Video Professor, Inc. v. Graziosi et al

Plaintiff: Video Professor, Inc.
Defendant: Dean Graziosi, Ryan Patten, Michael Savage, Edward Johnson, Tax Club, Inc., The, Infomercial consumer awareness, Inc., Justin Leonard and Leonard Fitness, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv01025
Filed: May 1, 2009
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2009 10 Featured Case ORDER Vacating 3 Order of Reference to United States Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/22/2009. (rpmcd)
July 9, 2009 29 Featured Case ORDER for Dismissal. Ordered that this action is dismissed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 07/09/09. (jjh, )
January 29, 2010 34 Featured Case ORDER Denying 30 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs without any adjudication as to the merits of the plaintiff's conduct of this litigation against the defendants Justin Leonard and Leonard Fitness, Inc, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/29/2010.(rpmcd)
May 13, 2009 4 Featured Case ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 7/31/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/13/09. (ebs, )
May 18, 2009 6 Featured Case ORDER OF RECUSAL directing reassignment to another judge by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 05/18/2009. (sah, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Video Professor, Inc. v. Graziosi et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Video Professor, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory C. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Graziosi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Patten
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Savage
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tax Club, Inc., The
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infomercial consumer awareness, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Leonard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard Fitness, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]