Blevins v. Keller et al
Plaintiff: Terry Blevins
Defendant: Jim Keller, Tasha Dobbs, Jeff Wells, Carolynne Sonda, D. Cool, Stan H., Behavior Clinical Services, Mesa County Detention Facility, Mesa County Sheriff's Department and Robert Armenta
Case Number: 1:2009cv01531
Filed: June 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER APPROVED 79 Report and Recommendations of the United States Magistrate Judge. granting 64 Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment for Plaintiffs failure to exhaust his administrative remedies. Defendant shall have his costs by the filing of a Bill of Costs with the Clerk of this Court within fourteen days of the entry of judgment. Defendants request for attorneys fees is hereby DENIED. by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/20/2011.(erv, )
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER the parties are directed to confer and to file a Joint Status Report, Status Report due by 2/23/2011, by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/14/11. (lyg, )
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Granting 56 Defendant's MOTION for Order Granting Leave to Take Prison Deposition. Defendant has leave to take deposition of plaintiff at the Sterling Correctional Facility before 9/16/10. Defendant to obtain clearance for counsel and the court reporter, and for scheduling with the facility, and are to comply with all regulations, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/28/10. (gmssl, )
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Setting Preliminary Scheduling Conference for 1/12/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/13/2009. (wjc, )
October 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/26/09. (mskcd)
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Assign in Part. Part one of claim one is dismissed without prejudice as barred by the rule Heck v. Humphrey, 512 U.S. 477 (1994). Part two of claim one is dismissed as legally frivolous pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 191 5 (e)(2)(B). Part one of claim two is dismissed without prejudice as barred by the rule in Heck v. Humphrey, 512 U.S. 477 (1994). Part one of claim three is dismissed as legally frivolous pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915 (e)(2)(B). Claim four is di smissed as legally frivolous pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915 (e) (2) (B). Defendant Stan H. be dismissed as a party to this action. The clerk of the Court remove the names of Jim Keller, Tasha Dobbs, Carolynne Sonda, D. Cool, Stan H.,Behavior clin ical Services, Robert Armenta, Mesa County Detention Facility, and Mesa County Sheriff's Office as parties to this action. The only remaining Defendant is Jeff Wells. Part two of claim two and part two of claim three and the case are assigned to District Judge Marcia S. Krieger, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1C.1, and to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 10/20/2009. (sah, )
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint within 30 days by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 07/24/09. (jjh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blevins v. Keller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Blevins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tasha Dobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolynne Sonda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Cool
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stan H.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Behavior Clinical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesa County Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesa County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Armenta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?