September 9, 2009 |
Filing
63
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 56 Joint Status Report and Motion to Enter Final Stipulated Order, Deny Motion to Dismiss, and Administratively Close Case. Denying without prejudice 49 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim and Brief in Suppo rt Thereof. This case is administratively closed and is subject to reopening for any default, breach, or other non-compliance with respect to the Settlement Agreement. Parties shall file a status report by 9/2/2011, advising the Court whether this case can be dismissed. This Order supersedes the Order Extending Temporary Restraining Order 28 . Defendants shall destroy any copies of Heart of a Warrior, Dispatches from the Front, in any format or medium as set forth in this Order. Defendants shall destroy any copies of Ian Weikel's prayer journals in any format or medium, as set forth in this Order. Defendants and each of their officers, agents, etc. are permanently enjoined and restrained from reproducing, printing, etc. Warrior, the Journals, or Green or Jonathan Weikel's name or likeness as set forth in this Order. Within 10 business days of entry of this Order, the Weikels shall request the U.S. Copyright Office to cancel the copyright registration as set forth in t his Order. The Order dated April 30, 2009 granting Motion to Seal remains in full force and effect. Notwithstanding the administrative closure or dismissal of this case, the Court retains jurisdiction to enforce the terms of this Order or resolve any disputes or controversies in connection with the Settlement Agreement, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/9/09. (ebs, )
|
September 2, 2009 |
Filing
59
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Motion Hearing held on 9/2/2009. Denying without prejudice 49 Motion to Dismiss and Granting in Part and Denying in Part 56 Motion for Order. (Court Reporter Janet Coppock) (pabcd)
|
July 31, 2009 |
Filing
55
MINUTE ORDER granting 53 Unopposed Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set 8/11/09 is vacated, Status Report due by 8/24/2009 on status of settlement, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/31/09.(gmssl, )
|
May 22, 2009 |
Filing
28
ORDER granting 24 Unopposed Motion by Plaintiffs to Further Extend Stipulated Order Granting Motion by Plaintiff for Temporary Restraining Order and to Vacate Preliminary Injunction Hearing. The Stipulated Temporary Restraining Order 10 is exten ded, remaining in full force and effect through and including entry of a final judgment or order of the Court that resolves all claims among all of the parties. Vacating the 5/28/09 Preliminary Injunction Hearing, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/22/09.(ebs, )
|
April 23, 2009 |
Filing
10
STIPULATED ORDER granting 4 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Defendants LifeVest Publishing, Inc., David Weikel, individually and on behalf of his wife, Beth Weikel and his company, By His Design, LLC, and each of their pri ncipals, officers, etc. are temporarily enjoined and restrained from reproducing, printing, etc. the prayer journals drafted by Ian Weikel and "Heart of a Warrior." This Order shall remain in full force and effect until the conclusion of th e preliminary injunction hearing set for 5/28/09 at 1:30 p.m. Mr. Weikel shall retrieve and deliver to Pearson, Horowitz & Burnett, P.C. all copies of the Journals and "Heart of a Warrior" as set forth in this Order. Security requirement of Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(c) is waived, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/23/09.(ebs, )
|