Revello v. Schissler et al
Plaintiff: Herman Revello
Defendant: Schissler, Argo and P.J.
Case Number: 1:2009cv01348
Filed: June 10, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 106 OPINION and ORDER granting 66 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 69 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Judgment shall enter in favor of defendants contemporaneously with this order. Denying as moot 91 Motion to Strike ; denying as moot 97 Motion for Leave and denying as moot 104 Motion for Leave, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/13/10.(gmssl, )
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 73 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Argo for Admission Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 36, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 02/09/2010.(wjc, )
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MINUTE ORDER denying 62 Plaintiff's Motion for Copies of Transcripts of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(f)(3), by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/29/2009.(wjc, )
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTE ORDER denying 57 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/4/2009. (mehcd)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MINUTE ORDER granting 48 Motion for Leave to Depose Plaintiff, a Confined Person in Prison. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/16/2009. (mehcd)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 40 Motion for Qualified Protective Order to File Medical Records Under Seal filed by Defendants Diane Schissler and Nurse P.J., by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/19/2009. (mehcd)
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 19 Motion to Amend Request for Relief. Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint, containing the information he seeks to add as described in the motion, before Defendants file a responsive pleading in the case. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/23/2009. (mehcd)
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion for Order for Access of Legal Materials and Copies of Legal Documentation for the Courts, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/20/2009. (mehcd)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/9/09. (mskcd)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Drawing Case. Ordered that this case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 06/30/2009. (sah, )
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency. Plaintiff shall have 30 days to file a certified copy of his prisoner's trust fund account, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/5/09. (jak, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Revello v. Schissler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman Revello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schissler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Argo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.J.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?