Flores v. Friend et al
Plaintiff: |
Gabriel Flores |
Defendant: |
Amy Friend, Morgan, Director of Medical Dept. and Renae Martinez |
Case Number: |
1:2009cv00739 |
Filed: |
April 2, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Prison Condition Office |
County: |
Fremont |
Presiding Judge: |
Marcia S. Krieger |
Presiding Judge: |
Kathleen M. Tafoya |
Nature of Suit: |
None |
Cause of Action: |
Federal Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 11, 2010 |
Filing
45
ORDER accepting 42 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. Granting 25 Defendants Morgan and Martinez's Motion to Dismiss. Granting 30 Defendant Friend's Motion to Dismiss. All of plaintiff's claims are dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of defendants Morgan, Martinez, and Friend and against plaintiff Gabriel Flores, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/11/10.(ebs, )
|
December 30, 2009 |
Filing
42
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 25 Defendant Morgan and Defendant Martinez's MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. 4) and the 30 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. 4) on Behalf of Defendant Amy Friend be granted and that this case be dismissed with prejudice in its entirety, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/30/09. (ebs, )
|
June 17, 2009 |
Filing
20
ORDER OF RECUSAL directing reassignment to another judge. By Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 06/17/2009. (sah, )
|
June 10, 2009 |
Filing
18
ORDER Setting Preliminary Scheduling Conference for 8/18/2009 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 06/10/09. (wjc, )
|
May 29, 2009 |
Filing
16
ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/29/09. (mskcd)
|
May 20, 2009 |
Filing
11
ORDER Granting Service by United States Marshal by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 05/20/09. (wjc, )
|
May 18, 2009 |
Filing
8
ORDER to Dismiss in Part and Assign Case. The fourth claim in the amended complaint is dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C § 1915A(b)(2) and the DOC, which is identified in the caption of the amended complaint as "All of the Colorado Department of Corrections", is dismissed as a party to this action. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 05/15/2009. (sah, )
|
April 2, 2009 |
Filing
2
ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency. Plaintiff has 30 days to file complaint with original signature and with names in caption that match the names in the text, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/1/09. (gms, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?