Sparks v. Black Hawk/Jacobs Entertainment, LLC
Plaintiff: Elizabeth L. Sparks
Defendant: Black Hawk/Jacobs Entertainment, LLC
Case Number: 1:2009cv01242
Filed: May 28, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting in part 27 and 44 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant is entitled to summary judgment on plaintiff's claims for gender discrimination and retaliation. Plaintiff's hostile work environment claim is di smissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1). Judgment shall enter in favor of defendant and against plaintiff. The trial preparation conference set for 1/14/11 and the trial on 1/31/11 are vacated, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/30/10.(ebs, )
May 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: Settlement Conference reset for 12/2/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/21/10. (ebs, )
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: Motion Hearing held on 1/20/2010. Plaintiffs 18 MOTION to Compel attendance of a Rule 30(b)(6) witness at Deposition is granted in part, denied in part and withdrawn in part. (FTR - Debra Brown.) (kmtcd, )
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER CONCERNING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/9/09. (ebs, )
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 12/10/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/25/09. (kmtcd)
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED ORDER re: 4 Amended Order. Scheduling Conference set for 8/25/2009 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 8/18/09, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/12/09. (ebs, )
June 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED ORDER re: 3 Order. Scheduling Conference set for 8/25/2009 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/4/09. (ebs, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sparks v. Black Hawk/Jacobs Entertainment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth L. Sparks
Represented By: Tatiana Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Hawk/Jacobs Entertainment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?