDER granting #76 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiffs shall have to and including 9/18/09 to file their reply in support of the motion for class certification. Plaintiff's reply brief shall not exceed forty-five (45) pages. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/22/09.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (rebsec, )
July 22, 2009 Filing 76 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #44 MOTION to Certify Class and for Leave to Exceed Page Limit in Reply by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Koncilja, Frances)
July 17, 2009 Filing 75 APPENDIX re #72 Response to Motion,, #44 MOTION to Certify Class, #73 Exhibits,, #74 Appendix, Continuation of Appendix (Docket No. 74) attached to Combined Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Docket No. 72) by Defendants Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc., American Home Assurance Co., Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Beer, Naomi)
July 17, 2009 Filing 74 APPENDIX re #72 Response to Motion,, #44 MOTION to Certify Class, #73 Exhibits,, to Combined Opposition to Plainitffs' Motion for Class Certification - Continuation of Docket No. 72 by Defendants Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc., American Home Assurance Co., Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Beer, Naomi)
July 17, 2009 Filing 73 Exhibits in Support of Combined Oposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification - Docket No. 72 by Defendants Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc., American Home Assurance Co., Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit D to Declaration of JEannette Brook - Continuation of Docket No. 72, #2 Declaration of Jennifer Pickard - Continuation of Docket No. 72, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Jennifer Pickard - Continuation of Docket No. 72, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Jennifer Pickard - Continuation of Docket No. 72)(Beer, Naomi)
July 17, 2009 Filing 72 RESPONSE to #44 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Defendants Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc., American Home Assurance Co., Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeannette M. Brook, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Jeannette M. Brook - Declarations from Claims Management Inc.s Colorado Workers' Compensation Team, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Jeannette M. Brook - Declarations from Medical Practitioners at Concentra Health Services)(Beer, Naomi)
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTE ORDER granting #70 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendants shall have leave to file a combined response to the plaintiffs' motion for class certification that does not exceed thirty-five (35) pages. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/17/09.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (rebsec, )
July 16, 2009 Filing 70 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages On Combined Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Defendants Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc., American Home Assurance Co., Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) PROPOSED ORDER TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT)(Beer, Naomi)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM regarding #68 Joint MOTION for Order to Adopt Stipulated ESI and Paper Document Production Protocol filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/16/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
July 15, 2009 Filing 68 Joint MOTION for Order to Adopt Stipulated ESI and Paper Document Production Protocol by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) ESI and Paper Document Protocol)(Koncilja, Frances)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MINUTE ORDER granting #65 Motion for Extension of Time allowing defendants up to and including July 15, 2009, in which to file their agreed-upon ESI production protocol by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/10/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (bnbsec, )
July 10, 2009 Filing 66 MEMORANDUM regarding #65 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit ESI Production Protocol filed by American Home Assurance Co., Concentra Health Services, Inc., Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/10/09. (rebsec, )
July 10, 2009 Filing 65 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit ESI Production Protocol by Defendants Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc., American Home Assurance Co., Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Beer, Naomi)
July 7, 2009 Filing 64 Docket Annotation re: #63 Protective Order. Entry modified on 7/7/2009 to include complete title of the Protective Order. Text only entry - no document attached (sah2, )
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/7/09. (bnbcd, ) Modified on 7/7/2009 to include complete title of the Protective Order (sah2, ).
July 7, 2009 Filing 62 BRIEF in Opposition to #59 MOTION to Strike #53 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint filed by Defendants Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc., American Home Assurance Co.. (Beer, Naomi)
July 6, 2009 Filing 61 TRANSCRIPT of Scheduling Conference held on 06/25/09 before Magistrate Judge Boland. Pages: 1-26. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/5/2009. (Avery Woods Reporting, )
July 2, 2009 Filing 60 NOTICE of Change of Address by Amy E. Cook-Olson (Cook-Olson, Amy)
July 2, 2009 Filing 59 MOTION to Strike #53 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Koncilja, Frances)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM regarding #57 MOTION for Protective Order filed filed by Jennifer Jensen, Josephine Gianzero.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/30/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
June 29, 2009 Filing 57 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Koncilja, Frances)
June 29, 2009 Filing 56 Docket Annotation re: #54 Stipulation. Counsel will re-file using the Motion for Protective Order event. Text only entry - no document attached (sah2, )
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MINUTE ORDER granting #52 Motion for Extension of Time by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/26/09. Defendants shall have up to and including 7/17/09 to respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification.(rebcd)
June 26, 2009 Filing 54 STIPULATION and Protective Order by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Betterton-Fike, W.)
June 26, 2009 Filing 53 BRIEF in Support of #29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint filed by Defendants Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc., American Home Assurance Co., Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Beer, Naomi)
June 26, 2009 Filing 52 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Defendants Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc., American Home Assurance Co., Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Beer, Naomi)
June 26, 2009 Filing 51 Docket Annotation re: #50 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. The pdf for the motion did not get attached to this docket entry. Counsel will re-file with the motion attached. Text only entry - no document attached (gms, ) Modified on 6/29/2009 to correct typographical error (gmssl, ).
June 26, 2009 Filing 50 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Defendants Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc., American Home Assurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Beer, Naomi)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 SCHEDULING ORDER. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 06/25/2009. (sah, )
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/27/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Settlement Conference set for 10/15/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 06/25/09. (bnbsec, )
June 25, 2009 Filing 47 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Scheduling Conference held on 6/25/2009. Discovery due by 3/19/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 3/19/2010. Settlement Conference set for 10/15/2009 09:00 AM in Conference Room before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/20/2010. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/27/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland.ORDERED:The parties shall work together to develop a protocol for the disclosure of electronically stored information and shall submit that protocol to the court on or before July 10, 2009. (Court Reporter FTR-G.Mattei.) (bnbcd, )
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Sixteen (16) Day Jury Trial set for 10/4/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 9/17/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 06/25/2009. (sah, )
June 18, 2009 Filing 45 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document Plaintiffs' Proposed Stipulation and Protective Order, #2 Proposed Document Defendants' Proposed Stipulation and Protective Order)(Koncilja, Frances)
June 15, 2009 Filing 44 MOTION to Certify Class by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Affidavit, #7 Exhibit to Affidavit, #8 Exhibit B to Affidavit, #9 Exhibit C to Affidavit, #10 Exhibit Cruz, #11 Exhibit Fincher, #12 Exhibit Lucas, #13 Exhibit Swanson)(sah, )
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER granting #42 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion To Exceed Page Limit on Motion For Class Certification by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 06/15/2009.(sah, )
June 10, 2009 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #2 Exhibit 1 to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #3 Exhibit 2 to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #4 Exhibit 3 to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #5 Exhibit 4 to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #6 Exhibit 5 to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #7 Affidavit Declaration of Solomon B. Cera in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #8 Exhibit A to Declaration of Solomon B. Cera in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #9 Exhibit B to Declaration of Solomon B. Cera in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #10 Exhibit C to Declaration of Solomon B. Cera in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #11 Exhibit Fincher v. Prudential Property and Casualty Insurance Company, 2007 WL 891371, #12 Exhibit Swanson v. Town of Mountain View, 2008 WL 786315, #13 Exhibit Lucas v. Kmart Corporation, 2005 WL 1648182, #14 Exhibit Cruz v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., 2009 WL 1458032, #15 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Minute Order)(Koncilja, Frances)
June 9, 2009 Filing 41 RESPONSE (Opposition) to #29 Defendants MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(sah, )
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER granting #39 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion To Exceed Page Limit on Opposition To Motion To Dismiss by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 06/09/2009.(sah, )
June 8, 2009 Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to P's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #3 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order to Motion to Exceed Page Limit)(Koncilja, Frances)
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part #37 Unopposed Motion For Extension ofTime to Respond to Motion To Dismiss #29 and For Extension of Time To File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs shall have until 06/08/2009 in which to file a response by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 06/01/2009.(sah, )
June 1, 2009 Filing 37 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint by Plaintiff Josephine Gianzero. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order re: Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss and For Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Koncilja, Frances)
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER. A Scheduling/Planning Conference is set for 6/25/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/28/2009. (sah, )
May 20, 2009 Filing 35 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by C. Todd Drake on behalf of Concentra Health Services, Inc. (Drake, C.)
May 19, 2009 Filing 34 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc... (Cook-Olson, Amy)
May 11, 2009 Filing 33 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Class Action by Concentra Health Services, Inc..(Cook-Olson, Amy)
May 11, 2009 Filing 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant American Home Assurance Co... (Beer, Naomi)
May 11, 2009 Filing 31 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Claims Management, Inc... (Beer, Naomi)
May 11, 2009 Filing 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Wal Mart Stores, Inc... (Beer, Naomi)
May 11, 2009 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint by Defendants Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc., American Home Assurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Pages Unpublished Opinion - Heath v. Board of County Commrs of Boulder County, 2004 WL 304341, *3 (10th Cir. Feb. 18, 2004), #2 Pages Unpublished Opinion - Tax Servs. of Am., Inc. v. Mitchell, 2007 WL 4522472, *1 (D.Colo. Dec. 18, 2007), #3 Pages Unpublished Opinion - Sieverding v. Colorado Bar Assn, 2003 WL 22400218, *17 (D.Colo. 2003), #4 Pages Unpublished Opinion - Dalton v. City of Las Vegas, 282 Fed.Appx. 652, 655 (10th Cir. 2008), #5 Pages Unpublished Opinion - Kearney v. Dimanna, 195 Fed.Appx. 717, 720 (10th Cir. 2006), #6 Pages Unpublished Opinion - Dirt Hogs Inc. v. Natural Gas Pipeline Co. of America, 210 F.3d 389, at *3 (10th Cir. 2000), #7 Pages Unpublished Opinion - Catalan v. Vermillion Ranch Ltd. Pship, 2007 WL 38135 at *6 (D.Colo. Jan. 4, 2007))(Beer, Naomi) Modified on 5/12/2009 to create linkage to the Complaint(sah, ).
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/11/09. (rebsec, )
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER RE: MOTIONS FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 05/11/2009. (sah, )
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER granting #25 Defendants Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limit on Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Class Action Complaint. by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 05/08/2009.(sah, )
May 7, 2009 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages On Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint by Defendants Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc., American Home Assurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Beer, Naomi)
May 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER granting #23 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Paul G. Karlsgodt, of the law firm of Baker & Hosteller, LLP, is permitted to withdraw as counsel of record for defendant American Home Assurance Co by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 05/04/2009.(sah, )
May 4, 2009 Filing 23 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant American Home Assurance Co.. (Karlsgodt, Paul)
May 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER granting #20 Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time For American Home Assurance Co. To Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Defendant American Home Assurance Co. shall have until 05/11/2009, to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 05/04/2009.(sah, )
April 30, 2009 Filing 21 Docket Annotation re: #19 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Substitute Counsel of Record and Withdraw Counsel of Record. Counsel will file a separate Motion to Withdraw Counsel. Text only entry - no document attached (sah, )
April 29, 2009 Filing 20 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond #1 to Complaint by Defendant American Home Assurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Beer, Naomi) Modified on 4/30/2009 to create linkage to the Complaint(sah, ).
April 29, 2009 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Substitute Counsel of Record and Withdraw Counsel of Record by Defendant American Home Assurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Beer, Naomi)
April 20, 2009 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jeannette MacLeod Brook on behalf of Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc. (Brook, Jeannette)
April 20, 2009 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brian Lee Duffy on behalf of Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc. (Duffy, Brian)
April 20, 2009 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Solomon B. Cera by Frances A. Koncilja on behalf of all plaintiffs (Koncilja, Frances)
April 20, 2009 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Steven U. Mullens by Frances A. Koncilja on behalf of all plaintiffs (Koncilja, Frances)
April 17, 2009 Filing 14 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to #1 Complaint by Defendants Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Beer, Naomi) Modified on 4/20/2009 to create linkage to the Complaint(sah, ).
April 15, 2009 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by W. Bradley Betterton-Fike on behalf of all plaintiffs (Betterton-Fike, W.)
April 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER granting #11 Stipulation to Extend Time For Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc. To Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (dkt. no. 1, filed 3/24/09). Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc. shall have until 05/10/2009 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 04/15/2009.(sah, )
April 14, 2009 Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond #1 to Complaint by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Cook-Olson, Amy) Modified on 4/15/2009 to create linkage to the Complaint (sah2, ).
April 10, 2009 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to #1 Complaint by Defendant American Home Assurance Co. (Karlsgodt, Paul) Modified on 4/13/2009 to create linkage to the Complaint (sah, ).
April 6, 2009 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by all plaintiffs. Wal Mart Stores, Inc. served on 3/30/2009, answer due 4/20/2009. (Koncilja, Frances)
April 6, 2009 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by all plaintiffs. Concentra Health Services, Inc. served on 3/30/2009, answer due 4/20/2009. (Koncilja, Frances)
April 6, 2009 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by all plaintiffs. Claims Management, Inc. served on 3/30/2009, answer due 4/20/2009. (Koncilja, Frances)
April 6, 2009 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by all plaintiffs. American Home Assurance Co. served on 3/30/2009, answer due 4/20/2009. (Koncilja, Frances)
April 6, 2009 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Matthew M. VanderKaay upon Wal Mart Stores, Inc. on 03.30.09, filed by Plaintiffs Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen (Koncilja, Frances)
April 6, 2009 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Concentra Health upon Pam Trujillo on 03.30.09, filed by Defendant Concentra Health Services, Inc. (Koncilja, Frances)
April 6, 2009 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Claims Management, Inc. upon Emily Barnhard on 03.30.09, filed by Defendant Claims Management, Inc. (Koncilja, Frances)
April 6, 2009 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of American Home Assurance Co upon Pam Trujillo on 03/30/09, filed by Defendant American Home Assurance Co. (Koncilja, Frances)
March 24, 2009 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Claims Management, Inc., American Home Assurance Co., Concentra Health Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, Receipt Number 17596) Summons Issued, filed by Josephine Gianzero, Jennifer Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(jak, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gianzero et al v. Wal Mart Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Lauren Tarver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Patrice S. Matthes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Niccolo Grando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Mark Plucinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Robin Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Steven A. Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josephine Gianzero
Represented By: W. Bradley Betterton-Fike
Represented By: Frances A. Koncilja
Represented By: Steven Ulysses Mullens
Represented By: Delphine Farr Janey
Represented By: Pamela Ann Markert
Represented By: Solomon Benjamin Cera
Represented By: Gwendolyn R. Giblin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Jensen
Represented By: W. Bradley Betterton-Fike
Represented By: Frances A. Koncilja
Represented By: Steven Ulysses Mullens
Represented By: Delphine Farr Janey
Represented By: Pamela Ann Markert
Represented By: Solomon Benjamin Cera
Represented By: Gwendolyn R. Giblin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Assurance Co.
Represented By: Naomi G. Beer
Represented By: Natalia Solis Ballinger
Represented By: Paul Gregory Karlsgodt
Represented By: Amber J. Munck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claims Management, Inc.
Represented By: Naomi G. Beer
Represented By: Natalia Solis Ballinger
Represented By: Brian Lee Duffy
Represented By: Jeannette MacLeod Brook
Represented By: Amber J. Munck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Naomi G. Beer
Represented By: Natalia Solis Ballinger
Represented By: Brian Lee Duffy
Represented By: Jeannette MacLeod Brook
Represented By: Amber J. Munck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concentra Health Services, Inc.
Represented By: Sana Muttalib
Represented By: Naomi G. Beer
Represented By: Stephen Jerome Hensen
Represented By: Terence M. Ridley
Represented By: Amy E. Cook-Olson
Represented By: Michael McDonald Maddigan
Represented By: Greg Richard Lindsay
Represented By: C. Todd Drake
Represented By: Michael D. Alper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Lisa F. Mickley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?