Graves v. Executive Director of the C.D.O.C., The et al
Plaintiff: |
Troy Graves |
Defendant: |
Executive Director of the C.D.O.C., The, Kevin Milyard, Terry Bartruff, Lloyd Waide, Jeff Revord, Raymond Higgins, Gary Little, Robert Keisel and Shawn Rewoldt |
Case Number: |
1:2009cv01218 |
Filed: |
May 27, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
Logan |
Presiding Judge: |
Philip A. Brimmer |
Presiding Judge: |
Craig B. Shaffer |
Nature of Suit: |
None |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 1, 2010 |
Filing
31
ORDER. Defendants Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) ( 18 filed in Case No. 09-cv-01147) is GRANTED. Defendants Motion to Dismiss Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Palecek Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) ( 26 filed in Case No. 09- cv-01147) (Plaintiff Palecek has joined the objections to the Magistrate Judges Recommendations filed by Plaintiffs Braxton, Graves, and Johnson) is GRANTED. Defendants Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by Plaintiff Michael Johnson ( 28 filed in Case No. 09-cv-01147) (he too joins the objections to the Magistrate Judges Recommendations) is GRANTED. Defendants Motion to Dismiss ( 15 filed in Case No. 09-cv-01313) is GRANTED. Defendants Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) ( 24 filed in Case No. 09-cv-01218) is GRANTED. The above action is DISMISSED IN ITS ENTIRETY. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 02/01/2010.(sah, )
|
December 11, 2009 |
Filing
30
Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge: It is RECOMMENDED that 24 Defendants Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) be GRANTED. Plaintiffs claims be dismissed in their entirety, with prejudice, for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/11/2009. (sah, )
|
September 25, 2009 |
Filing
29
ORDER. The following four cases- Graves v. Executive Director of the CDOC, 09-cv-01218-PAB-CBS; Johnson v. Executive Director of the CDOC, 09-cv-01313- REB-MEH; Palecek v. Executive Director of the CDOC, 09-cv-01352-ZLW-CBS; and Johnson v. Zavaras, E xecutive Director of the CDOC, 09-cv-01553-MSK-MEH shall be assigned to meand consolidated with this case for all further purposes. The Orders of Reference to Magistrate Judges previously issued in Case Nos. 09-cv-01218-LTB-KMT, 09-cv-01313-LTB-KLM, 09-cv-01552-LTB-KMT, and 09-cv-01553-LTB-KMT are WITHDRAWN and these cases are REASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 42.1. All five cases shall hereafter be designated as Civil Action No. 09-cv-01147-LTB-KMT, and all pleadings and other filings shall be filed in this case only. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 09/25/2009. (sah, )
|
July 14, 2009 |
Filing
10
ORDER GRANTING SERVICE BY UNITED STATES MARSHAL, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/10/09. (ebs, )
|
July 7, 2009 |
Filing
7
ORDER DRAWING CASE. Ordered that this case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 07/07/2009. (sah, )
|
June 9, 2009 |
Filing
5
Minute ORDER denying 4 Motion for Court to Ordered Garnishment of Plaintiff's Monthly State Account Income by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 06/09/09.(jjh, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?