Powers v. Hautzinger et al
Plaintiff: |
John J. Powers |
Defendant: |
Pete Hautzinger and Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The |
Case Number: |
1:2009cv01190 |
Filed: |
May 22, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
Mesa |
Presiding Judge: |
Boyd N. Boland |
Presiding Judge: |
Boyd N. Boland |
Nature of Suit: |
None |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 23, 2010 |
Filing
88
ORDER. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 85 filed 05/03/2010, is APPROVED AND ADOPTED. This case is DISMISSED based on the plaintiffs failure to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 10.1M. and, under FED. R. CIV. P. 41(b), for failure to prosecute. JUDGMENT SHALL ENTER in favor of the defendants, Pete Hautzinger and the Attorney General of the State of Colorado, against the plaintiff, John J. Powers. Defendant Hautzingers Motion To Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) 36 filed 11/09/2009, is DENIED as moot. Defendant Colorado Attorney Generals Motion To Dismiss 47 filed 12/14/2009, is DENIED as moot. The defendants are AWARDED their costs to be taxed by the Clerk of the Court pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 54(d)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 08/23/2010.(sah, )
|
April 7, 2010 |
Filing
75
ORDER. The unopposed Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 34 filed 10/27/2009, is APPROVED AND ADOPTED as an order of this court. Plaintiffs Emergency Request For a Restraining Order To Prohibit State Employees From Blocking Access To This Honorable Federal Court 23 filed 09/10/2009, is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 04/07/2010.(sah, )
|
March 26, 2010 |
Filing
74
ORDER: denying without prejudice 72 The plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Add Necessary Parties and to Add Facts Supporting Addition of Parties, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/26/10.(bnbcd, )
|
February 3, 2010 |
Filing
62
ORDER: denying 56 Plaintiffs Request Court Take Judicial Notice: Plaintiff Has Not Been Served a Copy of Defendants Motions, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/3/10.(bnbcd, )
|
August 10, 2009 |
Filing
15
ORDER Drawing Case. 7 Order of 6/9/09, construing action as filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2241 is vacated. Case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/10/09. (gms, )
|
July 22, 2009 |
Filing
13
ORDER granting 11 Motion for Reconsideration and Directing Plaintiff to File an Amended Prisoner Complaint by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 07/22/09.(jjh, )
|
June 30, 2009 |
Filing
10
ORDER Overruling Objeciton 9 . Ordered that Mr. Powers has 30 days to comply with the 06/09/09 Order if he wishes to pursue his cliams in this action by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 06/29/09. (jjh, )
|
June 9, 2009 |
Filing
7
ORDER Construing Action as a 28 U.S.C 2241 Action and Directing Mr. Powers to File Claims on a 2241 Court-Approved Form within 30 days by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 06/09/09. (jjh, )
|
May 26, 2009 |
Filing
2
ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency. Plaintiff shall have 30 days to submit a certified copy of his prisoner's trust fund statement, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/22/09. (jak, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?