Jackson v. First Community Bank et al
Plaintiff: John G. Jackson
Defendant: First Community Bank and First State Bancorporation
Case Number: 1:2009cv01566
Filed: July 1, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 22 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE, each side to bear its own attorneys fees and costs. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/17/09.(erv, )
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER granting 17 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand. First Amended Complaint is accepted for filing, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/20/09.(gms, )
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/29/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 08/03/2009. (mjwcd )
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL directing reassignment by random draw. By Judge Walker D. Miller on 07/13/2009. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. First Community Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John G. Jackson
Represented By: Joseph L. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Community Bank
Represented By: Thomas E.J. Hazard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First State Bancorporation
Represented By: Thomas E.J. Hazard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?