Maez v. Springs Automotive Group LLC.
Plaintiff: Sally Ann Maez
Defendant: Springs Automotive Group LLC.
Case Number: 1:2009cv01159
Filed: May 21, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1640 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MINUTE ENTRY for Fairness Hearing held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/22/2011. Granting 97 Motion for Attorney Fees. ORDERED: Court approves the settlement and finds that it is fair and reasonable. Parties are ordered to complete the numbers on the final judgment and the order of dismissal and submit it to the court for approval. (Court Reporter: Kara Spitler) (lag)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER. Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Updated Class Notices 83 is GRANTED. The amended Notice of Class Action, appended to hereto as Exhibit A, is APPROVED and ADOPTED for submission to putative class members in this action. The amended Request for Exclusion from Class Action, appended hereto as Exhibit B, is APPROVED and ADOPTED for submission to putative class members in this action. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/8/2011.(sah, )
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 THIRD TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Trial Preparation Conference set for 9/30/2011 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn.Three (3) day Bench Trial set for 10/3/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/16/11. (rebsec, )
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 2/8/11. (cbssec)
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Minute Entry for Trial Preparation Conference held on 11/5/2010 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Granting 68 Motion to Vacate. (Court Reporter: Suzanne Claar) (rebcd)
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 COURTROOM MINUTES - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: A Telephonic Status Conference was held on 11/4/2010. ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification, doc # 60 , is GRANTED. A Settlement Conference is set for 11/15/2010 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Updated Confidential Settlement Statements are due by 12:00 p.m. on 11/12/2010. POST RECESS ORDER: Defendant's Statement in Support of Excluding Certain Individuals and/or Entities From Inclusion in Certified Class, doc # 61 , is DENIED. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. (Court Reporter FTR - Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 SECOND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/30/10. Trial Preparation Conference set for 11/5/2010 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Three (3) day Bench Trial set for 11/8/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. (rebsec, )
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER. Plaintiffs Amended Motion for Class Certification 47 , filed 05/26/2010, is GRANTED. Michael Kleinman, Attorney at Law, and Richard Wynkoop, of Wynkoop & Thomas PC, are APPOINTED as counsel for the plaintiff class. On or before 07/09/2010, plaintiff SHALL FILE with the court a proposed form of notice to members of the class and a proposal for directing the notice to the members of the class, in compliance with FED.R.CIV.P. 23(c)(2)(B). The trial to the court, currently scheduled to c ommence on 06/28/2010, is VACATED and CONTINUED, pending further order of the court. A telephonic setting hearing conference, to reset the trial preparation conference and the trial to court, is SCHEDULED for 06/30/2010 at 10:00 a.m.(MDT). By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 06/21/2010.(sah, )
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER. Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment 38 , filed 04/05/2010, is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 05/19/2010.(sah, )
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/4/09. Four (4) day Jury Trial set for 6/28/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 6/4/2010 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. (rebsec, )
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Plaintiffs First Motion to Amend Complaint. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 07/13/2009.(sah, )
June 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 8/4/2009 at 8:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 6/22/09. (cbssec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maez v. Springs Automotive Group LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Ann Maez
Represented By: Richard B. Wynkoop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Springs Automotive Group LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?