Centrix Financial, LLC et al v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA et al

In Re: Centrix Financial, LLC
Plaintiff: Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust and Jeffrey A. Weinman
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA and AIG Domestic Claims, Inc.
Interested Party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado
Case Number: 1:2009cv01542
Filed: June 30, 2009
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 11, 2015 198 Opinion or Order of the Court Order of Dismissal With Prejudice. ORDERED that the Stipulated Motion for Dismissal With Prejudice 197 is GRANTED. ORDERED that, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), this matter, and all claims asserted therein, is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 08/10/15. (jhawk, )
June 12, 2015 195 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 142 Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendants' Deposition Designations as to Andrew MacLeod. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/12/15. (pabsec)
June 8, 2015 189 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 161 Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' Counter Deposition Designations for Trial as to George Blume, Bronce Breazeale, Fred Dairman, and Carl Grant. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/8/15. (pabsec)
June 5, 2015 186 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 161 Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' Counter Deposition Designations for Trial as to Robert Sutton. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/5/15. (pabsec)
June 4, 2015 183 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Plaintiffs' Objection to Defendants' Counter-Designations to Plaintiffs' Counter-Designations 173 is sustained. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/4/15. (pabsec)
June 3, 2015 179 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 111 plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Certain Expert Testimony Regarding Questions of Law and Issues to be Decided by the Jury. It is granted in part with respect to the opinions of John J. Tomaine and Dean Felton as described in the attached Order. It is denied with respect to the opinions of William Roberts and Stacy Kinsel. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/3/15. (pabsec)
June 2, 2015 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that defendants National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA and AIG Domestic Claims, Inc.s Consolidated Motions in Limine [Docket No. 106] is GRANTED in part with respect to defendants first and fourth motions. ORDERED th at, at trial, plaintiffs will not be allowed to introduce evidence that failure to provide timely notice under the fidelity bond caused no prejudice to defendant National Union and will not be permitted to introduce evidence of notice provided to an insurer other than National Union. Entered by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 06/02/15. (jhawk, )
June 1, 2015 166 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 106 Motion in Limine by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 06/01/15.(jhawk, )
May 26, 2015 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that plaintiffs Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust and Jeffrey A. Weinman's First Motion in Limine 107 is GRANTED. ORDERED that plaintiffs Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust and Jeffrey A. Weinman's Second Motion in Limin e 108 is GRANTED. ORDERED that plaintiffs Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust and Jeffrey A. Weinman's Third Motion in Limine 109 is GRANTED. ORDERED that plaintiffs Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust and Jeffrey A. Weinman's Fourth Motion in LImine 110 is GRANTED. Entered by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 05/26/15.(jhawk, )
January 5, 2015 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Case for Trial. Jury Trial set for 6/8/2015 08:00 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Trial Preparation Conference set for 5/22/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/5/2015. (agarc, )
July 9, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/9/2014. ORDERED: Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion Requesting Status or Preliminary Pretrial Conference for the Purpose of Pretrial Matters in the District Court 77 is GRANTED. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont)
December 19, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 12/19/2013. ORDERED: 32 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint is GRANTED. ORDERED: Any objection shall be filed no later than 1/17/2014. ORDERED: The parties are REQUIRED to file a detailed status report, either joint or separate, by close of business on 1/24/2014. FTR: Courtroom A402 - C. Covington. (ccovi)
April 26, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 42.1, Civil Action Nos. 09-cv-00088-PAB-CBS and 09-cv-01542-PAB-CBS shall be consolidated for all purposes. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/26/13. (mnfsl, )
January 7, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 1 Defendants' Demand for Jury Trial and Motion for Withdrawal of Reference. This matter is closed, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/7/11.(ebs, )
August 11, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 9/17/2009 at 9:15 a.m., in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 8/11/09. (cbssec)
July 20, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Clerk to Refer 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference to the District Court by Bk. Judge Elizabeth E. Brown on 7/20/09, nunc pro tunc 6/30/09. (gms, ) Modified on 7/22/2009 to correct spelling error (gms, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Centrix Financial, LLC et al v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Centrix Financial, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust
Represented By: Ann Marie Uetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey A. Weinman
Represented By: Ann Marie Uetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: Jessica A. Shoemaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG Domestic Claims, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica A. Shoemaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?