Cohen v. Longshore et al
Plaintiff: Solomon B. Cohen
Defendant: John Longshore, Dan Muldoon, Fred Wegener, Monte Gore and Warden of Park County Jail
Case Number: 1:2009cv01169
Filed: May 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Park
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER. The recommendation is accepted and this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 41(b) for Plaintiffs failure to prosecute and failure to comply with the Courts Orders, the Local Rules of Practice of the United States District Court for the District of Colorado, and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/8/2011.(sah, )
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 49 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 3/3/2011.(erv, )
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING SERVICE BY UNITED STATES MARSHAL. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 1/14/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Process Receipt and Return, # 2 Certified Mail Receipts)(sah, )
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER ASSIGNING CASE. This case shall be assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1C.1., and to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/3/2011. (sah, )
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Reinstating Case. Ordered that this civil action is reinstated pursuant to the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. Orderd that the case shall be reassigned to the pro se docket by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 12/15/10. (jjh, )
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER to Cure Deficiency re 25 Notice of Appeal by Solomon Cohen, by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 01/13/10. Appellant has 30 days to either pay the filing fee or file a proper 1915 motion with district court.(bjrsl, )
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER of Dismissal. Ordered that the 2 Prisoner Complaints and the action are dismissed. Order denying 18 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 19 Motion for Order by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 12/16/09.(jjh, )
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint within 30 days by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 06/25/09. (jjh, )
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint within 30 days by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 06/02/09. (jjh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohen v. Longshore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solomon B. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Longshore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Muldoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Wegener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monte Gore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden of Park County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?