Pikes Peak Nephrology Associates, P.C. et al v. Total Renal Care, Inc.
Plaintiff: Pikes Peak Nephrology Associates, P.C., Brad H. Yuan, Stephen Fox, Melinda L. Hockensmith, Roger L. Mallory, George A. DeVault, Jr. and Jesse A. Flaxenburg
Defendant: Total Renal Care, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00928
Filed: April 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 5 Plaintiffs Motion to Stay Arbitration Proceeding or, Alternatively, for Order Compelling Arbitration Pursuant to Terms fo Agreements ; granting in part and denying in part 14 Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration Pursuant to 9 U.S.C. § 4 or, Alternatively, for a Stay Pending Resolution of Arbitration by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/30/2010.(erv, )
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 20 Joint Motion Motion to Stay pending the Courts ruling on Plaintiffs Motion To 5 Stay Arbitration Proceeding and Defendants 14 Motion To Compel Arbitration Pursuant to 9 U.S.C. § 4 by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/6/09.(erv, )
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: granting in part and denying in part 8 Joint Motion to Amend 3 Minute Order; Motion Hearing held on 6/2/2009 ; Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/1/2009 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (Court Reporter FTR / Cathy Coomes.) (erv, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pikes Peak Nephrology Associates, P.C. et al v. Total Renal Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pikes Peak Nephrology Associates, P.C.
Represented By: James D. Kilroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad H. Yuan
Represented By: James D. Kilroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Fox
Represented By: James D. Kilroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda L. Hockensmith
Represented By: James D. Kilroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger L. Mallory
Represented By: James D. Kilroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George A. DeVault, Jr.
Represented By: James D. Kilroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse A. Flaxenburg
Represented By: James D. Kilroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Renal Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?