Branter v. Ritter et al
Plaintiff: Robert Branter
Defendant: Bill (I) Ritter, Bill Ritter, Aristedes (I) Zavaras, Aristedes Zavaras, Barry (I) Pardus, Barry Pardus, Deborah (I) Montoya and Deborah Montoya
Case Number: 1:2009cv01428
Filed: June 18, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Denying Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis on Appeal after Review re 44 Notice of Appeal by Robert Brantner, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/01/10. (bjrsl, )
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 35 filed 04/04/2010, is APPROVED AND ADOPTED. Defendant Zavaras Motion to Dismiss 16 filed 10/23/2009, is GRANTED. The Plaintiffs [Renewed] Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 56(a)(1); (c); et seq. and D.C.COLO. LcivR 56.1 20 filed 12/02/2009, is DENIED. Defendant Zavaras Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 56(a)(1); (c); et seq. and D.C.COLO. LcivR 56.1 22 filed 12/28/2009, is DENIED AS MOOT. The objections stated in Plaintiffs Response in Opposition To The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge In Re Dismissal - And Plaintiffs Adamant Assertion That The Complaint Should Not be Dismissed 38 filed 05/17/2010, are OVERRULED. Judgment SHALL ENTER in favor of the defendant, Aristedes Zavaras, against the plaintiff, Robert Brantner, as to all claims and causes of action asserted in this case. The defendant is AWARDED his costs to be taxed by the Clerk of the Court under FED. R. CIV. P. 54(d)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1.. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 08/23/2010.(sah, )
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 COURTROOM MINUTES - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 1/22/2010. ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion for Order Compelling Defendants to Make Full Disclosure and to Cooperate in Discovery Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. Rules 26 and 37, et seq, doc # 24 is DENIED. The Motion to Set the Matter for a Hearing, doc # 24 , is GRANTED. The court will issue a Recommendation on the Motion to Dismiss # 16 , the Motion for Summary Judgment # 20 , and the Motion to Strike # 22 . By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. (Court Reporter FTR - Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER to Dismiss in Part and Draw Case to A District Judge and to a Magistrate Judge. The amended complaint is dismissed in part as legally frivolous pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). The claims asserted against the following Defendants ar e dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915 (e)(2)(B) as legally frivolous: Governor Bill Ritter, Barry Pardus, Deborah Montoya, adn the Jane and John Does. The clerk of the Court is directed to remove the names of Governor Bill Ritter, Barry Pardu s, Deborah Montoya, and the Jane and John Does as parties to this lawsuit. The only remaining Defendant is Aristedes Zavaras. The claims against the remaining Defendant and the action are drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. The motion for summary judgment that the Plaintiff Robert Branter, filed with the Court on 08/11/2009, 10 is denied without prejudice as premature. By Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 08/14/2009.(sah, )
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint within 30 days by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 07/14/09. (jjh, )
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency. Plaintiff shall have 30 days to file a complaint and 1915 motion on the proper court forms, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/17/09. (jak, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Branter v. Ritter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Branter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill (I) Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aristedes (I) Zavaras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aristedes Zavaras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry (I) Pardus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Pardus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah (I) Montoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Montoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?