Wood v. Milyard et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Wood
Defendant: Kevin Milyard, Rebecca Rodenbeck, Thomas Beneze, Ken Topliss, Olathe Murphy, Randy Foshee, Linda Maifeld, Custody/Control Manager, Terry Bartruff, Robert Fazzino, Colorado Department of Corrections, Colorado Territorial Correctional Facility and Sterling Correctional Facility
Case Number: 1:2009cv00806
Filed: April 8, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Prison Condition Office
County: Logan
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER to Cure Deficiency re 29 Notice of Appeal by Patrick Wood, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 04/23/10. Appellant has 30 days to either pay the filing fee or file a proper 1915 motion with district court.(bjrsl, )
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER AFFIRMED AND ADOPTED 23 Report and Recommendations. granting 16 Motion to Dismiss this case With Prejudice; by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/19/2010.(erv, )
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Recommending that 16 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (filed by Thomas Beneze, Robert Fazzino, Randy Foshee, Colorado Department of Corrections, Kevin Milyard, Ken Topliss, Rebecca Rodenbeck, Terry Bartruff, Linda Maifeld) be granted and that the Prisoner Complaint be dismissed, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/6/2010. (mjwcd )
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting Service by the United States Marshal's Office re: 1 Complaint, filed by Patrick Wood by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 5/19/09. (erv, )
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER to Dismiss in Part and Assign Case. Ordered that the complaint is dismissed in part as frivolous pursuant to 28 U.S.C.§ 1915A (b) (1). Defendants Custody/Control Manager, Colorado Territorial Correctional Facility, and Sterling Correctiona l Facility are dismissed as parties to this action. The clerk of the Court is directed to correct the docket sheet to remove Defendants Custody/Control Manager, Colorado Territorial Correctional Facility, and Sterling Correctional Facility. The only remaining Defendants in this lawsuit are Kevin Milyard, Rebecca Rodenbeck, Lt Thomas Beneze, Lt. Ken Topliss, Olathe Murphy, Randy Foshee, Major Linda Maifeld, Major Terry Bartruff, Lieutenant Robert Fazzion, and Colorado Department of Corrections. The remaining claims against the remaining Defendants and the action are assigned to Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel pursuant to D.C.COLO.CivR 40.1C.1, and to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 05/14/2009. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood v. Milyard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Milyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Rodenbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Beneze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Topliss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olathe Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Foshee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Maifeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Custody/Control Manager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Bartruff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Fazzino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Territorial Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?