Home Design Services, Inc. v. C & H Builders, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Home Design Services, Inc. |
Defendant: |
C & H Builders, LLC, Sjoden Wood Designs, LLC, Chris Sjoden, Jerry W. Peters, Donald G. Walker, Teresa S. Walker, David P. Smith and Janelyn M. Smith |
Case Number: |
1:2009cv00931 |
Filed: |
April 23, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Marcia S. Krieger |
Presiding Judge: |
Kathleen M. Tafoya |
Nature of Suit: |
None |
Cause of Action: |
17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 14, 2010 |
Filing
85
MINUTE ORDER Setting Settlement Conference for 10/18/2010 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Laird T. Milburn, by Magistrate Judge Laird T. Milburn on 06/14/2010. (wjc, )
|
May 27, 2010 |
Filing
79
ORDER re: 77 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. The proposed Amended Scheduling Order be resubmitted in proper form by 06/11/2010. The resubmitted proposed Amended Scheduling Order shall contain a Settlement Conference date of 10/18/2010 with Confidential Settlement Statements to be filed with this Court on or before 10/11/2010. All other dates are hereby approved, by Magistrate Judge Laird T. Milburn on 05/27/2010.(wjc, )
|
February 22, 2010 |
Filing
59
ORDER Re: 54 Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification as to Order Entered on 02/09/2010. Plaintiffs rebuttal report to Mr. Schmitt's report, along with all other rebuttal reports, are due on 05/01/2010, by Magistrate Judge Laird T. Milburn on 02/22/2010.(wjc, )
|
February 11, 2010 |
Filing
53
ORDER GRANTING 52 MOTION TO TRANSFER AND DIRECTING CLERK TO REDRAW CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LAIRD T. MILBURN. The Clerk is directed to reassign this matter to Magistrate Judge Laird T. Milburn to conduct proceedings as set forth in this Courts 3 Order of Reference to Magistrate Judge, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 02/11/2010.(wjc, )
|
February 9, 2010 |
Filing
51
ORDER granting 47 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to for Plaintiff to Serve Rebuttal Expert Reports and Disclosures by Plaintiff Home Design Services, Inc. and 46 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Scheduling Order-- by Plaintiff. Discov ery due by 6/1/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 7/1/2010. Expert Disclosures Deadline 04/01/2010. Rebuttal Expert Disclosures 05/01/2010.The parties are reminded that a Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled before District Judge Marcia S. Krieger on July 27, 2010 at 4:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/9/2010.(kmtcd, )
|
October 14, 2009 |
Filing
31
ORDER granting 26 MOTION to Amend 1 Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Plaintiff. The Clerk of Court is directed to file Plaintiffs Amended Complaint - Injunctive Relief Sought (Doc. No. 26-2 and the exhibits attached thereto. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/14/09.(kmtcd)
|
July 21, 2009 |
Filing
24
ORDER Setting Settlement Conference for 11/18/2009 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 07/21/09. (wjc, )
|
April 28, 2009 |
Filing
5
ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/28/09. (mskcd)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?