Center for Biological Diversity v. U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service et al
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service and Ken Salazar
Case Number: 1:2009cv01288
Filed: June 2, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Walker D. Miller
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting 29 Plaintiffs MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Center for Biological Diversity. Plaintiff is awarded both attorney fees in the amount of $15,020 and costs in the amount of $372.84 for the underlying litigation. Plaintiff is awarded $10,000 for fees associated with the fee motion. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/1/2010. (erv, )
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Minute Entry for Motion Hearing held 3/30/2010 before Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel: granting 29 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff shall be awarded attorney fees int he total amouunt of $25,020.00, plus costs. (Court Reporter Therese Lindblom) (wydcd, rrk)
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER STRIKING 26 Motion for Attorney Fees with leave to refile in compliance with this Court's Practice Standards and the local rules of this Court. The motion exceeds the page limitations and is not doublespaced. The exhibits need not be resubmitted. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/11/09.(erv, )
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER granting 24 Joint Motion to Establish Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/9/09. Plaintiff shall file its Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs and supporting papers on or before September 11, 2009. Defendants shall file their opposing brief on or before October 2, 2009. Plaintiff shall file its reply brief on or before October 16, 2009.(wydcd, rrk)
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER APPROVING 22 Stipulation of Dismissal of Case filed by Ken Salazar, Center for Biological Diversity, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), and claims one and two are DISMISSED. It is FURTHER ORDERED a judgment will not be entered until Plaintiffs claim for attorney fees and costs is resolved. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit to the Court a proposed briefing schedule to resolve Plaintiffs claim for attorney fees and costs. Upon receipt of the submissions, the Court will likely set a hearing. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will retain jurisdiction over this matter to resolve the attorney fee and cost dispute. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 8/28/09. (erv, )
June 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE (ORDER) Concerning Waiver of Judicial Disqualification. Any letters waivering disqualification must be sent to Ed Butler, the Legal Officer within 20 days. Plaintiff's counsel to serve defendants and their counsel with a copy of this notice, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 6/4/09. (gmssl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity v. U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Neil Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?