Thomas v. Diversified Collection Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: David Thomas
Defendant: Diversified Collection Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv01567
Filed: July 1, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice 20 filed 10/26/2009, is APPROVED. The Trial Preparation Conference set for 08/20/2010 is VACATED. The jury trial set to commence 09/13/2010, is VACATED. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/26/2009. (sah, )
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/16/09. Four (4) day Jury Trial set for 9/13/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 8/20/2010 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn.(rebsec, )
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 07/30/2009. (mjwcd )
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Stipulated Motion for Entry of Protective Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 07/30/2009.(mjwcd ) Modified on 8/6/2009 to correct the filed dated (sah2, ).
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 9/15/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 07/14/2009. (mjwcd )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Diversified Collection Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Thomas
Represented By: David Michael Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified Collection Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?