Allen v. People of the State of Colorado
Petitioner: Gene Allen
Respondent: People of the State of Colorado
Case Number: 1:2009cv01350
Filed: June 10, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Zita L. Weinshienk
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER to Cure Deficiency. Petitioner has 30 days to file a 1915 motion on the proper form with a certified statement by prison official re 17 Notice of Appeal, by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 9/21/09. (gms, )
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying 15 Motion for Reconsideration by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 08/07/09.(jjh, )
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER of Dismissal. Ordered that the Application is denied and the action is dismissed without prejudice for failure to cure all deficiencies by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 07/22/09. (jjh, )
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Minute ORDER denying as unnecessary 7 Motion to Amend. Order denying as premature 8 Motion for Discovery by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 07/08/09.(jjh, )
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiency. Applicant shall have 30 days to; file a petition, and file a certificate showing current balance in prison account, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/5/09. (jak, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. People of the State of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gene Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: People of the State of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?